Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 08/04/2020 at 12:12:13 (UTC).

Hicks v. TriNet HR III, Inc.

Case Summary

On 06/05/2020 Hicks filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against TriNet HR III, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, North Carolina Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Graham Mullen. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-00317

  • Filing Date:

    06/05/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    North Carolina Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Graham Mullen

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Mark Hicks

Charlotte, NC 28210

Defendant

TriNet HR III, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Eric Albert Montgomery

Attorney at The Montgomery Law Firm, PLLC

6135 Park South Drive, Suite 510

Charlotte, NC 28210

Defendant Attorney

Nicholas Hulse

Attorney at Fisher & Phillips LLP

227 West Trade St., Suite 2020

Charlotte, NC 28202

 

Court Documents

#10

(#10) ORDER granting Defendant's #4 Motion to Dismiss Fourth Cause of Action. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 7/28/2020. (tmg) (Entered: 07/28/2020)

#9

(#9) REPLY to Response to Motion re #4 MOTION to Dismiss by TriNet HR III, Inc.. (Hulse, Nicholas) (Entered: 07/14/2020)

8 #3

Exhibit NCDOL Documents

8 #2

Exhibit Affidavit of Eric Montgomery

#7

(#7) CERTIFICATION of initial attorney conference and discovery plan (Hulse, Nicholas) (Entered: 07/07/2020)

#6

(#6) ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #4 MOTION to Dismiss Responses due by 7/13/2020. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 6/29/2020. (eef) (Entered: 06/29/2020)

#5

(#5) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re: #4 MOTION to Dismiss by Mark Hicks. Responses due by 7/13/2020 (Montgomery, Eric) (Entered: 06/27/2020)

4 #1

Memorandum

#4

(#4) MOTION to Dismiss by TriNet HR III, Inc.. Responses due by 6/29/2020 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum)(Hulse, Nicholas) (Entered: 06/15/2020)

#3

(#3) ANSWER to Complaint contained in #1 Notice of Removal, by TriNet HR III, Inc..(Hulse, Nicholas) (Entered: 06/15/2020)

#2

(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by TriNet HR III, Inc. (Hulse, Nicholas) (Entered: 06/05/2020)

1 #3

Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit 2

1 #1

Exhibit 1

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand from Mecklenburg County, NC Superior Court, case number 20-CVS-6595. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0419-4520259), filed by TriNet HR III, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Cover Sheet)(Hulse, Nicholas) (Entered: 06/05/2020)

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER granting Defendant's #4 Motion to Dismiss Fourth Cause of Action. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 7/28/2020. (tmg) (Entered: 07/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) REPLY to Response to Motion re #4 MOTION to Dismiss by TriNet HR III, Inc.. (Hulse, Nicholas) (Entered: 07/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) RESPONSE in Opposition re #4 MOTION to Dismiss by Mark Hicks. Replies due by 7/20/2020 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavit of David Middleton, #2 Exhibit Affidavit of Eric Montgomery, #3 Exhibit NCDOL Documents)(Montgomery, Eric) (Entered: 07/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CERTIFICATION of initial attorney conference and discovery plan (Hulse, Nicholas) (Entered: 07/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #4 MOTION to Dismiss Responses due by 7/13/2020. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 6/29/2020. (eef) (Entered: 06/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re: #4 MOTION to Dismiss by Mark Hicks. Responses due by 7/13/2020 (Montgomery, Eric) (Entered: 06/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2020
  • DocketNOTICE pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 you are required to conduct an Initial Attorney's Conference within 14 days. At the conference, the parties are required to discuss the issue of consent to jurisdiction of a magistrate judge in accordance with Local Rules 16.1(A) and 73.1(C). The #Certificate of Initial Attorneys Conference, and if applicable, the #Joint Stipulation of Consent to Exercise jurisdiction by a US Magistrate Judge, should be filed within 7 days of the conference. If appropriate, a party may file a Motion to Stay the Initial Attorney's Conference. CIAC Report due by 7/14/2020. (clc) (Entered: 06/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MOTION to Dismiss by TriNet HR III, Inc.. Responses due by 6/29/2020 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum)(Hulse, Nicholas) (Entered: 06/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ANSWER to Complaint contained in #1 Notice of Removal, by TriNet HR III, Inc..(Hulse, Nicholas) (Entered: 06/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Senior Judge Graham Mullen. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(brj) (Entered: 06/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by TriNet HR III, Inc. (Hulse, Nicholas) (Entered: 06/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand from Mecklenburg County, NC Superior Court, case number 20-CVS-6595. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0419-4520259), filed by TriNet HR III, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Cover Sheet)(Hulse, Nicholas) (Entered: 06/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TriNet HR III, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Nicholas Hulse