This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/19/2022 at 08:34:37 (UTC).

Hicks v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 10/20/2022 Hicks filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Colorado District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are William J. Martinez and N. Reid Neureiter. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-02762

  • Filing Date:

    10/20/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

William J. Martinez

Referral Judge

N. Reid Neureiter

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Marilyn Hicks

Defendant

State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Wesley Lynn Eddington

Adam James Gleason

Richard L. Eddington

Defendant Attorneys

Jean M. Peterson

Heather A. Salg

 

Court Documents

#19

(#19) CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Defendant State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company All parties do not consent.. (Salg, Heather) (Entered: 12/09/2022)

#18

(#18) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Jean M. Peterson on behalf of State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance CompanyAttorney Jean M. Peterson added to party State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company(pty:dft) (Peterson, Jean) (Entered: 12/05/2022)

#17

(#17) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Adam James Gleason on behalf of Marilyn HicksAttorney Adam James Gleason added to party Marilyn Hicks(pty:pla) (Gleason, Adam) (Entered: 11/02/2022)

#16

(#16) ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING/PLANNING CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on 31 October 2022. Proposed Scheduling Order due 1/17/2023. Scheduling Conference set for 1/24/2023 10:30 AM in Courtroom C203 before Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. The Scheduling Conference will be conducted via telephone. The parties are directed to call the conference line as a participant at (888) 398-2342, Access Code 5755390# at the scheduled time. (cmadr, ) (Entered: 10/31/2022)

#15

(#15) ANSWER to #6 Amended Complaint by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company.(Salg, Heather) (Entered: 10/27/2022)

#11

(#11) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Richard L. Eddington on behalf of Marilyn HicksAttorney Richard L. Eddington added to party Marilyn Hicks(pty:pla) (Eddington, Richard) (Entered: 10/25/2022)

#10

(#10) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Wesley Lynn Eddington on behalf of Marilyn Hicks (Eddington, Wesley) (Entered: 10/25/2022)

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Wesley Lynn Eddington on behalf of Marilyn HicksAttorney Wesley Lynn Eddington added to party Marilyn Hicks(pty:pla) (Eddington, Wesley) (Entered: 10/21/2022)

#8

(#8) Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). (norlin, ) (Entered: 10/20/2022)

#6

(#6) Plaintiff's First AMENDED COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, filed by Marilyn Hicks.(norlin, ) (Entered: 10/20/2022)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Supplemental Civil Case Cover Sheet by Defendant State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Salg, Heather) (Entered: 10/20/2022)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Civil Case Cover Sheet by Defendant State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Salg, Heather) (Entered: 10/20/2022)

#2

(#2) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance for State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Salg, Heather) (Entered: 10/20/2022)

1 #6

Exhibit Exhibit F - Register of Actions

1 #4

Exhibit Exhibit D - State Court Notice

1 #3

Exhibit Exhibit C - District Court Summons

1 #1

Exhibit Exhibit A - Amended Complaint

1 #1

Main Document

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Defendant State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company All parties do not consent.. (Salg, Heather) (Entered: 12/09/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Jean M. Peterson on behalf of State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance CompanyAttorney Jean M. Peterson added to party State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company(pty:dft) (Peterson, Jean) (Entered: 12/05/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Adam James Gleason on behalf of Marilyn HicksAttorney Adam James Gleason added to party Marilyn Hicks(pty:pla) (Gleason, Adam) (Entered: 11/02/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING/PLANNING CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on 31 October 2022. Proposed Scheduling Order due 1/17/2023. Scheduling Conference set for 1/24/2023 10:30 AM in Courtroom C203 before Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. The Scheduling Conference will be conducted via telephone. The parties are directed to call the conference line as a participant at (888) 398-2342, Access Code 5755390# at the scheduled time. (cmadr, ) (Entered: 10/31/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ANSWER to #6 Amended Complaint by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company.(Salg, Heather) (Entered: 10/27/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ADVISORY NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE WITH COURT RULES/PROCEDURES re: #10 Amended Notice of Entry of Appearance filed by attorney Wesley Lynn Eddington. DO NOT REFILE THE DOCUMENT. Action to take - counsel must submit a change of contact request through the Manage my Account tab at the PACER website at https://www.pacer.gov/, pursuant to D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(c) and 3.5 of the Electronic Case Filing Procedures (Civil cases).(Text Only Entry) (trvo, ) (Entered: 10/26/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2022
  • Docket(#13) ORDER: Counsel for the parties and all counsel who may later enter an appearance shall review and familiarize themselves with the undersigned's Revised Practice Standards (as most recently revised effective December 1, 2021 and as they may be amended from time to time), which may be downloaded #here. Counsel shall also review and familiarize themselves with the Practice Standards of the Magistrate Judge assigned in the referral role in this case. SO ORDERED by Judge William J. Martinez on 10/26/2022. Text Only Entry (wjmsec, ) (Entered: 10/26/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2022
  • Docket(#12) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. Magistrate Judge Neureiter, or such other Magistrate Judge who may in the future be reassigned this case, is designated to conduct NDISPO proceedings pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed.R.Civ.P. 72(a) and (b). Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the Magistrate Judge or on the request of the parties by motion, the court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding. SO ORDERED by Judge William J. Martinez on 10/26/2022. Text Only Entry (wjmsec, ) (Entered: 10/26/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Richard L. Eddington on behalf of Marilyn HicksAttorney Richard L. Eddington added to party Marilyn Hicks(pty:pla) (Eddington, Richard) (Entered: 10/25/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Wesley Lynn Eddington on behalf of Marilyn Hicks (Eddington, Wesley) (Entered: 10/25/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Wesley Lynn Eddington on behalf of Marilyn HicksAttorney Wesley Lynn Eddington added to party Marilyn Hicks(pty:pla) (Eddington, Wesley) (Entered: 10/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). (norlin, ) (Entered: 10/20/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2022
  • Docket(#7) Case assigned to Judge William J. Martinez and drawn to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. Text Only Entry (norlin, ) (Entered: 10/20/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Plaintiff's First AMENDED COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, filed by Marilyn Hicks.(norlin, ) (Entered: 10/20/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2022
  • Docket(#5) FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawals of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (Text Only Entry) (norlin, ) (Entered: 10/20/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Supplemental Civil Case Cover Sheet by Defendant State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Salg, Heather) (Entered: 10/20/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Civil Case Cover Sheet by Defendant State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Salg, Heather) (Entered: 10/20/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance for State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Salg, Heather) (Entered: 10/20/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company from Denver District Court, Case Number 22CV32703. (Filing fee $ 402, Receipt Number ACODC-8732003), filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - Civil Case Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C - District Court Summons, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D - State Court Notice, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E - Articles of Incorporation, #6 Exhibit Exhibit F - Register of Actions)(Salg, Heather) (Entered: 10/20/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less