This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/24/2021 at 10:05:56 (UTC).

Hicks v. Petty et al

Case Summary

On 03/25/2021 Hicks filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Petty. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Tennessee Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are Annie T. Christoff and Mark S. Norris. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-02175

  • Filing Date:

    03/25/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Annie T. Christoff

Presiding Judge

Mark S. Norris

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Ray C. Hicks

Defendants

Jones Capital, LLC

Jones Logistics, LLC

Darius Cardale Petty

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Robert L. J. Spence, Jr

Attorney at THE SPENCE LAW FIRM

80 Monroe Avenue, Garden Suite One

Memphis, TN 38103

Kristina A. Woo

Attorney at THE SPENCE LAW FIRM

80 Monroe Avenue, Garden Suite One

Memphis, TN 38103

Defendant Attorney

John Lewis Wardlaw

Attorney at MARTIN TATE MORROW & MARSTON

6410 Poplar Ave., Ste. 1000

Memphis, TN 38119

 

Court Documents

#12

#11

#10

#9

#8

7 #2

summons

7 #1

summons

#7

#3

#2

1 #7

Notice of Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of Summons - Jones Capital, LLC

1 #6

Notice of Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of Summons - Jones Logistics, LL

1 #5

Notice of Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of Summons - Darius Cardale Pett

1 #4

Summons Jones Capital, LLC

1 #3

Summons Jones Logistics, LLC

1 #2

Summons Darius Cardale Petty

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Jones Capital, LLC, Jones Logistics, LLC. (Wardlaw, John) (Entered: 05/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) SETTING LETTER: Scheduling Conference set for Friday, 07/30/2021 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 4 - Memphis before Judge Mark S. Norris. (zsf) (Entered: 05/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Joint Answer and Defenses of Defendants Darius Cardale Petty, Jones Logistics, LLC and Jones Capital, LLC ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, by Jones Capital, LLC, Jones Logistics, LLC, Darius Cardale Petty.(Wardlaw, John) (Entered: 05/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Ray C. Hicks. Jones Capital, LLC waiver sent on 3/25/2021, answer due 5/24/2021; Jones Logistics, LLC waiver sent on 3/25/2021, answer due 5/24/2021; Darius Cardale Petty waiver sent on 3/25/2021, answer due 5/24/2021. (Woo, Kristina) (Entered: 04/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by John Lewis Wardlaw on behalf of All Defendants (Wardlaw, John) (Entered: 04/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Summons Issued as to Jones Capital, LLC, Jones Logistics, LLC, Darius Cardale Petty. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (Attachments: #1 summons, #2 summons)(jae) (Entered: 03/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (jae) (Entered: 03/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (jae) (Entered: 03/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (jae) (Entered: 03/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Judge Mark S. Norris and Magistrate Judge Annie T. Christoff added. (jae) (Entered: 03/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Kristina A. Woo on behalf of Ray C. Hicks (Woo, Kristina) (Entered: 03/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Jones Capital, LLC, Jones Logistics, LLC, Darius Cardale Petty (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATNWDC-3573951), filed by Ray C. Hicks. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Darius Cardale Petty, #3 Summons Jones Logistics, LLC, #4 Summons Jones Capital, LLC, #5 Notice of Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of Summons - Darius Cardale Petty, #6 Notice of Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of Summons - Jones Logistics, LLC, #7 Notice of Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of Summons - Jones Capital, LLC)(Spence, Robert) (Entered: 03/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer John Lewis Wardlaw