This case was last updated from PACER on 07/16/2019 at 09:46:55 (UTC).

Hickey v. Olivia

Case Summary

On 05/17/2019 Hickey filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Olivia. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is John Robert Blakey. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-03333

  • Filing Date:

    05/17/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Illinois Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John Robert Blakey

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Brenda Hickey

Defendant

Rudy Olivia

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Richard James Grossman

Attorney at Steinberg, Burtker & Grossman, Ltd

55 East Monroe Street, Suite 2920

Chicago, IL 60603

 

Court Documents

#10

(#10) MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey:Status and motion hearing held on 7/3/2019. Plaintiff's ex-parte motion to appoint special process server #6 is granted. Status hearing set for 9/11/2019 at 9:45 a.m. in Courtroom 1203. Joint status report shall be filed on or before 9/2/2019. Mailed notice (gel, ) (Entered: 07/03/2019)

#9

(#9) Rule 26(f) Report for Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) Plaintiff Initial Status Report, filed by Plaintiff Brenda Hickey. (Grossman, Richard) (Entered: 06/26/2019)

#8

(#8) Revised Corrected NOTICE of Motion by Richard James Grossman for presentment of Motion to Defer Initial Discovery Response Deadline #6 before Honorable John Robert Blakey on 7/3/2019 at 09:45 AM. (Grossman, Richard) (Entered: 06/26/2019)

#7

(#7) To appoint Special Process Server and NOTICE of Motion by Richard James Grossman for presentment of Motion to Defer Initial Discovery Response Deadline #6 before Honorable John Robert Blakey on 6/3/2019 at 09:45 AM. (Grossman, Richard) (Entered: 06/26/2019)

6 #3

Exhibit

6 #2

Exhibit

6 #1

Exhibit

#6

(#6) First MOTION to Defer Initial Discovery Response Deadline (MIDP) and for other relief, filed by Plaintiff Brenda Hickey. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(Grossman, Richard) (Entered: 06/26/2019)

#5

(#5) MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: This case has been assigned to the calendar of the Honorable John Robert Blakey. Pursuant to General Order 17-0005, this case falls within the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) Project, and the "Standing Order in MIDP Cases" now governs the conduct of the litigants in this matter. Under the MIDP, this Court shall enforce the MIDP Standing Order via the Court's inherent authority (including the contempt of court power) and the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Consequently, both the parties and their attorneys are hereby ordered to review and fully comply with the MIDP Standing Order, which is available on the Court's homepage: http://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/_assets/_documents/MIDP Standing Order.pdf. The parties are further advised that in light of the MIDP's intended goal of reducing the traditional cost and delay of federal civil litigation, this Court will not grant routine motions for extensions of time to meet the deadlines imposed by the MIDP Standing Order (even agreed motions made jointly by the parties). During the course of the litigation, the attorneys must also appear at all hearing dates set by the Court or noticed by the parties. If an attorney has a conflict with a set court date, the attorney must notify Judge Blakey's Courtroom Deputy, Gloria Lewis, at (312)818-6699. If appropriate, the Court will then reset the matter. Advising opposing counsel of a scheduling conflict is not a substitute for communicating directly with the Court. The litigants are further ordered to review and fully comply with all of this Court's own standing orders, which are available on Judge Blakey's information page on the Courts official website: http://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/. An initial status conference is hereby set for 7/3/2019 at 9:45 a.m. in Courtroom 1203. At the status conference, the Court will discuss the MIDP and ask the parties questions to verify that they have reviewed and complied with the MIDP Standing Order. Without exception, the parties must also file a status report no later than 6/24/2019, using the model template set forth in this Court's standing order regarding Initial (or Reassignment) Status Conferences. Failure by any party to file the status report by the requisite deadline (either jointly or, if necessary, individually with an explanation as to why a joint report could not be filed) may result in a summary dismissal of the case for failure to prosecute, or an entry of default against any served defendant(s) failing to comply with this order. Mailed notice (gel, ) (Entered: 06/04/2019)

#4

(#4) NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (jh, ) (Entered: 05/20/2019)

#3

(#3) REQUEST for Waiver of Service sent to Rudy Olivia on 5-17-2019 by Plaintiff Brenda Hickey. Waiver of service due by 6/21/2019. (Grossman, Richard) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

#2

(#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Grossman, Richard) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Brenda Hickey; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15837384.(Grossman, Richard) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey:Status and motion hearing held on 7/3/2019. Plaintiff's ex-parte motion to appoint special process server #6 is granted. Status hearing set for 9/11/2019 at 9:45 a.m. in Courtroom 1203. Joint status report shall be filed on or before 9/2/2019. Mailed notice (gel, ) (Entered: 07/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Rudy Olivia (jn, ) (Entered: 06/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Rule 26(f) Report for Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) Plaintiff Initial Status Report, filed by Plaintiff Brenda Hickey. (Grossman, Richard) (Entered: 06/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Revised Corrected NOTICE of Motion by Richard James Grossman for presentment of Motion to Defer Initial Discovery Response Deadline #6 before Honorable John Robert Blakey on 7/3/2019 at 09:45 AM. (Grossman, Richard) (Entered: 06/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) To appoint Special Process Server and NOTICE of Motion by Richard James Grossman for presentment of Motion to Defer Initial Discovery Response Deadline #6 before Honorable John Robert Blakey on 6/3/2019 at 09:45 AM. (Grossman, Richard) (Entered: 06/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) First MOTION to Defer Initial Discovery Response Deadline (MIDP) and for other relief, filed by Plaintiff Brenda Hickey. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(Grossman, Richard) (Entered: 06/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: This case has been assigned to the calendar of the Honorable John Robert Blakey. Pursuant to General Order 17-0005, this case falls within the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) Project, and the "Standing Order in MIDP Cases" now governs the conduct of the litigants in this matter. Under the MIDP, this Court shall enforce the MIDP Standing Order via the Court's inherent authority (including the contempt of court power) and the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Consequently, both the parties and their attorneys are hereby ordered to review and fully comply with the MIDP Standing Order, which is available on the Court's homepage: http://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/_assets/_documents/MIDP Standing Order.pdf. The parties are further advised that in light of the MIDP's intended goal of reducing the traditional cost and delay of federal civil litigation, this Court will not grant routine motions for extensions of time to meet the deadlines imposed by the MIDP Standing Order (even agreed motions made jointly by the parties). During the course of the litigation, the attorneys must also appear at all hearing dates set by the Court or noticed by the parties. If an attorney has a conflict with a set court date, the attorney must notify Judge Blakey's Courtroom Deputy, Gloria Lewis, at (312)818-6699. If appropriate, the Court will then reset the matter. Advising opposing counsel of a scheduling conflict is not a substitute for communicating directly with the Court. The litigants are further ordered to review and fully comply with all of this Court's own standing orders, which are available on Judge Blakey's information page on the Courts official website: http://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/. An initial status conference is hereby set for 7/3/2019 at 9:45 a.m. in Courtroom 1203. At the status conference, the Court will discuss the MIDP and ask the parties questions to verify that they have reviewed and complied with the MIDP Standing Order. Without exception, the parties must also file a status report no later than 6/24/2019, using the model template set forth in this Court's standing order regarding Initial (or Reassignment) Status Conferences. Failure by any party to file the status report by the requisite deadline (either jointly or, if necessary, individually with an explanation as to why a joint report could not be filed) may result in a summary dismissal of the case for failure to prosecute, or an entry of default against any served defendant(s) failing to comply with this order. Mailed notice (gel, ) (Entered: 06/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (jh, ) (Entered: 05/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable John Robert Blakey. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sheila M. Finnegan. Case assignment: Random assignment. (yt) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) REQUEST for Waiver of Service sent to Rudy Olivia on 5-17-2019 by Plaintiff Brenda Hickey. Waiver of service due by 6/21/2019. (Grossman, Richard) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Grossman, Richard) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT filed by Brenda Hickey; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15837384.(Grossman, Richard) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.