This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/08/2021 at 08:38:48 (UTC).

Hickey v. Oklahoma County Sheriff's Department et al

Case Summary

On 11/09/2020 Hickey filed a Prisoner - Prison Condition lawsuit against Oklahoma County Sheriff's Department. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Oklahoma Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are Suzanne Mitchell and David L. Russell. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:20-CV-01134

  • Filing Date:

    11/09/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Prison Condition

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Suzanne Mitchell

Presiding Judge

David L. Russell

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Dedrick Lemont Hickey

Oklahoma City, OK 73102

Defendants

PD Taylor

Oklahoma County Sheriff's Department

Nicole Burns

FNU LNU

 

Court Documents

#11

10 #2

Envelope

10 #1

Attachment 1 - Inmate Account

#10

#9

8 #1

Envelope

#8

#7

6 #1

Envelope

#6

#5

#4

#3

2 #1

Envelope

#2

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER striking as MOOT #10 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Suzanne Mitchell on 1/6/21. (lb) (Entered: 01/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Dedrick Lemont Hickey. Motions referred to Suzanne Mitchell. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1 - Inmate Account, #2 Envelope) (kmt). (Entered: 01/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER. The Court sua exponte extends Plaintiff's deadline to make the initial payment to January 18, 2021. The Court reminds Plaintiff that if he fails to pay the initial partial filing fee, or show cause in writing for failure to pay, this action will be subject to dismissal without prejudice to refiling, and no fees or costs will be imposed or collected. Plaintiff may voluntarily dismiss this action in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P 41(a) on or before January 18, 2021, without incurring any fees or costs.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Suzanne Mitchell on 12/28/2020. (cps) (Entered: 12/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) LETTER from Dedrick L Hickey re: #7 Order to file initial partial filing fee by 12/28/20. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (kmt) (Entered: 12/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER granting #6 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff shall pay an initial partial filing fee of $34.39 on or before 12/28/20. Signed by Magistrate Judge Suzanne Mitchell on 12/3/20. (lb) (Entered: 12/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Dedrick Lemont Hickey. Motions referred to Suzanne Mitchell. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(kmt) (Entered: 11/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER TO CURE DEFICIENCY. Failure to comply with this Order may result in the dismissal of this action. Signed by Magistrate Judge Suzanne Mitchell on 11/10/2020. (cps) (Entered: 11/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Mailing LCvR5.4/Change of Address form, #1 Complaint, and #4 Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge, to: Dedrick Lemont Hickey#404004OKLAHOMA CITY-OCJ201 N ShartelOklahoma City, OK 73102 (kmt) (Entered: 11/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ENTER ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Suzanne Mitchell. Signed by the direction of Honorable David L. Russell on 11/10/20. (kmt) (Entered: 11/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NO PREVIOUS Cases (kmt) (Entered: 11/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE regarding payment by Dedrick Lemont Hickey (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(kmt) (Entered: 11/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Nicole Burns, FNU LNU, Oklahoma County Sheriff's Department, PD Taylor filed by Dedrick Lemont Hickey. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1 - Appendix A and D, #2 Envelope)(kmt) (Entered: 11/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where OKLAHOMA COUNTY SHERIFF'S OFFICE is a litigant