This case was last updated from PACER on 02/02/2020 at 07:41:34 (UTC).

Hickey v. Life Insurance Company of North America

Case Summary

On 12/04/2019 Hickey filed a Labor - Employee Benefit lawsuit against Life Insurance Company of North America. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, South Carolina District. The Judge overseeing this case is Donald C Coggins, Jr. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:19-CV-03385

  • Filing Date:

    12/04/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Employee Benefit

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    South Carolina District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Donald C Coggins, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Nettie Hickey

Defendant

Life Insurance Company of North America

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Melissa Leila Louzri

Attorney at Foster Law Firm

Po Box 2123

Greenville, SC 29602

Defendant Attorneys

Franklin Grady Shuler, Jr

Attorney at Turner Padget Graham and Laney

Po Box 1473

Columbia, SC 29202

Catherine Mallory Cunningham

Attorney at Turner Padget Graham and Laney PA

Po Box 1473, 1901 Main Street 17Th Floor

Columbia, SC 29202

 

Court Documents

#5

(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Nettie Hickey. Life Insurance Company of North America served on 12/6/2019, answer due 12/27/2019. (Attachments: #1 Green card and DOI Letter)(Louzri, Melissa) (Entered: 12/12/2019)

#10

(#10) NOTICE of Settlement by Nettie Hickey (Louzri, Melissa) (Entered: 01/29/2020)

#9

(#9) ERISA CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER Joint Stipulation Deadline 4/21/2020. Signed by Honorable Donald C Coggins, Jr on 12/23/2019. (abuc) (Entered: 12/23/2019)

#6

(#6) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Life Insurance Company of North America.(Shuler, Franklin) (Entered: 12/23/2019)

#4

(#4) Summons Issued as to Life Insurance Company of North America. (abuc) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

#3

(#3) Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Nettie Hickey.(abuc) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

#11

(#11) ORDER DISMISSING CASE without costs and without prejudice to the right of either party, upon good cause shown within sixty (60) days, to reinstate the action if settlement is not consummated. Signed by Honorable Donald C Coggins, Jr on 1/29/20. (alew, ) (Entered: 01/29/2020)

#7

(#7) Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Life Insurance Company of North America.(Shuler, Franklin) (Entered: 12/23/2019)

5 #1

Green card and DOI Letter

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Life Insurance Company of North America (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-8807458.), filed by Nettie Hickey. Service due by 3/3/2020(abuc) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER DISMISSING CASE without costs and without prejudice to the right of either party, upon good cause shown within sixty (60) days, to reinstate the action if settlement is not consummated. Signed by Honorable Donald C Coggins, Jr on 1/29/20. (alew, ) (Entered: 01/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Settlement by Nettie Hickey (Louzri, Melissa) (Entered: 01/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ERISA CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER Joint Stipulation Deadline 4/21/2020. Signed by Honorable Donald C Coggins, Jr on 12/23/2019. (abuc) (Entered: 12/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Life Insurance Company of North America.(Shuler, Franklin) (Entered: 12/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Life Insurance Company of North America.(Shuler, Franklin) (Entered: 12/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Nettie Hickey. Life Insurance Company of North America served on 12/6/2019, answer due 12/27/2019. (Attachments: #1 Green card and DOI Letter)(Louzri, Melissa) (Entered: 12/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to Life Insurance Company of North America. (abuc) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Nettie Hickey.(abuc) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Life Insurance Company of North America (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-8807458.), filed by Nettie Hickey. Service due by 3/3/2020(abuc) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.