This case was last updated from PACER on 03/06/2020 at 07:26:57 (UTC).

Hickey et al v. Monsanto Company

Case Summary

On 01/06/2020 Hickey filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against Monsanto Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Vince Chhabria. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-00119

  • Filing Date:

    01/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Vince Chhabria

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

James Terrence Hickey, III

Vickie L Hickey

Defendant

Monsanto Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Wes Scott Larsen

Attorney at James and Vernon PA

1626 Lincoln Way

Coeur D Alene, ID 83814

Defendant Attorney

Joe G. Hollingsworth

Attorney at Hollingsworth LLP

1350 I Street, N.W.

Washington, DC 20005

 

Court Documents

#3

(#3) NOTICE by All Plaintiffs Regarding Potential Multidistrict Litigation Case (Larsen, Wes) (Entered: 11/26/2019)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#6

(#6) Case transferred in from District of Washington Eastern; Case Number 2:19-cv-00391. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 01/06/2020)

#7

(#7) ANSWER to Complaint with jury demand byMonsanto Company. (Hollingsworth, Joe) (Filed on 1/22/2020) (Entered: 01/22/2020)

#8

(#8) Certificate of Interested Entities by Monsanto Company identifying Other Affiliate Bayer AG for Monsanto Company. (Hollingsworth, Joe) (Filed on 1/22/2020) (Entered: 01/22/2020)

1 #2

Summons

#9

(#9) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Monsanto Company identifying Other Affiliate Bayer AG for Monsanto Company. (Hollingsworth, Joe) (Filed on 1/22/2020) (Entered: 01/22/2020)

#4

(#4) CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER. Case transferred to Northern District of California. Signed by John W. Nichols, Clerk of MDL Panel. (JW, ECF Admin) (Entered: 12/16/2019)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400; Receipt # 0980-3310839) Jury Demand. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Larsen, Wes) (Entered: 11/14/2019)

6 #1

*Restricted*

#2

(#2) Summons Issued as to Monsanto Company. (AY, Case Administrator) (Entered: 11/15/2019)

#5

(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by James Terrence Hickey, III, Vickie L Hickey re Monsanto Company. (Larsen, Wes) (Entered: 12/20/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Monsanto Company identifying Other Affiliate Bayer AG for Monsanto Company. (Hollingsworth, Joe) (Filed on 1/22/2020) (Entered: 01/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Certificate of Interested Entities by Monsanto Company identifying Other Affiliate Bayer AG for Monsanto Company. (Hollingsworth, Joe) (Filed on 1/22/2020) (Entered: 01/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ANSWER to Complaint with jury demand byMonsanto Company. (Hollingsworth, Joe) (Filed on 1/22/2020) (Entered: 01/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • DocketMEMBER CASE OPENED: Washington Eastern, 2:19-cv-00391, Hickey et al v. Monsanto Company, Opened in California Northern District as 3:20-cv-00119-VC pursuant to Conditional Transfer Order 172 cc: JPMDL (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2020) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Case transferred in from District of Washington Eastern; Case Number 2:19-cv-00391. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by James Terrence Hickey, III, Vickie L Hickey re Monsanto Company. (Larsen, Wes) (Entered: 12/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER. Case transferred to Northern District of California. Signed by John W. Nichols, Clerk of MDL Panel. (JW, ECF Admin) (Entered: 12/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE by All Plaintiffs Regarding Potential Multidistrict Litigation Case (Larsen, Wes) (Entered: 11/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Summons Issued as to Monsanto Company. (AY, Case Administrator) (Entered: 11/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • Notice of Judge Assignment. Judge Salvador Mendoza, Jr assigned to case. (AY, Case Administrator) (Entered: 11/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400; Receipt # 0980-3310839) Jury Demand. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Larsen, Wes) (Entered: 11/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less