This case was last updated from PACER on 03/20/2020 at 07:26:37 (UTC).

H.H. Franchising Systems, Inc. v. Spearson et al

Case Summary

On 01/20/2020 H H Franchising Systems, Inc filed a Contract - Franchise lawsuit against Spearson. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Ohio Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Timothy S. Black. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-00049

  • Filing Date:

    01/20/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Franchise

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Ohio Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Timothy S. Black

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

H.H. Franchising Systems, Inc.

Defendants

William Spearson

Tammy Spearson

Sencare, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

William Michael Gustavson

1060 Nimitzview Drive, Suite 212

Cincinnati, OH 45230

 

Court Documents

#6

(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant Sencare, LLC. Sencare, LLC served on 2/29/2020, answer due 3/23/2020. (Gustavson, William) (Entered: 03/13/2020)

#5

(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant William Spearson. William Spearson served on 2/29/2020, answer due 3/23/2020. (Gustavson, William) (Entered: 03/13/2020)

#4

(#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant Tammy Spearson. Tammy Spearson served on 2/29/2020, answer due 3/23/2020. (Gustavson, William) (Entered: 03/13/2020)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to Sencare, LLC, Tammy Spearson, William Spearson. (bjc) (Entered: 01/28/2020)

#2

(#2) REQUEST for Issuance of Summons. for all Defendants (Gustavson, William) (Entered: 01/28/2020)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-7288293), filed by H.H. Franchising Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Gustavson, William) (Entered: 01/20/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant Sencare, LLC. Sencare, LLC served on 2/29/2020, answer due 3/23/2020. (Gustavson, William) (Entered: 03/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant William Spearson. William Spearson served on 2/29/2020, answer due 3/23/2020. (Gustavson, William) (Entered: 03/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant Tammy Spearson. Tammy Spearson served on 2/29/2020, answer due 3/23/2020. (Gustavson, William) (Entered: 03/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to Sencare, LLC, Tammy Spearson, William Spearson. (bjc) (Entered: 01/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) REQUEST for Issuance of Summons. for all Defendants (Gustavson, William) (Entered: 01/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • DocketIf this case is referred, it will be to Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman. (jlw) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-7288293), filed by H.H. Franchising Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Gustavson, William) (Entered: 01/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less