This case was last updated from PACER on 12/20/2020 at 09:01:30 (UTC).

Hevi v. Pelle et al

Case Summary

On 10/21/2020 Hevi filed a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit against Pelle. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Colorado District. The Judge overseeing this case is Gordon P. Gallagher. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-03153

  • Filing Date:

    10/21/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Colorado District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Gordon P. Gallagher

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Percy Hevi

Defendants and Respondents

Joe Pelle

Attorney General for the State of Colorado, The

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Jonathan S. Willett

Attorney at Jonathan S. Willett, The Law Offices of

255 Canyon Boulevard, Suite 100

Boulder, CO 80302

Respondent Attorneys

David Evan Hughes

Attorney at Boulder County Attorney's Office

P.O. Box 471

Boulder, CO 80306

Ryan Alan Crane

Attorney at Colorado Attorney General's Office

1300 Broadway

Denver, CO 80203

 

Court Documents

#12

(#12) MINUTE ORDER On December 17, 2020, Respondent filed a Pre-Answer Response suggesting that this action will be moot on December 25, 2020 when Applicant is scheduled to be released from the Sheriff's custody. Applicant shall file a Reply to the Respondent's suggestion of mootness on or before January 11, 2021, by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 12/18/2020. (evana, ) (Entered: 12/18/2020)

#11

(#11) RESPONSE to #1 Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus Attorney David Evan Hughes added to party Joe Pelle(pty:res)Attorney David Evan Hughes added to party Joe Pelle(pty:res) by Joe Pelle.(Hughes, David) (Entered: 12/17/2020)

#10

(#10) ORDER that the Unopposed Motion to Dismiss Attorney General as a Respondent (ECF No. #9 ), filed on December 1, 2020, is GRANTED. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the Colorado Attorney General is DISMISSED from this action, by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 12/3/2020.(evana, ) (Entered: 12/03/2020)

#9

(#9) Unopposed MOTION to Dismiss Party Colorado Attorney General by Respondent Attorney General for the State of Colorado, The. (Crane, Ryan) (Entered: 12/01/2020)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Jonathan S. Willett on behalf of Percy HeviAttorney Jonathan S. Willett added to party Percy Hevi(pty:pet) (Willett, Jonathan) (Entered: 11/23/2020)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Ryan Alan Crane on behalf of Attorney General for the State of Colorado, TheAttorney Ryan Alan Crane added to party Attorney General for the State of Colorado, The(pty:res) (Crane, Ryan) (Entered: 11/18/2020)

6 #1

USPS Certified Mail Receipt

#6

(#6) CERTIFICATE of Service by Clerk of Court re #1 Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus, #5 ORDER to File Pre-Answer Response for Service of Process. (Attachments: #1 USPS Certified Mail Receipt) (jsalz, ) (Entered: 11/17/2020)

#5

(#5) ORDER TO FILE PRE-ANSWER RESPONSE within thirty (30) days from the date of this order Respondents shall file a pre-answer response that complies with this order. That within thirty (30) days of the filing of the pre-answer response Applicant may file a reply, by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 11/17/2020. (evana, ) (Entered: 11/17/2020)

#4

(#4) Mail Returned as Undeliverable re: 2 Case Assigned to Judge, #1 Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus Addressed to Percy Hevi. (evana, ) (Entered: 11/03/2020)

#3

(#3) ORDER that, Mr. Hevi and Mr. Willett shall clarify, in writing, within 21 days from the date of this Order, whether Mr. Hevi is proceeding pro se in this action, or is being represented by Mr. Willett. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the clerk of the court shall amend Plaintiff's address in the electronic docket as follows: Percy Komla Hevi, c/o Jonathan S. Willett, 255 Canyon Blvd., Suite 100 Boulder, Colorado 80302, by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 10/23/2020. (evana, ) (Entered: 10/23/2020)

1 #3

Envelope

1 #2

Letter

1 #1

Affidavit

#1

(#1) APPLICATION for Writ of Habeas Corpus Pursuant to 28 USC 2254 (Filing fee $ 5, Receipt Number COX096855), filed by Percy Hevi. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Letter, #3 Envelope)(cpomm, ) (Entered: 10/22/2020)

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) MINUTE ORDER On December 17, 2020, Respondent filed a Pre-Answer Response suggesting that this action will be moot on December 25, 2020 when Applicant is scheduled to be released from the Sheriff's custody. Applicant shall file a Reply to the Respondent's suggestion of mootness on or before January 11, 2021, by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 12/18/2020. (evana, ) (Entered: 12/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) RESPONSE to #1 Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus Attorney David Evan Hughes added to party Joe Pelle(pty:res)Attorney David Evan Hughes added to party Joe Pelle(pty:res) by Joe Pelle.(Hughes, David) (Entered: 12/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER that the Unopposed Motion to Dismiss Attorney General as a Respondent (ECF No. #9 ), filed on December 1, 2020, is GRANTED. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the Colorado Attorney General is DISMISSED from this action, by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 12/3/2020.(evana, ) (Entered: 12/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Unopposed MOTION to Dismiss Party Colorado Attorney General by Respondent Attorney General for the State of Colorado, The. (Crane, Ryan) (Entered: 12/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Jonathan S. Willett on behalf of Percy HeviAttorney Jonathan S. Willett added to party Percy Hevi(pty:pet) (Willett, Jonathan) (Entered: 11/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Ryan Alan Crane on behalf of Attorney General for the State of Colorado, TheAttorney Ryan Alan Crane added to party Attorney General for the State of Colorado, The(pty:res) (Crane, Ryan) (Entered: 11/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CERTIFICATE of Service by Clerk of Court re #1 Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus, #5 ORDER to File Pre-Answer Response for Service of Process. (Attachments: #1 USPS Certified Mail Receipt) (jsalz, ) (Entered: 11/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER TO FILE PRE-ANSWER RESPONSE within thirty (30) days from the date of this order Respondents shall file a pre-answer response that complies with this order. That within thirty (30) days of the filing of the pre-answer response Applicant may file a reply, by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 11/17/2020. (evana, ) (Entered: 11/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Mail Returned as Undeliverable re: 2 Case Assigned to Judge, #1 Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus Addressed to Percy Hevi. (evana, ) (Entered: 11/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER that, Mr. Hevi and Mr. Willett shall clarify, in writing, within 21 days from the date of this Order, whether Mr. Hevi is proceeding pro se in this action, or is being represented by Mr. Willett. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the clerk of the court shall amend Plaintiff's address in the electronic docket as follows: Percy Komla Hevi, c/o Jonathan S. Willett, 255 Canyon Blvd., Suite 100 Boulder, Colorado 80302, by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 10/23/2020. (evana, ) (Entered: 10/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • Docket(#2) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher. Text Only Entry (cpomm, ) (Entered: 10/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) APPLICATION for Writ of Habeas Corpus Pursuant to 28 USC 2254 (Filing fee $ 5, Receipt Number COX096855), filed by Percy Hevi. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Letter, #3 Envelope)(cpomm, ) (Entered: 10/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less