This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/05/2021 at 01:11:55 (UTC).

Heuson v. Wal-Mart Stores East LP

Case Summary

On 12/09/2020 Heuson filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Wal-Mart Stores East LP. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Oklahoma Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is David L. Russell. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:20-CV-01240

  • Filing Date:

    12/09/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

David L. Russell

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Heather Heuson

Defendant

Wal-Mart Stores East LP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Scott R Jackson

Attorney at Martin Jean & Jackson - TULSA

1325 E 15Th St, Suite 203

Tulsa, OK 74120

Defendant Attorneys

Michael W Brewer

Attorney at Hiltgen & Brewer

9505 N Kelley

Oklahoma City, OK 73131

Jeffrey D Scott

Attorney at Hiltgen & Brewer

9505 N Kelley

Oklahoma City, OK 73131

 

Court Documents

#10

#9

#8

7 #1

Exhibit 1-Notice to State Court

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

1 #7

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #6

Exhibit 6 - EOA JDS

1 #5

Exhibit 5 - EOA MB

1 #4

Exhibit 4 - Def Answer

1 #3

Exhibit 3 - Summons

1 #2

Exhibit 2 - Petition

1 #1

Exhibit 1 - Docket

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) SCHEDULING ORDER: Motions to amend due 60 days; Motions in limine due 11/22/21; Jury instructions due 11/22/21; Voir dire requests due 11/22/21; Discovery due by 11/1/2021. Jury Trial set for 12/7/2021 09:00 AM in Courtroom 302 before Honorable David L. Russell. Motions due by 10/1/2021. Pretrial Report due by 1/11/2021. Signed by Honorable David L. Russell on 2/8/21. (jw) (Entered: 02/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) JOINT STATUS REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN by Plaintiff Heather Heuson. (Jackson, Scott) (Entered: 02/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) DOCKET: Scheduling Conference set for 2/8/2021 10:15 AM by conference call before Honorable David L. Russell. Status Report due by 2/8/2021. (jw) (Entered: 01/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Wal-Mart Stores East LP (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Notice to State Court)(Brewer, Michael) (Entered: 12/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ENTRY of Appearance by Scott R Jackson on behalf of Heather Heuson (Jackson, Scott) (Entered: 12/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ENTRY of Appearance by Jeffrey D Scott on behalf of Wal-Mart Stores East LP (Scott, Jeffrey) (Entered: 12/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Wal-Mart Stores East LP. (Brewer, Michael) (Entered: 12/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Wal-Mart Stores East LP . (Brewer, Michael) (Entered: 12/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ENTRY of Appearance by Michael W Brewer on behalf of Wal-Mart Stores East LP (Brewer, Michael) (Entered: 12/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • DocketPAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AOKWDC-3444836. (Brewer, Michael) (Entered: 12/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from District Court of Garfield County, case number CJ-2020-125 filed by Wal-Mart Stores East LP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Docket, #2 Exhibit 2 - Petition, #3 Exhibit 3 - Summons, #4 Exhibit 4 - Def Answer, #5 Exhibit 5 - EOA MB, #6 Exhibit 6 - EOA JDS, #7 Civil Cover Sheet)(kmt) (Entered: 12/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Scott R Jackson