This case was last updated from PACER on 03/07/2021 at 07:05:31 (UTC).

Hess v. United Parcel Service, Inc.

Case Summary

On 01/06/2021 Hess filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against United Parcel Service, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is William Alsup. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-CV-00093

  • Filing Date:

    01/06/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Courthouse:

    California Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

William Alsup

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Desdnie Hess

Defendants

United Parcel Service, Inc., an Ohio corporation

United Parcel Service, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Kristabel Sandoval

Attorney at Schneider Wallace Cottrell Konecky LLP

2000 Powell Street, Suite 1400

Emeryville, CA 94608

Carolyn Hunt Cottrell

Attorney at Schneider Wallace Cottrell Konecky LLP

2000 Powell Street, Suite 1400

Emeryville, CA 94608

Kyle G. Bates

Attorney at Schneider Wallace Cottrell Konecky LLP

2000 Powell Street, Suite 1400

Emeryville, CA 94608

Defendant Attorneys

Rachel S. Brass

Attorney at Gibson Dunn & Crutcher LLP

555 Mission Street, Suite 3000

San Francisco, CA 94105-0921

Joseph Richard Rose

Attorney at Gibson Dunn & Crutcher LLP

555 Mission Street, Suite 3000

San Francisco, CA 94105-0921

 

Court Documents

16 #1

Proposed Order

#16

(#16) NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO RULES 12(b)(1) AND 12(b)(6) OF THE FEDERAL RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE filed by United Parcel Service, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 4/22/2021 08:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 12, 19th Floor before Judge William Alsup. Responses due by 3/17/2021. Replies due by 4/7/2021. (Attachments: #1 [Proposed] Order)(Brass, Rachel) (Filed on 2/15/2021) (Entered: 02/15/2021)

#15

(#15) NOTICE AND ORDER RE PUTATIVE CLASS ACTIONS AND FACTORS TO BE EVALUATED FOR ANY PROPOSED CLASS SETTLEMENT AND PROTOCOL FOR INTERVIEWING PUTATIVE CLASS MEMBERS Signed by Judge William Alsup. (whalc4, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/22/2021) (Entered: 01/22/2021)

13 #1

Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording

#13

(#13) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge William Alsup for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by The Clerk on 1/21/21. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/21/2021) (Entered: 01/21/2021)

#11

(#11) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by United Parcel Service, Inc... (Brass, Rachel) (Filed on 1/20/2021) (Entered: 01/20/2021)

#10

(#10) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim granting #9 Stipulation to Extend Briefing Schedule for Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/8/2021) (Entered: 01/08/2021)

9 #1

Proposed Order

#9

(#9) STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER TO EXTEND BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOR DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO L.R. 6-1 AND 6-2 filed by United Parcel Service, Inc.. (Attachments: #(1) Proposed Order)(Rose, Joseph) (Filed on 1/8/2021) (Entered: 01/08/2021)

8 #1

Exhibit A

#8

(#8) NOTICE by United Parcel Service, Inc. OF FILING OF NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH SUPERIOR COURT (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Brass, Rachel) (Filed on 1/7/2021) (Entered: 01/07/2021)

#7

(#7) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: This case may fall within the Initial Discovery Protocols for Employment Cases Alleging Adverse Action. See #General Order 71. Parties and Counsel are directed to review General Order 71 to determine whether it applies to this case, and to comply with that General Order if applicable. Joint Case Management Statement due by 4 /5/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/12/2021 at 1:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom C, 15th Floor. (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2021) (Entered: 01/07/2021)

#6

(#6) Civil Cover Sheet by United Parcel Service, Inc., an Ohio corporation (Corrected). (Brass, Rachel) (Filed on 1/7/2021) (Entered: 01/07/2021)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph Richard Rose for Defendant United Parcel Service, Inc. (Rose, Joseph) (Filed on 1/7/2021) (Entered: 01/07/2021)

1 #3

Certificate/Proof of Service

1 #2

Exhibit A

1 #1

Declaration

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of California, County of Alameda. Their case number is RG20078425, (Filing Fee: $402.00, receipt number 0971-15408273). Filed by United Parcel Service, Inc., an Ohio corporation. (Attachments: #(1) Declaration, #(2) Exhibit A, #(3) Certificate/Proof of Service, #(4) Civil Cover Sheet)(Brass, Rachel) (Filed on 1/6/2021) Modified on 1/7/2021 (tnS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 01/06/2021)

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO RULES 12(b)(1) AND 12(b)(6) OF THE FEDERAL RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE filed by United Parcel Service, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 4/22/2021 08:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 12, 19th Floor before Judge William Alsup. Responses due by 3/17/2021. Replies due by 4/7/2021. (Attachments: #1 [Proposed] Order)(Brass, Rachel) (Filed on 2/15/2021) (Entered: 02/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) NOTICE AND ORDER RE PUTATIVE CLASS ACTIONS AND FACTORS TO BE EVALUATED FOR ANY PROPOSED CLASS SETTLEMENT AND PROTOCOL FOR INTERVIEWING PUTATIVE CLASS MEMBERS Signed by Judge William Alsup. (whalc4, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/22/2021) (Entered: 01/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • Docket(#14) CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ON REASSIGNMENT. Case Management Statement due by 4/1/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/8/2021 at 11:00 AM before Judge William Alsup. Standing orders can be downloaded from the Court's webpage at www.cand.uscourts.gov/whaorders. This proceeding will be held by AT&T Conference Line. The court circulates the following conference number to allow the equivalent of a public hearing by telephone.For conference line information, see: https://apps.cand.uscourts.gov/telhrg/ All counsel, members of the public and press please use the following dial-in information below to access the conference line: Dial In: (888) 684-8852Access Code: 3707514The Court may be in session with proceedings in progress when you connect to the conference line. Therefore, mute your phone if possible and wait for the Court to address you before speaking on the line. For call clarity, parties shall NOT use speaker phone or earpieces for these calls, and where at all possible, parties shall use landlines.PLEASE NOTE: Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. See General Order 58 at Paragraph III. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)(amd2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/21/2021) (Entered: 01/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge William Alsup for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by The Clerk on 1/21/21. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/21/2021) (Entered: 01/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • Docket(#12) CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/21/2021) (Entered: 01/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by United Parcel Service, Inc... (Brass, Rachel) (Filed on 1/20/2021) (Entered: 01/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim granting #9 Stipulation to Extend Briefing Schedule for Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/8/2021) (Entered: 01/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER TO EXTEND BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOR DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO L.R. 6-1 AND 6-2 filed by United Parcel Service, Inc.. (Attachments: #(1) Proposed Order)(Rose, Joseph) (Filed on 1/8/2021) (Entered: 01/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE by United Parcel Service, Inc. OF FILING OF NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH SUPERIOR COURT (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Brass, Rachel) (Filed on 1/7/2021) (Entered: 01/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: This case may fall within the Initial Discovery Protocols for Employment Cases Alleging Adverse Action. See #General Order 71. Parties and Counsel are directed to review General Order 71 to determine whether it applies to this case, and to comply with that General Order if applicable. Joint Case Management Statement due by 4 /5/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/12/2021 at 1:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom C, 15th Floor. (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2021) (Entered: 01/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Civil Cover Sheet by United Parcel Service, Inc., an Ohio corporation (Corrected). (Brass, Rachel) (Filed on 1/7/2021) (Entered: 01/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph Richard Rose for Defendant United Parcel Service, Inc. (Rose, Joseph) (Filed on 1/7/2021) (Entered: 01/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket#Electronic filing error. Case has been randomly assigned to judge, however incorrect Civil Cover Sheet CAND 44 (Rev. 06/17) used at case opening. Please complete and re-file as a separate docket entry correct Civil Cover Sheet JS-CAND 44 (Rev. 10/20 re: #1 . 4 Notice of Removal, filed by United Parcel Service, Inc., an Ohio corporation (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2021) (Entered: 01/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2021
  • Docket(#4) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 1/20/2021. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2021) (Entered: 01/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by United Parcel Service, Inc., an Ohio corporation (Brass, Rachel) (Filed on 1/6/2021) (Entered: 01/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Certificate of Interested Entities filed by United Parcel Service, Inc., an Ohio corporation identifying Corporate Parent United Parcel Service of America, Inc., Corporate Parent UPS Worldwide Forwarding, Inc., Corporate Parent United Parcel Service, Inc. (Delaware) for United Parcel Service, Inc., an Ohio corporation. (Brass, Rachel) (Filed on 1/6/2021) (Entered: 01/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of California, County of Alameda. Their case number is RG20078425, (Filing Fee: $402.00, receipt number 0971-15408273). Filed by United Parcel Service, Inc., an Ohio corporation. (Attachments: #(1) Declaration, #(2) Exhibit A, #(3) Certificate/Proof of Service, #(4) Civil Cover Sheet)(Brass, Rachel) (Filed on 1/6/2021) Modified on 1/7/2021 (tnS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 01/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where United Parcel Service, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Joseph Richard Rose

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Rachel Susan Brass