This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/17/2022 at 08:48:57 (UTC).

HESS v. ST. JOSEPH REGIONAL HEALTH NETWORK

Case Summary

On 11/18/2021 HESS filed a Labor - Family & Medical Leave - Family & Medical Leave lawsuit against ST JOSEPH REGIONAL HEALTH NETWORK. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is JOHN M. GALLAGHER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:21-CV-05097

  • Filing Date:

    11/18/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Family & Medical Leave

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

JOHN M. GALLAGHER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CHRISTINE HESS

Defendant

ST. JOSEPH REGIONAL HEALTH NETWORK doing business as PENN STATE HEALTH ST. JOSEPH

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

MICHAEL GROH

Attorney at MURPHY LAW GROUP, LLC

Eight Penn Center, Suite 2000, 1628 John F Kennedy Blvd

Philadelphia, PA 19103

MICHAEL PATRICK MURPHY, JR.

Attorney at MURPHY LAW GROUP LLC

Eight Penn Center Suite 2000, 1628 John F Kennedy Blvd

Philadelphia, PA 19103

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Certificate of Service

1 #2

Designation Form

1 #3

Case Management Track Form

#2

(#2) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by CHRISTINE HESS. ST. JOSEPH REGIONAL HEALTH NETWORK waiver sent on 11/19/2021, answer due 1/18/2022. (MURPHY, MICHAEL) (Entered: 12/07/2021)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by MICHAEL PATRICK MURPHY, JR on behalf of CHRISTINE HESS with Jury Demand and Certificate of Service(MURPHY, MICHAEL) (Entered: 12/07/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by MICHAEL PATRICK MURPHY, JR on behalf of CHRISTINE HESS with Jury Demand and Certificate of Service(MURPHY, MICHAEL) (Entered: 12/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by CHRISTINE HESS. ST. JOSEPH REGIONAL HEALTH NETWORK waiver sent on 11/19/2021, answer due 1/18/2022. (MURPHY, MICHAEL) (Entered: 12/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • DocketSummons Issued as to ST. JOSEPH REGIONAL HEALTH NETWORK. E-MAILED To: COUNSEL on 11/19/21 (bw, ) (Entered: 11/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • DocketDEMAND for Trial by Jury by CHRISTINE HESS. (JL ) (Entered: 11/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against ST. JOSEPH REGIONAL HEALTH NETWORK ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number APAEDC-15559395.), filed by CHRISTINE HESS. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Designation Form, #3 Case Management Track Form)(GROH, MICHAEL) (Entered: 11/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer MICHAEL GROH

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MICHAEL PATRICK MURPHY, JR.