This case was last updated from PACER on 03/13/2021 at 11:41:08 (UTC).

HERZ v. YOUNG et al

Case Summary

On 01/12/2021 HERZ filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against YOUNG. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Indiana Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Richard L. Young, Matthew P. Brookman and James Patrick Hanlon. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-00075

  • Filing Date:

    01/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Matthew P. Brookman

Presiding Judges

Richard L. Young

James Patrick Hanlon

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAROLYN WENDY HERZ

Indianapolis, IN 46268-1320

Defendants

RECOVERY CENTERS OF AMERICA HOLDINGS LLC

MARC ROTHENBERG

VERIZON WIRELESS

JUDGE JAMES JOVEN

DAVID KENNEDY

SEAN PERSIN

DONALD HARRIS

DENNIS SASSO

ERIC HOLCOMB

RICHARD L. YOUNG

LESLIE PAGE

EVAN GOODMAN

CURTIS HILL

ROBERT E. LEE DAVIES

HILLARY CLINTON

SANDY SASSO

MCI COMMUNICATIONS SERVICES LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

Eric Antonio Pagnamenta

Attorney at INDIANA ATTORNEY GENERAL

Indiana Government Center South, 5Th Floor, 302 West Washington St.

Indianapolis, IN 46204-2770

Jennifer F. Perry

Attorney at CLARK QUINN MOSES SCOTT & GRAHN LLP

320 North Meridian Street, Suite 1100

Indianapolis, IN 46204

Shelese M. Woods

Attorney at UNITED STATES ATTORNEY'S OFFICE (Indianapolis)

10 West Market Street, Suite 2100

Indianapolis, IN 46204

 

Court Documents

#11

(#11) CLOSED JUDGMENT-The Court now enters FINAL JUDGMENT in favor of Defendants and against Plaintiff. This action is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge James Patrick Hanlon on 2/3/2021. Copy sent to Ms.Herz via US Mail(CBU) (Entered: 02/04/2021)

#10

(#10) ORDER Dismissing Action and Directing Final Judgment- The Court finds that the orders making Ms. Herz a restricted filer prevent her from filing documents in this case. Because Ms. Herz cannot proceed, this action is DISMISSED for failure to prosecute. To prevent further abusive litigation by Plaintiff, this dismissal is with prejudice. Signed by Judge James Patrick Hanlon on 2/3/2021 Copy sent to Ms. Herz via US Mail(CBU) (Entered: 02/04/2021)

9 #1

Exhibit Declination to Serve as Successor Trustee

#9

(#9) RESPONSE (Objection) to #6 Order to Show Cause, filed by Plaintiff CAROLYN WENDY HERZ. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declination to Serve as Successor Trustee)(NAD) (Entered: 01/29/2021)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Eric Antonio Pagnamenta on behalf of Defendants EVAN GOODMAN, CURTIS HILL, ERIC HOLCOMB, JAMES JOVEN, SEAN PERSIN, MARC ROTHENBERG. (Pagnamenta, Eric) (Entered: 01/28/2021)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer F. Perry on behalf of Defendants MCI COMMUNICATIONS SERVICES LLC, VERIZON WIRELESS. (Perry, Jennifer) (Entered: 01/22/2021)

#6

(#6) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE AND STAY PROCEEDINGSPlaintiff Carolyn Wendy Herz ("Plaintiff") originally filed this action in Marion Superior Court on December 22, 2020 under Cause No. 49D14-2012-CT-045076. On January 12, 2021, her case was removed to federal court. Until Ms. Herz has satisfied her obligations both before the Seventh Circuit and before this Court, it is not possible for her to litigate her claims. IT IS ORDERED that Ms. Herz has through January 28, 2021 to SHOW CAUSE why this action should not be dismissed because restrictions have been imposed on her ability to file papers in federal courts. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, other than a response to this show cause order, Ms. Herz is prohibited from delivering any documents to the Clerk for filing, and must not attempt to present materials or information to the Court in an indirect fashion, such as by sending a fax or an email to the Court or its personnel except as explicitly provided by General Orders of this Court. To do so would be a violation of the orders of the Court of Appeals and of this Court. Any and all proceedings in this matter are STAYED until the Court acts, either upon Ms. Herz' response to this order, or upon Ms. Herz' failure to respond if no response is made (SEE ORDER FOR ADDITIONAL INFORMATION). Signed by Judge James Patrick Hanlon on 1/14/2021. Copy to Plaintiff via US Mail. (DWH) (Entered: 01/14/2021)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Reassignment of Case to Judge James Patrick Hanlon. Judge Richard L. Young is no longer assigned to this case. Please include the new case number, 1:21-cv-00075-JPH-MPB, on all future filings in this matter. (REO) (Entered: 01/13/2021)

#4

(#4) ORDER OF RECUSAL. Clerk is directed to randomly reassign case and notify parties of newly assigned Judge. Signed by Judge Richard L. Young on 1/13/2021. (TMD) (Entered: 01/13/2021)

#3

(#3) MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (JRB) (Entered: 01/13/2021)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Shelese M. Woods on behalf of Defendant RICHARD L. YOUNG. (Woods, Shelese) (Entered: 01/12/2021)

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

State Court Record Summons, Complaint, Appearance

1 #1

State Court Record State Court Complaint

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Marion County Circuit/Superior Courts, case number 49D14-2012-CT-045076, filed by RICHARD L. YOUNG. (No fee paid with this filing) (Attachments: #1 State Court Record State Court Complaint, #2 State Court Record Summons, Complaint, Appearance, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Woods, Shelese) (Entered: 01/12/2021)

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) CLOSED JUDGMENT-The Court now enters FINAL JUDGMENT in favor of Defendants and against Plaintiff. This action is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge James Patrick Hanlon on 2/3/2021. Copy sent to Ms.Herz via US Mail(CBU) (Entered: 02/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER Dismissing Action and Directing Final Judgment- The Court finds that the orders making Ms. Herz a restricted filer prevent her from filing documents in this case. Because Ms. Herz cannot proceed, this action is DISMISSED for failure to prosecute. To prevent further abusive litigation by Plaintiff, this dismissal is with prejudice. Signed by Judge James Patrick Hanlon on 2/3/2021 Copy sent to Ms. Herz via US Mail(CBU) (Entered: 02/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) RESPONSE (Objection) to #6 Order to Show Cause, filed by Plaintiff CAROLYN WENDY HERZ. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declination to Serve as Successor Trustee)(NAD) (Entered: 01/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Eric Antonio Pagnamenta on behalf of Defendants EVAN GOODMAN, CURTIS HILL, ERIC HOLCOMB, JAMES JOVEN, SEAN PERSIN, MARC ROTHENBERG. (Pagnamenta, Eric) (Entered: 01/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer F. Perry on behalf of Defendants MCI COMMUNICATIONS SERVICES LLC, VERIZON WIRELESS. (Perry, Jennifer) (Entered: 01/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE AND STAY PROCEEDINGSPlaintiff Carolyn Wendy Herz ("Plaintiff") originally filed this action in Marion Superior Court on December 22, 2020 under Cause No. 49D14-2012-CT-045076. On January 12, 2021, her case was removed to federal court. Until Ms. Herz has satisfied her obligations both before the Seventh Circuit and before this Court, it is not possible for her to litigate her claims. IT IS ORDERED that Ms. Herz has through January 28, 2021 to SHOW CAUSE why this action should not be dismissed because restrictions have been imposed on her ability to file papers in federal courts. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, other than a response to this show cause order, Ms. Herz is prohibited from delivering any documents to the Clerk for filing, and must not attempt to present materials or information to the Court in an indirect fashion, such as by sending a fax or an email to the Court or its personnel except as explicitly provided by General Orders of this Court. To do so would be a violation of the orders of the Court of Appeals and of this Court. Any and all proceedings in this matter are STAYED until the Court acts, either upon Ms. Herz' response to this order, or upon Ms. Herz' failure to respond if no response is made (SEE ORDER FOR ADDITIONAL INFORMATION). Signed by Judge James Patrick Hanlon on 1/14/2021. Copy to Plaintiff via US Mail. (DWH) (Entered: 01/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Reassignment of Case to Judge James Patrick Hanlon. Judge Richard L. Young is no longer assigned to this case. Please include the new case number, 1:21-cv-00075-JPH-MPB, on all future filings in this matter. (REO) (Entered: 01/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER OF RECUSAL. Clerk is directed to randomly reassign case and notify parties of newly assigned Judge. Signed by Judge Richard L. Young on 1/13/2021. (TMD) (Entered: 01/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (JRB) (Entered: 01/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Shelese M. Woods on behalf of Defendant RICHARD L. YOUNG. (Woods, Shelese) (Entered: 01/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Marion County Circuit/Superior Courts, case number 49D14-2012-CT-045076, filed by RICHARD L. YOUNG. (No fee paid with this filing) (Attachments: #1 State Court Record State Court Complaint, #2 State Court Record Summons, Complaint, Appearance, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Woods, Shelese) (Entered: 01/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where RECOVERY CENTERS OF AMERICA HOLDINGS LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where MCI Communications Services, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Shelese M. Woods