Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 05/14/2021 at 10:16:59 (UTC).

HERZ v. UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT FOR THE SOUTHERN DISTRICT OF INDIANA et al

Case Summary

On 03/15/2021 HERZ filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT FOR THE SOUTHERN DISTRICT OF INDIANA. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Indiana Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Debra McVicker Lynch, Tanya Walton Pratt and Jane Magnus-Stinson. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-00618

  • Filing Date:

    03/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Indiana Southern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Debra McVicker Lynch

Presiding Judges

Tanya Walton Pratt

Jane Magnus-Stinson

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAROLYN WENDY HERZ

Indianapolis, IN 46268-1320

Defendants

DONALD HARRIS

MARC ROTHENBERG

VERIZON WIRELESS

MCI COMMUNICATIONS SERVICES LLC

ROBERT E. LEE DAVIES

UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT FOR THE SOUTHERN DISTRICT OF INDIANA

SEAN PERSIN

DENNIS SASSO

ERIC HOLCOMB

LESLIE PAGE

JONATHAN ADLAND

EVAN GOODMAN

THEODORE ROKITA

MARION SUPERIOR COURT

SANDY SASSO

DAVID "RANDY&quo KENNEDY

DAVID RANDY KENNEDY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

Alexander Robert Carlisle

Attorney at OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL

5Th Floor, 302 West Washington Street

Indianapolis, IN 46204

Eric Antonio Pagnamenta

Attorney at INDIANA ATTORNEY GENERAL

Indiana Government Center South, 5Th Floor, 302 West Washington St.

Indianapolis, IN 46204-2770

Shelese M. Woods

Attorney at UNITED STATES ATTORNEY'S OFFICE (Indianapolis)

10 West Market Street, Suite 2100

Indianapolis, IN 46204

 

Court Documents

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Eric Antonio Pagnamenta on behalf of Defendants EVAN GOODMAN, ERIC HOLCOMB, MARION SUPERIOR COURT, SEAN PERSIN, THEODORE ROKITA, MARC ROTHENBERG. (Pagnamenta, Eric) (Entered: 03/25/2021)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Alexander Robert Carlisle on behalf of Defendants EVAN GOODMAN, ERIC HOLCOMB, MARION SUPERIOR COURT, MARC ROTHENBERG. (Carlisle, Alexander) (Entered: 03/25/2021)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Alexander Robert Carlisle on behalf of Defendants SEAN PERSIN, THEODORE ROKITA. (Carlisle, Alexander) (Entered: 03/25/2021)

#6

(#6) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE AND STAY PROCEEDINGS. Until Plaintiff has satisfied her obligations both before the Seventh Circuit and before this Court, it is not possible for her to litigate her claims. IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiff has through April 8, 2021 to SHOW CAUSE why this action should not be dismissed because restrictions have been imposed on her ability to file papers in federal courts. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, other than a response to this show cause order, Plaintiff is prohibited from delivering any documents to the Clerk for filing, and must not attempt to present materials or information to the Court in an indirect fashion, such as by sending a fax or an email to the Court or its personnel except as explicitly provide by General Orders of this Court. To do so would be a violation of the orders of the Court of Appeals and of this Court. Any and all proceedings in this matter are STAYED until the Court acts, either upon Plaintiff's response to this order, or upon Plaintiff's failure to respond if no response is made. Copy to Plaintiff via U.S. Mail. Signed by Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson on 3/17/2021.(MAC) (Entered: 03/17/2021)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Reassignment of Case to Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson. Judge Tanya Walton Pratt is no longer assigned to this case. Please include the new case number, 1:21-cv-00618-JMS-DML, on all future filings in this matter. (REO) (Entered: 03/17/2021)

#4

(#4) ORDER OF RECUSAL. Clerk is directed to randomly reassign case and notify parties of newly assigned Judge. Signed by Judge Tanya Walton Pratt on 3/16/2021.(NAD) Modified on 3/17/2021 - Copy to Plaintiff via US Mail (NAD). (Entered: 03/17/2021)

#3

(#3) MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (AKH) (Entered: 03/16/2021)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Shelese M. Woods on behalf of Defendant UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT FOR THE SOUTHERN DISTRICT OF INDIANA. (Woods, Shelese) (Entered: 03/15/2021)

1 #3

State Court Record Complaint, Summoms, Appearance

1 #2

State Court Record Complaint

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Marion Circuit/Superior Court, case number 49D04-2102-CT-007211, filed by UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT FOR THE SOUTHERN DISTRICT OF INDIANA. (No fee paid with this filing) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 State Court Record Complaint, #3 State Court Record Complaint, Summoms, Appearance)(Woods, Shelese) (Entered: 03/15/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Eric Antonio Pagnamenta on behalf of Defendants EVAN GOODMAN, ERIC HOLCOMB, MARION SUPERIOR COURT, SEAN PERSIN, THEODORE ROKITA, MARC ROTHENBERG. (Pagnamenta, Eric) (Entered: 03/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Alexander Robert Carlisle on behalf of Defendants EVAN GOODMAN, ERIC HOLCOMB, MARION SUPERIOR COURT, MARC ROTHENBERG. (Carlisle, Alexander) (Entered: 03/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Alexander Robert Carlisle on behalf of Defendants SEAN PERSIN, THEODORE ROKITA. (Carlisle, Alexander) (Entered: 03/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE AND STAY PROCEEDINGS. Until Plaintiff has satisfied her obligations both before the Seventh Circuit and before this Court, it is not possible for her to litigate her claims. IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiff has through April 8, 2021 to SHOW CAUSE why this action should not be dismissed because restrictions have been imposed on her ability to file papers in federal courts. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, other than a response to this show cause order, Plaintiff is prohibited from delivering any documents to the Clerk for filing, and must not attempt to present materials or information to the Court in an indirect fashion, such as by sending a fax or an email to the Court or its personnel except as explicitly provide by General Orders of this Court. To do so would be a violation of the orders of the Court of Appeals and of this Court. Any and all proceedings in this matter are STAYED until the Court acts, either upon Plaintiff's response to this order, or upon Plaintiff's failure to respond if no response is made. Copy to Plaintiff via U.S. Mail. Signed by Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson on 3/17/2021.(MAC) (Entered: 03/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Reassignment of Case to Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson. Judge Tanya Walton Pratt is no longer assigned to this case. Please include the new case number, 1:21-cv-00618-JMS-DML, on all future filings in this matter. (REO) (Entered: 03/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER OF RECUSAL. Clerk is directed to randomly reassign case and notify parties of newly assigned Judge. Signed by Judge Tanya Walton Pratt on 3/16/2021.(NAD) Modified on 3/17/2021 - Copy to Plaintiff via US Mail (NAD). (Entered: 03/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (AKH) (Entered: 03/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Shelese M. Woods on behalf of Defendant UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT FOR THE SOUTHERN DISTRICT OF INDIANA. (Woods, Shelese) (Entered: 03/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Marion Circuit/Superior Court, case number 49D04-2102-CT-007211, filed by UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT FOR THE SOUTHERN DISTRICT OF INDIANA. (No fee paid with this filing) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 State Court Record Complaint, #3 State Court Record Complaint, Summoms, Appearance)(Woods, Shelese) (Entered: 03/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MCI Communications Services, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Eric Antonio Pagnamenta

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Alexander Robert Carlisle

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Shelese M. Woods