Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 12/04/2020 at 08:49:49 (UTC).

HERZ v. HOLCOMB et al

Case Summary

On 10/05/2020 HERZ filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against HOLCOMB. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Indiana Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are James R. Sweeney II, Mark J. Dinsmore and Matthew P. Brookman. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-02576

  • Filing Date:

    10/05/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Indiana Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

James R. Sweeney II

Referral Judges

Mark J. Dinsmore

Matthew P. Brookman

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAROLYN WENDY HERZ

Indianapolis, IN 46268-1320

Defendants

RECOVERY CENTERS OF AMERICA HOLDINGS LLC

VERIZON WIRELESS

MCI COMMUNICATIONS SERVICES LLC

WILLIAM BARR

DENNIS SASSO

ERIC HOLCOMB

ASCENSION HEALTH INC

LESLIE PAGE

CURTIS HILL

HILLARY CLINTON

SANDY SASSO

RECOVERY CENTERS OF, AMERICA HOLDINGS, LLC

MCI COMMUNICATIONS SERVICES, LLC

ASCENSION HEALTH, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

Shelese M. Woods

Attorney at UNITED STATES ATTORNEY'S OFFICE (Indianapolis)

10 West Market Street, Suite 2100

Indianapolis, IN 46204

 

Court Documents

#11

(#11) CLOSED JUDGMENT - The Court having this day made its Order directing the entry of final judgment, this action is dismissed with prejudice. (Copy to Plaintiff via U.S. mail) Signed by Judge James R. Sweeney II on 10/28/2020.(JDC) (Entered: 10/28/2020)

#10

(#10) ORDER DISMISSING ACTION AND DIRECTING FINAL JUDGMENT - The Court finds that the orders making Plaintiff a restricted filer prevent her from litigating this case in this Court. Because Plaintiff cannot proceed, this action is DISMISSED for failure to prosecute. To prevent further abusive litigation by Plaintiff, this dismissal is with prejudice. To the extent Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed in State court, Filing No. 7, pends in this removed case, it is DENIED. Judgment consistent with this Order shall now issue. ***SEE ORDER FOR ADDITIONAL INFORMATION*** (Copy to Plaintiff via U.S. mail) Signed by Judge James R. Sweeney II on 10/28/2020.(JDC) (Entered: 10/28/2020)

9 #1

Exhibit Declination to Serve as Successor Trustee

#9

(#9) RESPONSE (Verified Objection to Show Cause Order as Unfair and Unconstitutional), re #8 Order to Show Cause, filed by Plaintiff CAROLYN WENDY HERZ. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declination to Serve as Successor Trustee)(NAD) (Entered: 10/27/2020)

#8

(#8) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE AND STAY PROCEEDINGS - Plaintiff Carolyn Wendy Herz ("Plaintiff") originally filed this action in Marion Superior Court on September 15, 2020 under Cause No. 49D03-2009-CT-031956. On October 5, 2020, her case was removed to federal court. See Filing No. 1, (citing 28 U.S.C. 1442(a) (civil actions brought against the United States, its officers, or agencies may be removed to the United States District Court), 1446). The Court takes notice that Plaintiff is also known as Carolyn H. Srivastava, whose right to file within this Circuit and this Court is restricted. Until Plaintiff has satisfied her obligations both before the Seventh Circuit and before this Court, it is not possible for her to litigate her claims. IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiff has through October 27, 2020 to show cause why this action should not be dismissed because restrictions have been imposed on her ability to file papers in all federal courts. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, other than a response to this show cause order, Plaintiff is prohibited from delivering any documents to the Clerk for filing, and must not attempt to present materials or information to the Court in an indirect fashion, such as by sending a fax or an email to the Court or its personnel, except as explicitly provided by General Orders of this Court. To do so would be a violation of the orders of the Court of Appeals and of this Court. Any and all proceedings in this matter are STAYED until the Court acts, either upon Plaintiff's response to this order, or upon Plaintiff's failure to respond if no response is made. ***SEE ORDER FOR ADDITIONAL INFORMATION*** ( Copy to Plaintiff via U.S. mail) Signed by Judge James R. Sweeney II on 10/13/2020.(JDC) (Entered: 10/13/2020)

7 #1

State Court Record Additional state court documents including Motion for Prelimi

#7

(#7) NOTICE and Submission of Additional State Court Documents, filed by Defendant WILLIAM BARR (Attachments: #1 State Court Record Additional state court documents including Motion for Preliminary Injunction with Exhibits, and Recusal of State Court Judge) (Woods, Shelese) (Entered: 10/08/2020)

#6

(#6) PRACTICES AND PROCEDURES before Judge James R. Sweeney II. (JDC) (Entered: 10/07/2020)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Reassignment of Case to Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman. Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore is no longer assigned to this case. Please include the new case number, 1:20-cv-02576-JRS-MPB, on all future filings in this matter. (AKH) (Entered: 10/06/2020)

#4

(#4) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Clerk is directed to randomly reassign case and notify parties of newly assigned Magistrate Judge. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 10/6/2020. (GD) (Entered: 10/06/2020)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Shelese M. Woods on behalf of Defendant WILLIAM BARR. (Woods, Shelese) (Entered: 10/05/2020)

1 #3

State Court Record Complaint, Summons, Appearance

1 #2

State Court Record Complaint

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Marion Circuit/Superior Court, case number 49D03-2009-CT-031956, filed by WILLIAM BARR. (No fee paid with this filing) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 State Court Record Complaint, #3 State Court Record Complaint, Summons, Appearance)(Woods, Shelese) (Entered: 10/05/2020)

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) CLOSED JUDGMENT - The Court having this day made its Order directing the entry of final judgment, this action is dismissed with prejudice. (Copy to Plaintiff via U.S. mail) Signed by Judge James R. Sweeney II on 10/28/2020.(JDC) (Entered: 10/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER DISMISSING ACTION AND DIRECTING FINAL JUDGMENT - The Court finds that the orders making Plaintiff a restricted filer prevent her from litigating this case in this Court. Because Plaintiff cannot proceed, this action is DISMISSED for failure to prosecute. To prevent further abusive litigation by Plaintiff, this dismissal is with prejudice. To the extent Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed in State court, Filing No. 7, pends in this removed case, it is DENIED. Judgment consistent with this Order shall now issue. ***SEE ORDER FOR ADDITIONAL INFORMATION*** (Copy to Plaintiff via U.S. mail) Signed by Judge James R. Sweeney II on 10/28/2020.(JDC) (Entered: 10/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) RESPONSE (Verified Objection to Show Cause Order as Unfair and Unconstitutional), re #8 Order to Show Cause, filed by Plaintiff CAROLYN WENDY HERZ. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declination to Serve as Successor Trustee)(NAD) (Entered: 10/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE AND STAY PROCEEDINGS - Plaintiff Carolyn Wendy Herz ("Plaintiff") originally filed this action in Marion Superior Court on September 15, 2020 under Cause No. 49D03-2009-CT-031956. On October 5, 2020, her case was removed to federal court. See Filing No. 1, (citing 28 U.S.C. 1442(a) (civil actions brought against the United States, its officers, or agencies may be removed to the United States District Court), 1446). The Court takes notice that Plaintiff is also known as Carolyn H. Srivastava, whose right to file within this Circuit and this Court is restricted. Until Plaintiff has satisfied her obligations both before the Seventh Circuit and before this Court, it is not possible for her to litigate her claims. IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiff has through October 27, 2020 to show cause why this action should not be dismissed because restrictions have been imposed on her ability to file papers in all federal courts. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, other than a response to this show cause order, Plaintiff is prohibited from delivering any documents to the Clerk for filing, and must not attempt to present materials or information to the Court in an indirect fashion, such as by sending a fax or an email to the Court or its personnel, except as explicitly provided by General Orders of this Court. To do so would be a violation of the orders of the Court of Appeals and of this Court. Any and all proceedings in this matter are STAYED until the Court acts, either upon Plaintiff's response to this order, or upon Plaintiff's failure to respond if no response is made. ***SEE ORDER FOR ADDITIONAL INFORMATION*** ( Copy to Plaintiff via U.S. mail) Signed by Judge James R. Sweeney II on 10/13/2020.(JDC) (Entered: 10/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE and Submission of Additional State Court Documents, filed by Defendant WILLIAM BARR (Attachments: #1 State Court Record Additional state court documents including Motion for Preliminary Injunction with Exhibits, and Recusal of State Court Judge) (Woods, Shelese) (Entered: 10/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) PRACTICES AND PROCEDURES before Judge James R. Sweeney II. (JDC) (Entered: 10/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Reassignment of Case to Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman. Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore is no longer assigned to this case. Please include the new case number, 1:20-cv-02576-JRS-MPB, on all future filings in this matter. (AKH) (Entered: 10/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Clerk is directed to randomly reassign case and notify parties of newly assigned Magistrate Judge. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 10/6/2020. (GD) (Entered: 10/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (AKH) (Entered: 10/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Shelese M. Woods on behalf of Defendant WILLIAM BARR. (Woods, Shelese) (Entered: 10/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Marion Circuit/Superior Court, case number 49D03-2009-CT-031956, filed by WILLIAM BARR. (No fee paid with this filing) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 State Court Record Complaint, #3 State Court Record Complaint, Summons, Appearance)(Woods, Shelese) (Entered: 10/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where RECOVERY CENTERS OF AMERICA HOLDINGS LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Ascension Healthcare is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Shelese M. Woods