This case was last updated from PACER on 02/04/2020 at 07:59:43 (UTC).

HERZ v. CONGREGATION BETH-EL ZEDECK et al

Case Summary

On 12/06/2019 HERZ filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against CONGREGATION BETH-EL ZEDECK. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Indiana Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Jane Magnus-Stinson and Tim A. Baker. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-04810

  • Filing Date:

    12/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Indiana Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Jane Magnus-Stinson

Referral Judge

Tim A. Baker

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAROLYN WENDY HERZ

Indianapolis, IN 46268

Defendants

JOE HOGSETT

ETZ CHAIM SEPHARDIC CONGREGATION

JUDGE MARC ROTHENBERG

BILL CLINTON

CONGREGATION BETH-EL ZEDECK

HAL BROXMEYER

INDIANAPOLIS HEBREW CONGREGATION, INC.

DENNIS SASSO

JEWISH FEDERATION OF GREATER INDIANAPOLIS INC

RICHARD L. YOUNG

HILLARY CLINTON

DAVID "RANDY&quo KENNEDY

CONGREGATION SHAAREY TEFILLA

CONGREGATION B'NAI TORAH INC

JACQUELINE HOBBS

PAUL KRAFT

DAVID F. HAMILTON

MARC ROTHENBERG

JEWISH FEDERATION OF GREATER INDIANAPOLIS, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

Steven Michael Crell

Attorney at COHEN GARELICK & GLAZIER

8888 Keystone Crossing Plaza, Suite 800

Indianapolis, IN 46240

Shelese M. Woods

Attorney at UNITED STATES ATTORNEY'S OFFICE (Indianapolis)

10 West Market Street, Suite 2100

Indianapolis, IN 46204

Mollie Ann Slinker

Attorney at INDIANA ATTORNEY GENERAL

302 West Washington Street, Indiana Government Center South, Fifth Floor

Indianapolis, IN 46204

 

Court Documents

15 #1

Envelope

#15

(#15) Submission of state court records from Marion County in Case No. 49D06-1911-CT-049302. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(DJH) (Entered: 01/24/2020)

#14

(#14) CLOSED JUDGMENT - The Court having this day made its Order directing the entry of final judgment, this action is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson on 12/31/2019.(JDH) (Entered: 12/31/2019)

#13

(#13) ORDER DISMISSING ACTION AND DIRECTING FINAL JUDGMENT - The Court finds that the orders making Plaintiff a restricted filer prevent her from litigating this case in this Court. Because Plaintiff cannot proceed, this action is DISMISSED for failure to prosecute. To prevent further abusive litigation by Plaintiff, this dismissal is with prejudice. Judgment consistent with this Order shall now issue. (See Order). Copy to Carolyn Wendy Herz via U.S. mail. Signed by Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson on 12/31/2019.(JDH) (Entered: 12/31/2019)

12 #5

Exhibit 5

12 #4

Exhibit 4

12 #3

Exhibit 3

12 #2

Exhibit 2

12 #1

Exhibit 1

#12

(#12) OBJECTION to #6 Order to Show Cause/Order Staying Case, filed by Plaintiff CAROLYN WENDY HERZ. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5)(JDH) (Entered: 12/30/2019)

11 #1

Envelope

#11

(#11) Submission of State Court Record form Marion County in case number 49D06-1911-CT-049302. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(REO) (Entered: 12/19/2019)

#10

(#10) NOTICE of Appearance by Mollie Ann Slinker on behalf of Defendant MARC ROTHENBERG. (Slinker, Mollie) (Entered: 12/19/2019)

#9

(#9) Corporate Disclosure Statement by CONGREGATION BETH-EL ZEDECK. (Crell, Steven) (Entered: 12/16/2019)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Steven Michael Crell on behalf of Defendant CONGREGATION BETH-EL ZEDECK. (Crell, Steven) (Entered: 12/16/2019)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Steven Michael Crell on behalf of Defendant DENNIS SASSO. (Crell, Steven) (Entered: 12/16/2019)

#6

(#6) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE AND STAY PROCEEDINGS - Until Plaintiff has satisfied her obligations both before the Seventh Circuit and before this Court, it is not possible for her to litigate her claims. IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiff has through January 13, 2020 to show cause why this action should not be dismissed because restrictions have been imposed on her ability to file papers in all federal courts. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, other than a response to this show cause order, Plaintiff is prohibited from delivering any documents to the Clerk for filing, and must not attempt to present materials or information to the Court in an indirect fashion, such as by sending a fax or an email to the Courtor its personnel. To do so would be a violation of the orders of the Court of Appeals and of this Court. Any and all proceedings in this matter are STAYED until the Court acts, either upon Plaintiff's response to this order, or upon Plaintiff's failure to respond if no response is made. (See Order). Copy to Carolyn Wendy Herz via U.S. mail. Signed by Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson on 12/11/2019.(JDH) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

#5

(#5) PROCEDURES AND PRACTICES before Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson. (JDH) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) Submission of state court records from Marion County in Case No. 49D06-1911-CT-049302. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(DJH) (Entered: 01/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) CLOSED JUDGMENT - The Court having this day made its Order directing the entry of final judgment, this action is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson on 12/31/2019.(JDH) (Entered: 12/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ORDER DISMISSING ACTION AND DIRECTING FINAL JUDGMENT - The Court finds that the orders making Plaintiff a restricted filer prevent her from litigating this case in this Court. Because Plaintiff cannot proceed, this action is DISMISSED for failure to prosecute. To prevent further abusive litigation by Plaintiff, this dismissal is with prejudice. Judgment consistent with this Order shall now issue. (See Order). Copy to Carolyn Wendy Herz via U.S. mail. Signed by Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson on 12/31/2019.(JDH) (Entered: 12/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) OBJECTION to #6 Order to Show Cause/Order Staying Case, filed by Plaintiff CAROLYN WENDY HERZ. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5)(JDH) (Entered: 12/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Submission of State Court Record form Marion County in case number 49D06-1911-CT-049302. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(REO) (Entered: 12/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Appearance by Mollie Ann Slinker on behalf of Defendant MARC ROTHENBERG. (Slinker, Mollie) (Entered: 12/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Corporate Disclosure Statement by CONGREGATION BETH-EL ZEDECK. (Crell, Steven) (Entered: 12/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Steven Michael Crell on behalf of Defendant CONGREGATION BETH-EL ZEDECK. (Crell, Steven) (Entered: 12/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Steven Michael Crell on behalf of Defendant DENNIS SASSO. (Crell, Steven) (Entered: 12/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE AND STAY PROCEEDINGS - Until Plaintiff has satisfied her obligations both before the Seventh Circuit and before this Court, it is not possible for her to litigate her claims. IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiff has through January 13, 2020 to show cause why this action should not be dismissed because restrictions have been imposed on her ability to file papers in all federal courts. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, other than a response to this show cause order, Plaintiff is prohibited from delivering any documents to the Clerk for filing, and must not attempt to present materials or information to the Court in an indirect fashion, such as by sending a fax or an email to the Courtor its personnel. To do so would be a violation of the orders of the Court of Appeals and of this Court. Any and all proceedings in this matter are STAYED until the Court acts, either upon Plaintiff's response to this order, or upon Plaintiff's failure to respond if no response is made. (See Order). Copy to Carolyn Wendy Herz via U.S. mail. Signed by Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson on 12/11/2019.(JDH) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) PROCEDURES AND PRACTICES before Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson. (JDH) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (REO) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Shelese M. Woods on behalf of Defendants DAVID F. HAMILTON, RICHARD L. YOUNG. (Woods, Shelese) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Submission of correctly titled Notice of Removal re docket #1 , filed by Defendants DAVID F. HAMILTON, RICHARD L. YOUNG. (Woods, Shelese) Modified on 12/6/2019 (JDH). (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Marion Circuit/Superior Court, case number 49D06-1911-CT-049302, filed by RICHARD L. YOUNG, DAVID F. HAMILTON. (No fee paid with this filing) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 State Court Record Complaint, appearance, summons)(Woods, Shelese) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less