This case was last updated from PACER on 09/07/2021 at 08:07:00 (UTC).

Hertz Realty, Inc. v. Federal Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 07/09/2021 Hertz Realty, Inc filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Federal Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Troy L. Nunley and Allison Claire. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-01204

  • Filing Date:

    07/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Courthouse:

    California Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Troy L. Nunley

Referral Judge

Allison Claire

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Hertz Realty, Inc.

Defendant

Federal Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Robert L. Sallander, Jr.

Attorney at Greenan, Peffer, Sallander & Lally LLP

2000 Crow Canyon Pl., Suite 380

San Ramon, CA 94583

Defendant Attorneys

Eric D Freed, PHV

Stephen S Kempa, PHV

Dina Rebecca Richman

Attorney at Cozen O'Connor

601 S. Figueroa St., Suite 3700

Los Angeles, CA 90017

 

Court Documents

#9

(#9) NOTICE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Hertz Realty, Inc.. (Sallander, Robert) (Entered: 08/11/2021)

#8

(#8) ANSWER with Jury Demand by Federal Insurance Company.(Richman, Dina) (Entered: 08/06/2021)

#7

(#7) ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 7/19/21 GRANTING #5 Application for Pro Hac Vice. Added attorney Eric D Freed, PHV for Federal Insurance Company. The Pro Hac Vice attorney is directed to request electronic filing access through PACER. (Davis, D) (Entered: 07/19/2021)

#6

(#6) ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 7/19/21 GRANTING #4 Application for Pro Hac Vice. Added attorney Stephen S Kempa, PHV for Federal Insurance Company. The Pro Hac Vice attorney is directed to request electronic filing access through PACER. (Davis, D) (Entered: 07/19/2021)

5 #1

Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing

5 #5

Main Document

4 #1

Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing

4 #4

Main Document

#3

(#3) STIPULATION to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint by Federal Insurance Company. (Richman, Dina) (Entered: 07/13/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Hertz Realty, Inc.. (Sallander, Robert) (Entered: 08/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ANSWER with Jury Demand by Federal Insurance Company.(Richman, Dina) (Entered: 08/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 7/19/21 GRANTING #5 Application for Pro Hac Vice. Added attorney Eric D Freed, PHV for Federal Insurance Company. The Pro Hac Vice attorney is directed to request electronic filing access through PACER. (Davis, D) (Entered: 07/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 7/19/21 GRANTING #4 Application for Pro Hac Vice. Added attorney Stephen S Kempa, PHV for Federal Insurance Company. The Pro Hac Vice attorney is directed to request electronic filing access through PACER. (Davis, D) (Entered: 07/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by Federal Insurance Company for attorney Eric D. Freed to appear Pro Hac Vice. (Filing fee $ 225, receipt number ACAEDC-9705250) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing)(Richman, Dina) (Entered: 07/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by Federal Insurance Company for attorney Stephen S. Kempa to appear Pro Hac Vice. (Filing fee $ 225, receipt number ACAEDC-9705150) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing)(Richman, Dina) (Entered: 07/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) STIPULATION to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint by Federal Insurance Company. (Richman, Dina) (Entered: 07/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 VDRP) (Tupolo, A) (Entered: 07/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE of REMOVAL from San Joaquin Superior Court, case number STK-CV-UIC-2021-5070 by Federal Insurance Company. (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACAEDC-9698693) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Certification as to Interested Parties and Disclosure Statement, #5 Certificate of Service of Removal of Action) (Richman, Dina) (Entered: 07/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Federal Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Dina Rebecca Richman