This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/04/2020 at 08:22:15 (UTC).

Hershey v. Epic Match Media LLC et al

Case Summary

On 08/05/2020 Hershey filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Epic Match Media LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Virginia Eastern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Claude M. Hilton and Theresa Carroll Buchanan. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-00890

  • Filing Date:

    08/05/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Claude M. Hilton

Referral Judge

Theresa Carroll Buchanan

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Samuel B Hershey

Samuel B. Hershey

Defendants

Epic Match Media LLC

William J Peterson, Jr.

Epic Match Media, Inc.

William J. Peterson, Jr.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Matthew Brady Tynan

Attorney at Brooks Pierce LLP

230 N Elm Street, 2000 Renaissance Plaza

Greensboro, NC 27401

 

Court Documents

#1

#2

#3

#4

#5

5 #1

Notice

#6

#7

#8

#9

#10

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER granting #7 Motion for Pro hac vice. Signed by District Judge Claude M. Hilton on 9/24/20. (klau, ) (Entered: 09/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Summons Returned Unexecuted by Samuel B. Hershey as to All Defendants. (Tynan, Matthew) (Entered: 09/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Correction re #8 Waiver of Service Executed, The filing user has been notified to file summons returned unexecuted for all defendants. (klau, ) (Entered: 09/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Samuel B. Hershey as to All Defendants sent on 8/7/20, answer due 10/6/20. (Tynan, Matthew) Modified text on 9/22/2020 to add answer due date (klau, ). (Entered: 09/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Eric Michael David and Certification of Local Counsel Mathew Tynan Filing fee $ 75. (Receipt No. 0422-7347254) by Samuel B. Hershey. (aott) (Entered: 08/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE by Samuel B. Hershey of signed Civil Cover Sheet (Tynan, Matthew) (Entered: 08/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons Issued for service by SPS as to Epic Match Media LLC, William J. Peterson, Jr. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (Attachments: #1 Notice)(klau, ) (Entered: 08/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Correction re #2 NOTICE- Civil Cover Sheet, An incomplete, document(missing signature) was filed. The filing user has been notified to refile the document. (klau, ) (Entered: 08/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2020
  • DocketInitial Case Assignment to District Judge Claude M. Hilton and Magistrate Judge Theresa Carroll Buchanan. (klau, ) (Entered: 08/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Proposed Summons to Epic Match Media, LLC by Samuel B Hershey. (Tynan, Matthew) (Entered: 08/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Proposed Summons to William J. Peterson, Jr. by Samuel B Hershey. (Tynan, Matthew) (Entered: 08/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE by Samuel B Hershey of Civil Cover Sheet (Tynan, Matthew) (Entered: 08/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Complaint against Epic Match Media LLC, William J. Peterson, Jr. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-7337599.), filed by Samuel B Hershey.(Tynan, Matthew) Modified text on 8/6/2020 (klau, ). (Entered: 08/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Matthew B. Tynan