This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/09/2021 at 08:21:49 (UTC).

Herrick v. DaVita Inc et al

Case Summary

On 05/10/2021 Herrick filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against DaVita Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, South Carolina District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Donald C Coggins, Jr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    8:21-CV-01398

  • Filing Date:

    05/10/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Donald C Coggins, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Frederick S Herrick, Sr

Defendants

DVA Healthcare Renal Care Inc doing business as DaVita Dialysis of Greenwood also known as Greenwood Dialysis

DaVita Inc

Greenwood Dialysis

DaVita RX LLC

DaVita Accountable Care Solutions LLC

DaVita Kidney Care Contracting LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Raymond P Mullman, Jr

Attorney at Spears Poliakoff and Poole

Po Box 1571

Spartanburg, SC 29304-1571

Gary W Poliakoff

Attorney at Poliakoff and Associates

Po Box 1571

Spartanburg, SC 29304

Defendant Attorneys

Richard Edward McLawhorn, Jr

Attorney at Sweeny Wingate and Barrow

115 Cargill Way, Suite B

Hartsville, SC 29550

Martin S Driggers, Jr

Attorney at Sweeny Wingate and Barrow

115 Cargill Way, Suite B

Hartsville, SC 29550

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

State Court Documents

#3

#4

#7

#8

#9

#10

10 #1

Exhibit Filed Acknowledgment of Removal

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/23/2021
  • Docket(#11) Minute Entry: phone conference held with the Honorable Donald C. Coggins, Jr. The parties are directed to submit responses to Local Civil Rule (D.S.C.) 26.03(14) interrogatories within 14 days. In the event the parties determine it is necessary at this stage, they are further directed to submit a joint proposed amended scheduling order within 14 days. (alew, ) (Entered: 06/23/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE and Acknowledgment of receipt of Notice of Removal by Clerk of Court for Greenwood County. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Filed Acknowledgment of Removal)(McLawhorn, Richard) (Entered: 05/24/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER AND NOTICE SETTING Pretrial Conference. Conference set for Wednesday, 6/23/21 2:00PM before Honorable Donald C Coggins Jr. Defendant's counsel is directed to arrange and initiate the conference call, conference in all other participating counsel, and then connect to chambers at 864-591-5340. Signed by Honorable Donald C Coggins, Jr on 5/21/21. (alew, ) (Entered: 05/21/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 6/10/2021, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 8/4/2021, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 8/30/2021, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 9/28/2021, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 10/18/2021, Discovery due by 11/17/2021, Motion in Limine due by 1/18/2022, Motions due by 12/1/2021, Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures due by 1/25/2022, Jury Selection Deadline 2/15/2022, Mediation Due by 12/15/2021. Signed by Honorable Donald C Coggins, Jr on 5/21/21. (alew, ) (Entered: 05/21/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Frederick S Herrick, Sr.(Poliakoff, Gary) Modified on 5/20/2021 to edit text (alew, ). (Entered: 05/20/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • Docket(#5) CLERK'S NOTICE: Plaintiff's Answers to Local Rule 26.01 Interrogatories are due 14 days (5/24/21) after removal. (alew, ) (Entered: 05/11/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by DVA Healthcare Renal Care Inc, DaVita Accountable Care Solutions LLC, DaVita Inc, DaVita Kidney Care Contracting LLC, DaVita RX LLC.(alew, ) (Entered: 05/11/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ANSWER to State Court Complaint by DVA Healthcare Renal Care Inc, DaVita Accountable Care Solutions LLC, DaVita Inc, DaVita Kidney Care Contracting LLC, DaVita RX LLC.(alew, ) (Entered: 05/11/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Greenwood County Court of Common Pleas, case number 2021-CP-24-00310. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0420-9834253), filed by DaVita RX LLC, DaVita Accountable Care Solutions LLC, DVA Healthcare Renal Care Inc, DaVita Kidney Care Contracting LLC, DaVita Inc. (Attachments: #1 State Court Documents)(alew, ) (Entered: 05/11/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DAVITA KIDNEY CARE CONTRACTING LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where DAVITA RX LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where DAVITA ACCOUNTABLE CARE SOLUTIONS LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where DVA HEALTHCARE RENAL CARE INC. is a litigant