This case was last updated from PACER on 09/25/2020 at 08:36:25 (UTC).

Herrera v. Uber Technologies, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 07/27/2020 Herrera filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Uber Technologies, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Massachusetts District. The Judge overseeing this case is William G. Young. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-11416

  • Filing Date:

    07/27/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Massachusetts District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

William G. Young

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Daniela Herrera

Defendants

James Carl Bohnert

Uber Technologies, Inc.

John Doe

Carol McKenzie

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Sara W. Khan

Attorney at Sheff Law Offices

10 Tremont Street, 7Th Floor

Boston, MA 02108

Donald R. Grady, Jr.

Attorney at Sheff Law Offices

10 Tremont Street, 7Th Floor

Boston, MA 02108

Defendant Attorneys

William J. Flanagan

Attorney at Morrison, Mahoney, & Miller LLP

250 Summer Street

Boston, MA 02210-1181

Christopher G. Betke

Attorney at Coughlin & Betke, LLP

Suite 1450, 175 Federal Street

Boston, MA 02110

Lesley P. Chuang

Attorney at COUGHLIN BETKE LLP

175 Federal Street

Boston, MA 02110

Marykate E. Williams

Attorney at Morrison Mahoney LLP

250 Summer Street

Boston, MA 02210

 

Court Documents

#22

(#22) NOTICE of Appearance by Marykate E. Williams on behalf of Carol McKenzie (Williams, Marykate) (Entered: 09/24/2020)

#21

(#21) ANSWER to #15 Amended Complaint, by James Carl Bohnert.(Flanagan, William) (Entered: 09/22/2020)

#20

(#20) ANSWER to #15 Amended Complaint, by Uber Technologies, Inc..(Chuang, Lesley) (Entered: 09/17/2020)

#19

(#19) NOTICE OF RESCHEDULING. Scheduling Conference reset for 10/21/2020 03:00 PM by video before Judge William G. Young. This hearing will be conducted by video conference. Counsel of record will receive a video conference invite at the email registered in CM/ECF. If you have technical or compatibility issues with the technology, please notify the session's courtroom deputy as soon as possible.Access to the hearing will be made available to the media and public. In order to gain access to the hearing, you must sign up at the following address: #https://forms.mad.uscourts.gov/courtlist.html. For questions regarding access to hearings, you may refer to the Court's general orders and public notices available on #www.mad.uscourts.gov or contact media@mad.uscourts.gov.(Gaudet, Jennifer) (Entered: 09/16/2020)

18 #1

Exhibit A., State Court Record

#18

(#18) STATE COURT Record. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A., State Court Record)(Chuang, Lesley) (Entered: 09/10/2020)

#17

(#17) Summons Issued as to Carol McKenzie. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Paine, Matthew) (Entered: 09/09/2020)

#16

(#16) Plaintiff's Summons Request Letter/request (non-motion) from Sara Khan for Amended Complaint filed 9/8/20. (Khan, Sara) (Entered: 09/08/2020)

#15

(#15) FURTHER AMENDED COMPLAINT Leave Granted 9/4/2020 against Uber Technologies, Inc., Carol McKenzie filed by Daniela Herrera.(Khan, Sara) Modified on 9/9/2020 to Add Parties As Counsel Filed the Amended Complaint Incorrectly on CM/ECF (Paine, Matthew). Modified on 9/16/2020 (Gaudet, Jennifer). (Entered: 09/08/2020)

#7

(#7) ANSWER to #5 Amended Complaint by Uber Technologies, Inc..(Chuang, Lesley) (Entered: 07/28/2020)

#6

(#6) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Uber Technologies, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate SB Cayman 2 Ltd. for Uber Technologies, Inc... (Chuang, Lesley) (Entered: 07/28/2020)

#5

(#7) ANSWER to #5 Amended Complaint by Uber Technologies, Inc..(Chuang, Lesley) (Entered: 07/28/2020)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Lesley P. Chuang on behalf of Uber Technologies, Inc. (Chuang, Lesley) (Entered: 07/27/2020)

1 #4

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

1 #3

Category Form

1 #2

Exhibit B., Pleadings

1 #1

Exhibit A., Complaint

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Uber Technologies, Inc. ( Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-8346618 Fee Status: Filing Fee paid) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A., Complaint, #2 Exhibit B., Pleadings, #3 Category Form, #4 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Betke, Christopher) (Entered: 07/27/2020)

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) NOTICE of Appearance by Marykate E. Williams on behalf of Carol McKenzie (Williams, Marykate) (Entered: 09/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) ANSWER to #15 Amended Complaint, by James Carl Bohnert.(Flanagan, William) (Entered: 09/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) ANSWER to #15 Amended Complaint, by Uber Technologies, Inc..(Chuang, Lesley) (Entered: 09/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) NOTICE OF RESCHEDULING. Scheduling Conference reset for 10/21/2020 03:00 PM by video before Judge William G. Young. This hearing will be conducted by video conference. Counsel of record will receive a video conference invite at the email registered in CM/ECF. If you have technical or compatibility issues with the technology, please notify the session's courtroom deputy as soon as possible.Access to the hearing will be made available to the media and public. In order to gain access to the hearing, you must sign up at the following address: #https://forms.mad.uscourts.gov/courtlist.html. For questions regarding access to hearings, you may refer to the Court's general orders and public notices available on #www.mad.uscourts.gov or contact media@mad.uscourts.gov.(Gaudet, Jennifer) (Entered: 09/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) STATE COURT Record. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A., State Court Record)(Chuang, Lesley) (Entered: 09/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) Summons Issued as to Carol McKenzie. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Paine, Matthew) (Entered: 09/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) Plaintiff's Summons Request Letter/request (non-motion) from Sara Khan for Amended Complaint filed 9/8/20. (Khan, Sara) (Entered: 09/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) FURTHER AMENDED COMPLAINT Leave Granted 9/4/2020 against Uber Technologies, Inc., Carol McKenzie filed by Daniela Herrera.(Khan, Sara) Modified on 9/9/2020 to Add Parties As Counsel Filed the Amended Complaint Incorrectly on CM/ECF (Paine, Matthew). Modified on 9/16/2020 (Gaudet, Jennifer). (Entered: 09/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • Docket(#14) ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Hearing. Scheduling Conference set for 9/17/2020 03:00 PM by video before Judge William G. Young. This hearing will be conducted by video conference. Counsel of record will receive a video conference invite at the email registered in CM/ECF. If you have technical or compatibility issues with the technology, please notify the session's courtroom deputy as soon as possible.Access to the hearing will be made available to the media and public. In order to gain access to the hearing, you must sign up at the following address: #https://forms.mad.uscourts.gov/courtlist.html. For questions regarding access to hearings, you may refer t o the Court's general orders and public notices available on #www.mad.uscourts.gov or contact media@mad.uscourts.gov. (Gaudet, Jennifer) (Entered: 09/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Judge William G. Young: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #10 Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint; Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Counsel must include - Leave to file granted on (date of order)- in the caption of the document. (Gaudet, Jennifer) (Entered: 09/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 08/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint by Daniela Herrera.(Khan, Sara) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/6/2020: #1 Exhibit Proposed Amended Complaint) (Paine, Matthew). (Main Document 10 replaced on 8/6/2020) (Paine, Matthew). Modified on 8/6/2020 to Correct Docket Text and CM/ECF Filing Event As Counsel Filed the Motion for Leave Under the Wrong Event in CM/ECF (Paine, Matthew). (Entered: 08/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Summons Issued as to John Doe. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Paine, Matthew) (Entered: 08/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Letter/request (non-motion) from Plaintiff . (Khan, Sara) (Entered: 08/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ANSWER to #5 Amended Complaint by Uber Technologies, Inc..(Chuang, Lesley) (Entered: 07/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Uber Technologies, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate SB Cayman 2 Ltd. for Uber Technologies, Inc... (Chuang, Lesley) (Entered: 07/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Daniela Herrera.(Khan, Sara) (Entered: 07/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • Docket(#4) Certified Copy of Notice of Removal Provided to Defense Counsel by Email. (Pacho, Arnold) (Entered: 07/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • Docket(#3) ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge William G. Young assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell. (Finn, Mary) (Entered: 07/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Lesley P. Chuang on behalf of Uber Technologies, Inc. (Chuang, Lesley) (Entered: 07/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Uber Technologies, Inc. ( Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-8346618 Fee Status: Filing Fee paid) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A., Complaint, #2 Exhibit B., Pleadings, #3 Category Form, #4 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Betke, Christopher) (Entered: 07/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less