Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 08/03/2019 at 07:50:10 (UTC).

Herrera v. Herbert et al

Case Summary

On 06/04/2019 Herrera filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against Herbert. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Utah District. The Judge overseeing this case is David Nuffer. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:19-CV-00046

  • Filing Date:

    06/04/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Utah District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

David Nuffer

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Daniel Herrera

Gunnison, UT 84634

Defendants

Chyleen A. Richey

Gary R. Herbert

Not Classified By Court

Prisoner Litigation Unit

Correction Section (FYI)

Salt Lake City, UT 84114-0856

 

Court Documents

8 #1

Exhibit Affidavit

#8

(#8) NOTICE OF FILING: Affidavit in Support of Indictment filed by Plaintiff Daniel Herrera. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavit)(kpf) (Entered: 08/01/2019)

#7

(#7) DOCUMENTS LODGED consisting of Letter to the Court re: Certificate of Inmate Account. Note: attached document lodged for reference purposes only; no response required unless specifically ordered by the court. (kpf) (Entered: 07/16/2019)

6 #10

Exhibit Amended Complaint

6 #9

Exhibit 9

6 #8

Exhibit 8

6 #7

Exhibit 7

6 #6

Exhibit 6

6 #5

Exhibit 5

6 #4

Exhibit 4

6 #3

Exhibit 3

6 #2

Exhibit 2

6 #1

Exhibit 1

#6

(#6) MOTION for Leave to File An Amended Complaint filed by Plaintiff Daniel Herrera. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit Amended Complaint)(kpf) (Entered: 07/09/2019)

#5

(#5) DOCUMENTS LODGED consisting of Request for Certificate of Inmate Account. Note: attached document lodged for reference purposes only; no response required unless specifically ordered by the court. (kpf) (Entered: 06/20/2019)

4 #1

Envelope

#4

(#4) COMPLAINT against Gary R. Herbert and Chyleen A. Richey (Originally received by the court on 06/03/2019). (Fee Status: IFP) filed by Daniel Herrera. (Attachments: #1 Envelope ) Assigned to Judge David Nuffer (tlh) Modified on 6/17/2019 by correcting docket text (tlh). (Entered: 06/10/2019)

#2

(#2) MOTION for Service of Process (Prisoner). Summons to be served on: Gary R. Herbert and Chyleen A. Richey filed by Plaintiff Daniel Herrera. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order )(tlh) Modified on 6/10/2019 by correcting filing date (tlh). (Entered: 06/10/2019)

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE OF FILING: Affidavit in Support of Indictment filed by Plaintiff Daniel Herrera. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavit)(kpf) (Entered: 08/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) DOCUMENTS LODGED consisting of Letter to the Court re: Certificate of Inmate Account. Note: attached document lodged for reference purposes only; no response required unless specifically ordered by the court. (kpf) (Entered: 07/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MOTION for Leave to File An Amended Complaint filed by Plaintiff Daniel Herrera. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit Amended Complaint)(kpf) (Entered: 07/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) DOCUMENTS LODGED consisting of Request for Certificate of Inmate Account. Note: attached document lodged for reference purposes only; no response required unless specifically ordered by the court. (kpf) (Entered: 06/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) COMPLAINT against Gary R. Herbert and Chyleen A. Richey (Originally received by the court on 06/03/2019). (Fee Status: IFP) filed by Daniel Herrera. (Attachments: #1 Envelope ) Assigned to Judge David Nuffer (tlh) Modified on 6/17/2019 by correcting docket text (tlh). (Entered: 06/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ORDER denying #2 Motion for Service of Process (Prisoner). ; granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Initial Partial fee: TBD. Plaintiff shall have thirty days from the date of this order to file with the Court a certified copy of his inmate trust account statements. Collection of Fees Sent: No Signed by Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse on 06/07/2019. (tlh) (Entered: 06/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) MOTION for Service of Process (Prisoner). Summons to be served on: Gary R. Herbert and Chyleen A. Richey filed by Plaintiff Daniel Herrera. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order )(tlh) Modified on 6/10/2019 by correcting filing date (tlh). (Entered: 06/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) **SEALED DOCUMENT** MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Assigned to Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse for review, case file forwarded to PLU. (Received by the court on: 06/03/2019) filed by Plaintiff Daniel Herrera. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order )(tlh) (Entered: 06/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Prisoner Litigation Unit is a litigant