This case was last updated from PACER on 07/16/2019 09:48:38

Get the Latest Court Record Available:

Case Summary

On 05/17/2019 a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination case was filed by Herren against Amsted Industries, Inc in the jurisdiction of U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District.

Case Details

  • Case Number 1:19-CV-03359
  • Filing Date 05/17/2019
  • Case Status Pending - Other Pending
  • Case Type Civil Right - Employment Discrimination
  • Jurisdiction U.S. District Courts
  • Judge Charles R. Norgle, Sr
  • Courthouse Illinois Northern District

Party Details

  • Defendant Amsted Industries, Inc., d/b/a Burgess-Norton Mfg. Co., Inc.
  • Represented By
    • Unrepresented
  • Plaintiff Amber Herren
  • Represented By
    • Lisa R. Kane
    • Lisa R. Kane
    • Nicky M Priovolos
  • Defendant Amsted Industries, Inc.
  • Represented By
    • Priya Prakash Khatkhate
    • Jane M. McFetridge

Court Documents

#15

RESTRICTED

Fees Apply
#19

(#19) ORDER: Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Amend the Named...

Fees Apply
18 #6

Exhibit F

Fees Apply
18 #5

Exhibit E

Fees Apply
18 #4

Exhibit D

Fees Apply
18 #3

Exhibit C

Fees Apply
18 #2

Exhibit B

Fees Apply
18 #1

Exhibit A

Fees Apply
#18

(#18) REPLY by Amber Herren to response to motion, #15 to Am...

Fees Apply
#17

(#17) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Charles R. Norgle: M...

Fees Apply
13 #1

Exhibit A

Fees Apply
#13

(#13) MOTION by Plaintiff Amber Herren to amend/correct the ...

Fees Apply

Docket Entries

  • 07/15/2019
  • (#19) ORDER: Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Amend the Named Parties Listed in Plaintiff's Complaint #13 is granted. Plaintiff shall submit an amended complaint on or before August 2, 2019. Signed by the Honorable Charles R. Norgle, Sr on 7/15/2019. Mailed notice(gcy, ) (Entered: 07/15/2019)
  • 07/01/2019
  • (#18) REPLY by Amber Herren to response to motion, #15 to Amend (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Kane, Lisa) (Entered: 07/01/2019)
  • 06/28/2019
  • (#17) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Charles R. Norgle: Motion hearing held on 6/28/2019. Plaintiff is given 21 days to file a Reply to Defendant's Response to Plaintiff's Motion to Amend Named Parties #13 . A status hearing is set for 7/26/2019 at 10:00 a.m. Mailed notice (ewf, ) (Entered: 06/28/2019)
  • 06/28/2019
  • (#16) RESPONSE by Amsted Industries, Inc. to MOTION by Plaintiff Amber Herren to amend/correct the Named Parties Listed in Plaintiff's Complaint #13 Redacted-Defendant's Response to Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Amend the Named Parties Listed in Plaintiff's Complaint (McFetridge, Jane) (Entered: 06/28/2019)
  • 06/26/2019
  • (#15) RESPONSE by Amsted Industries, Inc. to MOTION by Plaintiff Amber Herren to amend/correct the Named Parties Listed in Plaintiff's Complaint #13 DEFENDANT'S RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND THE NAMED PARTIES LISTED IN PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT (McFetridge, Jane) (Entered: 06/26/2019)
  • 06/24/2019
  • (#14) NOTICE of Motion by Lisa R. Kane for presentment of motion to amend/correct #13 before Honorable Charles R. Norgle Sr. on 6/28/2019 at 09:30 AM. (Kane, Lisa) (Entered: 06/24/2019)
  • 06/24/2019
  • (#13) MOTION by Plaintiff Amber Herren to amend/correct the Named Parties Listed in Plaintiff's Complaint (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Kane, Lisa) (Entered: 06/24/2019)
  • 06/19/2019
  • (#12) NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Amsted Industries, Inc. LOCAL RULE 3.2 AND FED. R. CIV. P. 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT OF DEFENDANT BURGESS-NORTON MANUFACTURING CO., INC. (McFetridge, Jane) (Entered: 06/19/2019)
  • 06/19/2019
  • (#11) ANSWER to Complaint DEFENDANT'S ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT by Amsted Industries, Inc.(McFetridge, Jane) (Entered: 06/19/2019)
  • 06/06/2019
  • (#10) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Charles R. Norgle: Motion for extension of time to respond to Plaintiff's complaint #9 is granted. The parties are not required to appear before the court on Friday, June 7, 2019. An Agreed Written Status Report is due on 8/21/2019. Mailed notice (ewf, ) (Entered: 06/06/2019)
  • 06/03/2019
  • (#9) MOTION by Defendant Amsted Industries, Inc. for extension of time to file response/reply as to notice of motion #8 DEFENDANT'S UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT (McFetridge, Jane) (Entered: 06/03/2019)
  • 06/03/2019
  • (#8) NOTICE OF MOTION NOTICE of Motion by Jane M. McFetridge for presentment of before Honorable Charles R. Norgle Sr. on 6/7/2019 at 09:30 AM. (McFetridge, Jane) (Entered: 06/03/2019)
  • 06/03/2019
  • (#7) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Amsted Industries, Inc. by Priya Prakash Khatkhate ATTORNEY APPEARANCE (Khatkhate, Priya) (Entered: 06/03/2019)
  • 06/03/2019
  • (#6) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Amsted Industries, Inc. by Jane M. McFetridge ATTORNEY APPEARANCE (McFetridge, Jane) (Entered: 06/03/2019)
  • 05/22/2019
  • (#5) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Amber Herren by Nicky M Priovolos (Priovolos, Nicky) (Entered: 05/22/2019)
  • 05/22/2019
  • (#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Amber Herren as to Amsted Industries, Inc. on 5/22/2019, answer due 6/12/2019. (Kane, Lisa) (Entered: 05/22/2019)
  • 05/22/2019
  • SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Amsted Industries, Inc. (rc, ) (Entered: 05/22/2019)
  • 05/20/2019
  • CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Charles R. Norgle, Sr. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sidney I. Schenkier. Case assignment: Random assignment. (lma, ) (Entered: 05/20/2019)
  • 05/17/2019
  • (#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Amber Herren by Lisa R. Kane (Kane, Lisa) (Entered: 05/17/2019)
  • 05/17/2019
  • (#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Kane, Lisa) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.