This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/20/2021 at 11:50:49 (UTC).

Herpolsheimer v. Marquis Companies I, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 04/21/2021 Herpolsheimer filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against Marquis Companies I, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Nevada District. The Judges overseeing this case are Richard F. Boulware, II and Elayna J. Youchah. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-00659

  • Filing Date:

    04/21/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Richard F. Boulware, II

Referral Judge

Elayna J. Youchah

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Barbara Herpolsheimer

Defendants

Direct Supply, Inc.

Marquis Companies I, Inc.

Invacare Corporation

Marquis Companies I, Inc. doing business as Marquis Plaza Regency doing business as Marquis Plaza Regency Post Acute Rehab doing business as Marquis Care at Plaza Regency

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Mark G Henness

Attorney at Henness & Haight

8972 Spanish Ridge Avenue

Las Vegas, NV 89148

Stephen Mendenhall

Attorney at Henness and Haight Injury Law

8972 Spanish Ridge Avenue

Las Vegas, NV 89179

Defendant Attorneys

Stephanie M. Zinna

Attorney at Olson, Cannon, Gormley, Angulo & Stoberski

9950 W. Cheyenne Ave.

Las Vegas, NV 89129

Charles M. Seby

Attorney at Bowman and Brooke LLP

2901 N. Central Avenue, Suite 1600

Phoenix, AZ 85012

Mario D Valencia

Attorney at Mario D. Valencia, Attorney at Law, LLC

40 S. Stephanie St., Suite 201

Henderson, NV 89012

David Mortensen

Attorney at Messner Reeves

8945 W Russell Road, Suite 300

Las Vegas, NV 89148

Marjorie E. Kratsas

Attorney at Hall Prangle & Schoonveld

1160 N. Town Center Dr., Ste. 200

Las Vegas, NV 89144

Brittany Lewis

Attorney at Messner Reeves LLP

8945 W. Russell Road, Suite 300

Las Vegas, NV 89148

 

Court Documents

#16

#15

#14

#13

#12

#11

#10

#9

#8

#3

1 #8

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #6

Exhibit 38-47

1 #5

Exhibit 31-37

1 #4

Exhibit 26-30

1 #3

Exhibit 21-25

1 #2

Exhibit 1-20

1 #1

Index

#1

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) REPLY to Response to #13 Motion to Dismiss by Defendant Marquis Companies I, Inc.. (Lewis, Brittany) (Entered: 05/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) RESPONSE to #13 Motion to Dismiss by Plaintiff Barbara Herpolsheimer. Replies due by 5/26/2021. (Henness, Mark) (Entered: 05/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Joint STATUS REPORT by Defendant Invacare Corporation. (Seby, Charles) (Entered: 05/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) MOTION to Dismiss by Defendant Marquis Companies I, Inc.. Responses due by 5/19/2021. (Lewis, Brittany) (Entered: 05/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Marquis Companies I, Inc.. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Kratsas, Marjorie) (Entered: 05/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendant Invacare Corporation. (Seby, Charles) (Entered: 04/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Barbara Herpolsheimer. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Henness, Mark) (Entered: 04/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to #3 Minute Order Removal Case,. Acknowledgement by Defendant Invacare Corporation. (Seby, Charles) (Entered: 04/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Direct Supply, Inc.. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Zinna, Stephanie) (Entered: 04/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ANSWER re #1 Petition for Removal filed by Direct Supply, Inc.. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 6/11/2021.(Zinna, Stephanie) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. (Entered: 04/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Defendant Invacare Corporation. (Seby, Charles) (Entered: 04/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Invacare Corporation. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Seby, Charles) (Entered: 04/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • Docket(#4) STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Judge Richard F. Boulware, II. Judge Boulware's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink: #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - YAW) (Entered: 04/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 4/22/2021. Statement regarding removed action is due by 5/7/2021. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 5/22/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - YAW) (Entered: 04/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • DocketCase randomly assigned to Judge Richard F. Boulware, II and Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah. (YAW) (Entered: 04/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Invacare Corporation. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Seby, Charles) (Entered: 04/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Eighth Judicial District Court, Case Number A-19-799865-C, (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0978-6457542) by Invacare Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Index, #2 Exhibit 1-20, #3 Exhibit 21-25, #4 Exhibit 26-30, #5 Exhibit 31-37, #6 Exhibit 38-47, #7 Exhibit 48-58, #8 Civil Cover Sheet) (Seby, Charles) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. (Entered: 04/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Marquis Companies I, Inc. which will do bsuiness in California as Marquis Quality Healthcare Management is a litigant

Latest cases where Direct Supply, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Invacare Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Mark G Henness