This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/17/2021 at 11:45:17 (UTC).

HERNANDEZ VELAZQUEZ v. OWEN COUNTY MULCH AND EXCAVATING et al

Case Summary

On 04/18/2021 HERNANDEZ VELAZQUEZ filed a Labor - Labor Standard lawsuit against OWEN COUNTY MULCH AND EXCAVATING. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Indiana Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are James Patrick Hanlon and Doris L. Pryor. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-00184

  • Filing Date:

    04/18/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Labor Standard

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

James Patrick Hanlon

Referral Judge

Doris L. Pryor

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ERASTO HERNANDEZ VELAZQUEST

ERASTO HERNANDEZ VELAZQUEZ

Defendants and Counter Claimants

HEATHER BAULT

JASON BAULT

OWEN COUNTY MULCH AND EXCAVATING

Counter Defendant and Plaintiff

ERASTO HERNANDEZ VELAZQUEZ

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorney

Christopher S. Wolcott

Attorney at WOLCOTT LAW FIRM LLC

450 E 96Th Street, Suite 500

Indianapolis, IN 46240

Defendant and Counter Claimant Attorneys

Joseph Neal Bowling

Attorney at LEWIS WAGNER LLP

501 Indiana Avenue, Suite 200

Indianapolis, IN 46202

Janelle P. Kilies

Attorney at LEWIS WAGNER, LLP

1411 Roosevelt Avenue, Suite 102

Indianapolis, IN 46201

 

Court Documents

#11

(#11) ANSWER to #1 Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against ERASTO HERNANDEZ VELAZQUEZ, filed by HEATHER BAULT, JASON BAULT, OWEN COUNTY MULCH AND EXCAVATING.(Kilies, Janelle) (Entered: 06/11/2021)

#10

(#10) ORDER SETTING TELEPHONIC INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE - An Initial Pretrial Conference is set for 7/13/2021 at 3:30 PM (Eastern Time) by Telephone before Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor. The information needed to participate in this telephonic conference will be provided by a separate notification. SEE ORDER for additional instruction. Signed by Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor on 5/14/2021.(KAA) (Entered: 05/14/2021)

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Parties' First Extension of Time re Filing a response to pleading defined by Fed. R. Civ. P. 7(a), filed by Defendants HEATHER BAULT, JASON BAULT, OWEN COUNTY MULCH AND EXCAVATING. (Kilies, Janelle) (Entered: 05/13/2021)

#8

(#8) Corporate Disclosure Statement by OWEN COUNTY MULCH AND EXCAVATING identifying Corporate Parent Jason Bault Trucking for OWEN COUNTY MULCH AND EXCAVATING.. (Kilies, Janelle) (Entered: 05/06/2021)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Janelle P. Kilies on behalf of Defendants HEATHER BAULT, JASON BAULT, OWEN COUNTY MULCH AND EXCAVATING. (Kilies, Janelle) (Entered: 05/06/2021)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph Neal Bowling on behalf of Defendants HEATHER BAULT, JASON BAULT, OWEN COUNTY MULCH AND EXCAVATING. (Bowling, Joseph) (Entered: 05/06/2021)

#5

(#5) PRACTICES AND PROCEDURES before Judge James Patrick Hanlon. (KAA) (Entered: 04/19/2021)

#4

(#4) MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (KAA) (Entered: 04/19/2021)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to HEATHER BAULT, JASON BAULT, OWEN COUNTY MULCH AND EXCAVATING. (KAA) (Entered: 04/19/2021)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher S. Wolcott on behalf of Plaintiff ERASTO HERNANDEZ VELAZQUEST. (Wolcott, Christopher) (Entered: 04/18/2021)

1 #2

Proposed Summons

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against All Defendants, filed by ERASTO HERNANDEZ VELAZQUEST. (Filing fee $402, receipt number 0756-6516413) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Wolcott, Christopher) (Entered: 04/18/2021)

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ANSWER to #1 Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against ERASTO HERNANDEZ VELAZQUEZ, filed by HEATHER BAULT, JASON BAULT, OWEN COUNTY MULCH AND EXCAVATING.(Kilies, Janelle) (Entered: 06/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER SETTING TELEPHONIC INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE - An Initial Pretrial Conference is set for 7/13/2021 at 3:30 PM (Eastern Time) by Telephone before Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor. The information needed to participate in this telephonic conference will be provided by a separate notification. SEE ORDER for additional instruction. Signed by Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor on 5/14/2021.(KAA) (Entered: 05/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Parties' First Extension of Time re Filing a response to pleading defined by Fed. R. Civ. P. 7(a), filed by Defendants HEATHER BAULT, JASON BAULT, OWEN COUNTY MULCH AND EXCAVATING. (Kilies, Janelle) (Entered: 05/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Corporate Disclosure Statement by OWEN COUNTY MULCH AND EXCAVATING identifying Corporate Parent Jason Bault Trucking for OWEN COUNTY MULCH AND EXCAVATING.. (Kilies, Janelle) (Entered: 05/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Janelle P. Kilies on behalf of Defendants HEATHER BAULT, JASON BAULT, OWEN COUNTY MULCH AND EXCAVATING. (Kilies, Janelle) (Entered: 05/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph Neal Bowling on behalf of Defendants HEATHER BAULT, JASON BAULT, OWEN COUNTY MULCH AND EXCAVATING. (Bowling, Joseph) (Entered: 05/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) PRACTICES AND PROCEDURES before Judge James Patrick Hanlon. (KAA) (Entered: 04/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (KAA) (Entered: 04/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to HEATHER BAULT, JASON BAULT, OWEN COUNTY MULCH AND EXCAVATING. (KAA) (Entered: 04/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher S. Wolcott on behalf of Plaintiff ERASTO HERNANDEZ VELAZQUEST. (Wolcott, Christopher) (Entered: 04/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against All Defendants, filed by ERASTO HERNANDEZ VELAZQUEST. (Filing fee $402, receipt number 0756-6516413) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Wolcott, Christopher) (Entered: 04/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Christopher S. Wolcott