This case was last updated from PACER on 07/15/2019 07:46:07

Get the Latest Court Record Available:

Case Summary

On 05/16/2019 a Prisoner - Other Prisoner case was filed by Hernandez against Warden in the jurisdiction of U.S. District Courts, Alabama Northern District.

Case Details

  • Case Number 4:19-CV-00746
  • Filing Date 05/16/2019
  • Case Status Pending - Other Pending
  • Case Type Prisoner - Other Prisoner
  • Jurisdiction U.S. District Courts
  • Judge Staci G Cornelius
  • Courthouse Alabama Northern District

Party Details

  • Defendant Warden
  • Represented By
    • Unrepresented
  • Petitioner Jose Alberto Hernandez
  • Represented By
    • Self Represented
  • Defendant William Barr
  • Represented By
    • Mary Lester Marshall

Court Documents

#9

(#9) MOTION to Consolidate Cases by William Barr. (Marshall,...

Fees Apply
#8

(#8) ORDER denying without prejudice #7 Motion to Appoint Co...

Fees Apply
#7

(#7) MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Jose Alberto Hernandez. (J...

Fees Apply
#6

(#6) REPLY to Respondent's #4 Motion For Extension filed by ...

Fees Apply
#5

(#5) ORDER granting #4 Motion for Extension of Time. The mot...

Fees Apply
#4

(#4) MOTION for Extension of Time by William Barr. (Marshall...

Fees Apply
#3

(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Mary Lester Marshall on behalf ...

Fees Apply
#2

(#2) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE This is an action on a petition for...

Fees Apply
#1

(#1) PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Jose Alber...

Fees Apply

Docket Entries

  • 07/10/2019
  • (#9) MOTION to Consolidate Cases by William Barr. (Marshall, Mary) (Entered: 07/10/2019)
  • 07/09/2019
  • (#8) ORDER denying without prejudice #7 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius on 7/9/2019. (KWC) (Entered: 07/09/2019)
  • 07/03/2019
  • (#7) MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Jose Alberto Hernandez. (JLC) (Entered: 07/03/2019)
  • 06/14/2019
  • (#6) REPLY to Respondent's #4 Motion For Extension filed by Jose Alberto Hernandez. (KWC) (Entered: 06/14/2019)
  • 06/10/2019
  • (#5) ORDER granting #4 Motion for Extension of Time. The motion is GRANTED to the extent the respondent shall have an additional thirty (30) days from the entry date of this order to respond to the show cause order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius on 6/10/2019. (PSM) (Entered: 06/10/2019)
  • 06/07/2019
  • (#4) MOTION for Extension of Time by William Barr. (Marshall, Mary) (Entered: 06/07/2019)
  • 06/07/2019
  • (#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Mary Lester Marshall on behalf of William Barr (Marshall, Mary) (Entered: 06/07/2019)
  • 05/17/2019
  • (#2) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE This is an action on a petition for writ of habeas corpus brought pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2241 by Jose Alberto Hernandez. It is hereby ORDERED that the respondent appear and SHOW CAUSE in writing within twenty-one (21) days from the entry date of this Order, why the relief requested by petitioner should not be granted. Signed by Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius on 5/17/2019. (PSM) (Entered: 05/17/2019)
  • 05/16/2019
  • (#1) PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Jose Alberto Hernandez; Filing fee paid by Jose Alberto Hernandez in the amount of $5.00, receipt number B4601097751.(KWC) (Entered: 05/16/2019)

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.