This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/17/2022 at 08:27:27 (UTC).

Hernandez v. Wal-Mart Stores Texas, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 02/16/2022 Hernandez filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Wal-Mart Stores Texas, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Terry R Means. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:22-CV-00125

  • Filing Date:

    02/16/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Terry R Means

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Islena Hernandez

Defendants

Wal-Mart Stores Texas, LLC

Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.

Wal-Mart Stores Texas LLC

Wal-Mart Stores Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

David Lira Sanchez

Attorney at Trujillo & Sanchez PC

500 E John Carpenter Fwy, Suite 140

Irving, TX 75062

James Duane Trujillo

Attorney at Trujillo & Sanchez PC

500 E John Carpenter Fwy, Suite 140

Irving, TX 75062

Rachel Michelle Verich

Attorney at Law Office of Trujillo & Sanchez, P.C.

500 E. John Carpenter Frwy., Ste. 140

Irving, TX 75062

Jorge Elias Jasso

Attorney at Trujillo & Sanchez PC

500 E John Carpenter Fwy, Suite 140

Irving, TX 75062

Defendant Attorneys

Stacy Hoffman Bruce

Attorney at Cobb Martinez Woodward PLLC

1700 Pacific Avenue, Suite 3100

Dallas, TX 75201

Hannah Louise Hansen

Attorney at Cobb Martinez Woodward PLLC

1700 Pacific Avenue, Suite 3100

Dallas, TX 75201

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Wal-Mart Stores, Inc., Wal-Mart Stores Texas, LLC. (Filing fee $402; receipt number 0539-12607081) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A index, #2 Exhibit(s) B state docket, #3 Exhibit(s) C state pldgs, #4 Exhibit(s) D discl stmt, #5 Cover Sheet, #6 Cover Sheet Supplement) (Bruce, Stacy) (Entered: 02/16/2022)

1 #1

Exhibit(s) A index

1 #2

Exhibit(s) B state docket

1 #3

Exhibit(s) C state pldgs

1 #4

Exhibit(s) D discl stmt

1 #5

Cover Sheet

1 #6

Cover Sheet Supplement

#2

(#2) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Wal-Mart Stores Texas, LLC, Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.. (Bruce, Stacy) (Entered: 02/16/2022)

#3

(#3) New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. File to: Judge Means. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (sre) (Entered: 02/17/2022)

#4

(#4) ORDER TO SUBMIT JOINT STATUS REPORT_AND PROPOSED DISCOVERY PLAN: Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 16(b) and 26(f) and the Court's Civil Justice Expense and Delay Reduction Plan the Court enters this order to promote early settlement of this action and to facilitate entry of the scheduling order required by Rule 16(b). The parties are ordered to electronically file with the clerk of the court the signed joint status report and proposed discovery plan (one instrument) within 28 days of the date of the filing of this order, and to include therein, in separate paragraphs, each of the following matters. (Ordered by Senior Judge Terry R Means on 3/3/2022) (twd) (Entered: 03/03/2022)

#5

(#5) Joint STATUS REPORT and Proposed Discovery Plan filed by Wal-Mart Stores Inc, Wal-Mart Stores Texas LLC. (Bruce, Stacy) (Entered: 03/28/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Joint STATUS REPORT and Proposed Discovery Plan filed by Wal-Mart Stores Inc, Wal-Mart Stores Texas LLC. (Bruce, Stacy) (Entered: 03/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER TO SUBMIT JOINT STATUS REPORT_AND PROPOSED DISCOVERY PLAN: Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 16(b) and 26(f) and the Court's Civil Justice Expense and Delay Reduction Plan the Court enters this order to promote early settlement of this action and to facilitate entry of the scheduling order required by Rule 16(b). The parties are ordered to electronically file with the clerk of the court the signed joint status report and proposed discovery plan (one instrument) within 28 days of the date of the filing of this order, and to include therein, in separate paragraphs, each of the following matters. (Ordered by Senior Judge Terry R Means on 3/3/2022) (twd) (Entered: 03/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. File to: Judge Means. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (sre) (Entered: 02/17/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Wal-Mart Stores Texas, LLC, Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.. (Bruce, Stacy) (Entered: 02/16/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Wal-Mart Stores, Inc., Wal-Mart Stores Texas, LLC. (Filing fee $402; receipt number 0539-12607081) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A index, #2 Exhibit(s) B state docket, #3 Exhibit(s) C state pldgs, #4 Exhibit(s) D discl stmt, #5 Cover Sheet, #6 Cover Sheet Supplement) (Bruce, Stacy) (Entered: 02/16/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Stacy Hoffman Bruce