This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/15/2022 at 08:22:18 (UTC).

Hernandez v. State Farm Fire & Casualty Company

Case Summary

On 11/16/2021 Hernandez filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against State Farm Fire Casualty Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Iowa Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Rebecca Goodgame Ebinger and Helen C. Adams. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:21-CV-00359

  • Filing Date:

    11/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Rebecca Goodgame Ebinger

Referral Judge

Helen C. Adams

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Melissa Hernandez

Defendant

State Farm Fire & Casualty Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Barry S Kaplan

111 E. Church Street

Marshalltown, IA 50158

Barry S. Kaplan

Attorney at KAPLAN & FRESE LLP

111 E. Church Street

Marshalltown, IA 50158

Taylor Jacob Reichardt

Attorney at KAPLAN & FRESE LLP

111 E. Church Street

Marshalltown, IA 50158

Defendant Attorney

Benjamin Michael Weston

Attorney at LEDERER WESTON CRAIG PLC

4401 Westown Parkway, Suite 212

West Des Moines, IA 50266

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by State Farm Fire & Casualty Company from Marshall County District Court, case number LACI011201. Filing fee paid in the amount of $ 402, receipt number 0863-4656565., filed by State Farm Fire & Casualty Company. Rule 16 Notice of Dismissal set for 2/14/2022. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 State Court Pleadings, #3 Local Rule 81.A Statement)(Weston, Benjamin) (Entered: 11/16/2021)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

State Court Pleadings

1 #3

Local Rule 81.A Statement

#2

(#2) ANSWER to Complaint Affirmative Defenses and Jury Demand by State Farm Fire & Casualty Company.(Weston, Benjamin) (Entered: 11/16/2021)

#3

(#3) Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest by State Farm Fire & Casualty Company. (Weston, Benjamin) (Entered: 11/16/2021)

#5

(#5) PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER AND DISCOVERY PLAN . (Weston, Benjamin) (Entered: 12/07/2021)

#7

(#7) ORDER REGARDING FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE REQUIREMENTS. See Order for particulars. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams on 12/14/2021. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Fillable Order, #2 Supplement JERS Instructions) (jsa) (Entered: 12/14/2021)

7 #1

Supplement Fillable Order

7 #2

Supplement JERS Instructions

#8

(#8) ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCES. Telephonic Status Conferences are set for 3/9/2022 at 10:00 AM; 5/9/2022 at 10:00 AM; 7/6/2022 at 10:00 AM; 9/6/2022 at 10:00 AM; 11/16/2022 at 10:00 AM and 1/10/2023 at 10:00 AM before Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams. Counsel shall call 1-877-336-1829 and enter code 1176783. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams on 12/14/2021. (jsa) (Entered: 12/14/2021)

#9

(#9) ORDER adopting #5 PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER AND DISCOVERY PLAN: Initial Disclosures Deadline 12/31/2021. Motions to Add Parties due by 3/4/2022. Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 3/4/2022. Plaintiffs Expert Witness Disclosures due by 8/30/2022. Defendants Expert Witness Disclosures due by 11/4/2022. Plaintiffs Rebuttal Witness Disclosures due by 12/6/2022. Discovery Deadline 1/10/2023. Dispositive Motion Deadline 3/1/2023. Final Pretrial Conference set for 8/2/2023 at 10:00 AM in Des Moines Courthouse before Judge Rebecca Goodgame Ebinger. Jury Trial set for 9/18/2023 at 09:00 AM in Des Moines Courthouse before Judge Rebecca Goodgame Ebinger. Estimated length 4 days. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams on 12/14/2021. (jsa) (Entered: 12/14/2021)

#10

(#10) NOTICE of Appearance by Taylor Jacob Reichardt on behalf of Melissa Hernandez (Reichardt, Taylor) (Entered: 12/14/2021)

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Appearance by Taylor Jacob Reichardt on behalf of Melissa Hernandez (Reichardt, Taylor) (Entered: 12/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER adopting #5 PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER AND DISCOVERY PLAN: Initial Disclosures Deadline 12/31/2021. Motions to Add Parties due by 3/4/2022. Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 3/4/2022. Plaintiffs Expert Witness Disclosures due by 8/30/2022. Defendants Expert Witness Disclosures due by 11/4/2022. Plaintiffs Rebuttal Witness Disclosures due by 12/6/2022. Discovery Deadline 1/10/2023. Dispositive Motion Deadline 3/1/2023. Final Pretrial Conference set for 8/2/2023 at 10:00 AM in Des Moines Courthouse before Judge Rebecca Goodgame Ebinger. Jury Trial set for 9/18/2023 at 09:00 AM in Des Moines Courthouse before Judge Rebecca Goodgame Ebinger. Estimated length 4 days. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams on 12/14/2021. (jsa) (Entered: 12/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCES. Telephonic Status Conferences are set for 3/9/2022 at 10:00 AM; 5/9/2022 at 10:00 AM; 7/6/2022 at 10:00 AM; 9/6/2022 at 10:00 AM; 11/16/2022 at 10:00 AM and 1/10/2023 at 10:00 AM before Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams. Counsel shall call 1-877-336-1829 and enter code 1176783. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams on 12/14/2021. (jsa) (Entered: 12/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER REGARDING FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE REQUIREMENTS. See Order for particulars. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams on 12/14/2021. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Fillable Order, #2 Supplement JERS Instructions) (jsa) (Entered: 12/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • Docket(#6) TEXT MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams: Telephonic Scheduling Conference held on 12/14/2021. Attorney Taylor Richardt appeared for Plaintiff. Attorney Benjamin Michael Weston appeared for Defendant. Status of the case discussed. Separate orders to follow. Total Court Time: 24 minutes. (jsa) (Entered: 12/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER AND DISCOVERY PLAN . (Weston, Benjamin) (Entered: 12/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • Docket(#4) TEXT ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE. A Telephonic Scheduling Conference is set for 12/14/2021 at 11:00 AM before Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams. Counsel shall call 1-877-336-1829 and enter code 1176783. The parties shall file a proposed scheduling order and discovery plan as provided by L.R. 16 by 12/7/2021. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams on 11/16/2021. (jsa) (Entered: 11/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest by State Farm Fire & Casualty Company. (Weston, Benjamin) (Entered: 11/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ANSWER to Complaint Affirmative Defenses and Jury Demand by State Farm Fire & Casualty Company.(Weston, Benjamin) (Entered: 11/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by State Farm Fire & Casualty Company from Marshall County District Court, case number LACI011201. Filing fee paid in the amount of $ 402, receipt number 0863-4656565., filed by State Farm Fire & Casualty Company. Rule 16 Notice of Dismissal set for 2/14/2022. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 State Court Pleadings, #3 Local Rule 81.A Statement)(Weston, Benjamin) (Entered: 11/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where State Farm Fire & Casualty Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Benjamin Michael Weston