This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/11/2019 at 08:22:38 (UTC).

Angelina Hernandez v. Legends Hospitality, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 09/12/2019 Angelina Hernandez filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Legends Hospitality, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Jean P. Rosenbluth and Fernando M. Olguin. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-07928

  • Filing Date:

    09/12/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • Courthouse:

    California Central District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Jean P. Rosenbluth

Presiding Judge

Fernando M. Olguin

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Angelina Hernandez

Defendants

Legends Hospitality, LLC

Does 1 - 50, Inclusive

Does 1 through 50, inclusive

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Edwin Pairavi

Attorney at Pairavi Law PC

1875 Century Park East Suite 480

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Joshua M Mohrsaz

Attorney at Pairavi Law PC

1875 Century Park East Suite 480

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Defendant Attorneys

Lawrence H Stone

Attorney at Jackson Lewis LLP

725 South Figueroa Street Suite 2500

Los Angeles, CA 90017-5408

Jennifer S Gutenberg

Attorney at Jackson Lewis PC

725 South Figueroa Street Suite 2500

Los Angeles, CA 90017-5408

 

Court Documents

#13

(#13) ORDER REMANDING ACTION by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. The above-captioned action shall be remanded to the Superior Court of the State of California for the County of Los Angeles, 111 N. Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012, for lack of subject matter jurisdiction pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1447(c). Case Terminated. Made JS-6 (iv) (Entered: 10/10/2019)

#14

(#14) TRANSMITTAL of documents to Los Angeles Superior Court. A certified copy of the order of remand and a copy of the docket sheet from this court was sent to Los Angeles Superior Court. (iv) (Entered: 10/10/2019)

#12

(#12) ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. Scheduling Conference set for 12/5/2019 at 10:00 AM before Judge Fernando M. Olguin. (cw) (Entered: 09/20/2019)

#10

(#10) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa) (Entered: 09/13/2019)

#9

(#9) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Fernando M. Olguin and Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth. (esa) (Entered: 09/13/2019)

#8

(#8) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Legends Hospitality, LLC, re Declaration #3 , Declaration, #2 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties, #6 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #4 , Notice of Related Case(s) #7 , Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , Corporate Disclosure Statement #5 served on 09/12/2019. (Stone, Lawrence) (Entered: 09/13/2019)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Defendant Legends Hospitality, LLC. Related Case(s): No Related Cases (Stone, Lawrence) (Entered: 09/12/2019)

#6

(#6) Certification and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Legends Hospitality, LLC, identifying Angelina Hernandez, Plaintiff; Edwin Pairavi and Joshua M. Mohrsaz, Plaintiff's Counsel, Legends Hospitality LLC, Defendant, Lawrence H. Stone and Jennifer S. Gutenberg, Defendant's Counsel. (Stone, Lawrence) (Entered: 09/12/2019)

#5

(#5) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Legends Hospitality, LLC identifying Legends Hospitality Holding Company as Corporate Parent. (Stone, Lawrence) (Entered: 09/12/2019)

#4

(#4) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Legends Hospitality, LLC. (Stone, Lawrence) (Entered: 09/12/2019)

#3

(#3) DECLARATION of John Ruzich re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendant Legends Hospitality, LLC. (Stone, Lawrence) (Entered: 09/12/2019)

2 #2

Exhibit B - to Stone Declaration

2 #1

Exhibit A - to Stone Declaration

#2

(#2) DECLARATION of LAWRENCE H. STONE re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendant Legends Hospitality, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - to Stone Declaration, #2 Exhibit B - to Stone Declaration)(Stone, Lawrence) (Entered: 09/12/2019)

1 #2

Exhibit B - to NOR

1 #1

Exhibit A - to NOR

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles Superior Court, case number 19STCV27086 Receipt No: 0973-24429453 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant Legends Hospitality, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - to NOR, #2 Exhibit B - to NOR) (Attorney Lawrence H Stone added to party Legends Hospitality, LLC(pty:dft))(Stone, Lawrence) (Entered: 09/12/2019)

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) Receipt of Copy of Remand Transmittal Letter from Los Angeles Superior Court, Case No. 19STCV27086, acknowledged on 10/16/2019. (iv) (Entered: 11/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) TRANSMITTAL of documents to Los Angeles Superior Court. A certified copy of the order of remand and a copy of the docket sheet from this court was sent to Los Angeles Superior Court. (iv) (Entered: 10/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) ORDER REMANDING ACTION by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. The above-captioned action shall be remanded to the Superior Court of the State of California for the County of Los Angeles, 111 N. Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012, for lack of subject matter jurisdiction pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1447(c). Case Terminated. Made JS-6 (iv) (Entered: 10/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. Scheduling Conference set for 12/5/2019 at 10:00 AM before Judge Fernando M. Olguin. (cw) (Entered: 09/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2019
  • (#11) TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Chambers of Judge Fernando M. Olguin. This matter has been assigned to District Judge Fernando M. Olguin. The Court refers counsel to the Court's Initial Standing Order found on the Court's Website under Judge Olguin's Procedures and Schedules. Please read this Order carefully. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (cw) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 09/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa) (Entered: 09/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Fernando M. Olguin and Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth. (esa) (Entered: 09/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Legends Hospitality, LLC, re Declaration #3 , Declaration, #2 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties, #6 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #4 , Notice of Related Case(s) #7 , Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , Corporate Disclosure Statement #5 served on 09/12/2019. (Stone, Lawrence) (Entered: 09/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • CONFORMED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint filed by defendant Legends Hospitality, LLC. (filed in state court 9/10/19, submitted as document 1, attachment 2)(esa) (Entered: 09/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against defendants Does, Legends Hospitality, LLC, Jury Demand, filed by plaintiff Angelina Hernandez. (filed in state court 8/1/19, submitted as document 1, attachment 1) (esa) (Entered: 09/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Defendant Legends Hospitality, LLC. Related Case(s): No Related Cases (Stone, Lawrence) (Entered: 09/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Certification and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Legends Hospitality, LLC, identifying Angelina Hernandez, Plaintiff; Edwin Pairavi and Joshua M. Mohrsaz, Plaintiff's Counsel, Legends Hospitality LLC, Defendant, Lawrence H. Stone and Jennifer S. Gutenberg, Defendant's Counsel. (Stone, Lawrence) (Entered: 09/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Legends Hospitality, LLC identifying Legends Hospitality Holding Company as Corporate Parent. (Stone, Lawrence) (Entered: 09/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Legends Hospitality, LLC. (Stone, Lawrence) (Entered: 09/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) DECLARATION of John Ruzich re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendant Legends Hospitality, LLC. (Stone, Lawrence) (Entered: 09/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) DECLARATION of LAWRENCE H. STONE re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendant Legends Hospitality, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - to Stone Declaration, #2 Exhibit B - to Stone Declaration)(Stone, Lawrence) (Entered: 09/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles Superior Court, case number 19STCV27086 Receipt No: 0973-24429453 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant Legends Hospitality, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - to NOR, #2 Exhibit B - to NOR) (Attorney Lawrence H Stone added to party Legends Hospitality, LLC(pty:dft))(Stone, Lawrence) (Entered: 09/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LEGENDS HOSPITALITY LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jennifer S Gutenberg

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Lawrence H Stone