This case was last updated from PACER on 07/11/2019 at 10:07:54 (UTC).

Hernandez v. Immigration Customs Enforcement

Case Summary

On 04/10/2019 Hernandez filed a Prisoner - Mandamus lawsuit against Immigration Customs Enforcement. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Oklahoma Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are Shon T. Erwin and David L. Russell. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:19-CV-00326

  • Filing Date:

    04/10/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Mandamus

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Oklahoma Western District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Shon T. Erwin

Presiding Judge

David L. Russell

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Juan Hernandez

Lexington, OK 73051

Defendant

Immigration Customs Enforcement

 

Court Documents

#9

(#9) ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION to the extent it is consistent with this Order for #7 Report and Recommendation. Signed by Honorable David L. Russell on 6/6/19. (jw) (Entered: 06/06/2019)

#7

(#7) REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION -- Based upon the foregoing analysis, it is recommended that the Court dismiss this cause of action pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915A(b) and 1915(e)(2)(B) for failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted. This Report and Recommendation terminates the referral by the District Judge in this matter.Objections to R&R due by 5/31/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shon T. Erwin on 5/14/19. (mc) (Entered: 05/14/2019)

#11

(#11) MOTION to Set Aside Judgment by Juan Hernandez. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(nv) (Entered: 06/28/2019)

#10

(#10) JUDGMENT; In accordance with the Courts Order entered this date, Plaintiffs action is dismissed. Signed by Honorable David L. Russell on 6/6/19. (jw) (Entered: 06/06/2019)

8 #1

Envelope

#8

(#8) OBJECTION TO REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION #7 filed by Juan Hernandez. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(nv) (Entered: 05/30/2019)

#6

(#6) Receipt for Money Received from Juan Hernandez in the amount of $350.00, receipt number OKW500073618 regarding #1 Complaint. Receipt mailed to payor. (nv) (Entered: 04/25/2019)

#5

(#5) ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; However, Plaintiff shall be required to pay the full $350.00 filing fee as set forth hereafter. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that on or before May 8, 2019, Plaintiff pay an initial partial filing fee of $71.08; Moreover, Plaintiff may voluntarily dismiss this action on or before May 8, 2019 without incurring any fees or costs. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shon T. Erwin on 4/16/19. (mc) (Entered: 04/16/2019)

#4

(#4) Enter ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Shon T. Erwin. Motions referred to Shon T. Erwin. Entered at the direction of the Honorable David L. Russell on 04/10/19. (nv) (Entered: 04/11/2019)

#3

(#3) NO PREVIOUS Cases (nv) (Entered: 04/11/2019)

2 #1

Envelope

#2

(#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Juan Hernandez. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(nv) (Entered: 04/11/2019)

1 #2

Envelope

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT titled, "Motion to Compel Agency Action" against Immigration Customs Enforcement filed by Juan Hernandez. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Envelope)(nv) (Entered: 04/11/2019)

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) ORDER denying #11 Motion to Set Aside Judgment, as more fully set out. Signed by Honorable David L. Russell on 7/3/19. (jw) (Entered: 07/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) MOTION to Set Aside Judgment by Juan Hernandez. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(nv) (Entered: 06/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) JUDGMENT; In accordance with the Courts Order entered this date, Plaintiffs action is dismissed. Signed by Honorable David L. Russell on 6/6/19. (jw) (Entered: 06/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION to the extent it is consistent with this Order for #7 Report and Recommendation. Signed by Honorable David L. Russell on 6/6/19. (jw) (Entered: 06/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) OBJECTION TO REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION #7 filed by Juan Hernandez. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(nv) (Entered: 05/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • Magistrate Judge Shon T. Erwin no longer assigned to case. (mc) (Entered: 05/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION -- Based upon the foregoing analysis, it is recommended that the Court dismiss this cause of action pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915A(b) and 1915(e)(2)(B) for failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted. This Report and Recommendation terminates the referral by the District Judge in this matter.Objections to R&R due by 5/31/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shon T. Erwin on 5/14/19. (mc) (Entered: 05/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Receipt for Money Received from Juan Hernandez in the amount of $350.00, receipt number OKW500073618 regarding #1 Complaint. Receipt mailed to payor. (nv) (Entered: 04/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; However, Plaintiff shall be required to pay the full $350.00 filing fee as set forth hereafter. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that on or before May 8, 2019, Plaintiff pay an initial partial filing fee of $71.08; Moreover, Plaintiff may voluntarily dismiss this action on or before May 8, 2019 without incurring any fees or costs. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shon T. Erwin on 4/16/19. (mc) (Entered: 04/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Enter ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Shon T. Erwin. Motions referred to Shon T. Erwin. Entered at the direction of the Honorable David L. Russell on 04/10/19. (nv) (Entered: 04/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NO PREVIOUS Cases (nv) (Entered: 04/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Juan Hernandez. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(nv) (Entered: 04/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT titled, "Motion to Compel Agency Action" against Immigration Customs Enforcement filed by Juan Hernandez. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Envelope)(nv) (Entered: 04/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Immigration and Customs Enforcement is a litigant