This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/13/2020 at 06:44:07 (UTC).

Hernandez v. Huntington Ingalls Incorporated et al

Case Summary

On 12/19/2019 Hernandez filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against Huntington Ingalls Incorporated. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Eastern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Wendy B Vitter, Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr, Janis van Meerveld and Jay C. Zainey. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-14685

  • Filing Date:

    12/19/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Wendy B Vitter

Jay C. Zainey

Referral Judges

Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr

Janis van Meerveld

 

Party Details

Defendants, Cross Defendants and 3Rd Party Plaintiffs

Trans American Energy., Ltd.

Liberty Mutual Insurance Company

Borg-Warner Morse Tec LLC

McCarty Corporation

Air & Liquid Systems Corporation

MW Custom Papers

Metropolitan Life Insurance

Huntington Ingalls Incorporated

Cajun Company

General Electric Company

Allied Chemical Corporation

Taylor-Seidenbach Incorporated

Warren Pumps, LLC

Ameron International Corporation

Berkshire Hathaway Specialty Insurance Company

Albert L Bossier, Jr

Goulds Pumps LLC

Foster-Wheeler LLC

Lamorak Insurance Company

International Paper Company

Defendants, Cross Claimants and 3Rd Party Plaintiffs

Huntington Ingalls Incorporated

Albert L Bossier, Jr

Defendants and Cross Defendants

Liberty Mutual Insurance Company

Borg-Warner Morse Tec LLC

McCarty Corporation

Air & Liquid Systems Corporation

MW Custom Papers

Cajun Company

General Electric Company

Allied Chemical Corporation

Taylor-Seidenbach Incorporated

Warren Pumps, LLC

Ameron International Corporation

Berkshire Hathaway Specialty Insurance Company

Goulds Pumps LLC

International Paper Company

75 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant, Cross Defendant and 3Rd Party Plaintiff Attorneys

Bradley Adam Hays

Attorney at MG+M The Law Firm (New Orleans)

365 Canal Street, Suite 3000

New Orleans, LA 70130

Louis Oliver Oubre

Attorney at Simon, Peragine, Smith & Redfearn, LLP (New Orleans)

1100 Poydras St., 30Th Floor

New Orleans, LA 70163-3000

James R. Guidry

Attorney at Simon, Peragine, Smith & Redfearn, LLP (New Orleans)

1100 Poydras St., 30Th Floor

New Orleans, LA 70163-3000

David Michael Melancon

Attorney at Irwin Fritchie Urquhart & Moore, LLC (New Orleans)

400 Poydras St., Suite 2700

New Orleans, LA 70130

Erin Helen Boyd

Attorney at Blue Williams, LLP (Metairie)

3421 N. Causeway Blvd., Suite 900

Metairie, LA 70002

Laura M. Gillen

Attorney at Blue Williams, LLP (Metairie)

3421 N. Causeway Blvd., Suite 900

Metairie, LA 70002

Quincy L. Mouton

Attorney at NeunerPate (Lafayette)

One Petroleum Center, P. O. Drawer 52828, 1001 W. Pinhook Rd., Suite 200

Lafayette, LA 70503

Roth Martin Hainkel

Attorney at Frilot LLC

1100 Poydras, Suite 3800

New Orleans, LA 70163

John Joseph Hainkel, III

Attorney at Frilot L.L.C.

1100 Poydras St., Suite 3700

New Orleans, LA 70163-3700

Christopher Kelly Lightfoot

Attorney at Hailey, McNamara, Hall, Larmann & Papale, LLP (Metairie)

One Galleria Blvd., Suite 1400, P. O. Box 8288

Metairie, LA 70001-8288

Christopher Thomas Whelen

Attorney at Irwin Fritchie Urquhart & Moore, LLC (New Orleans)

400 Poydras St., Suite 2700

New Orleans, LA 70130

Edward Winter Trapolin

Attorney at Irwin Fritchie Urquhart & Moore, LLC

400 Poydras Street, Suite 2700

New Orleans, LA 70130

Samuel Milton Rosamond, III

Attorney at Taylor, Wellons, Politz & Duhe, APLC (New Orleans)

1515 Poydras St., Suite 1900

New Orleans, LA 70112

Thomas Peyton Smith

Attorney at Forman, Watkins & Krutz LLP (New Orleans)

201 St. Charles Ave., Suite 2100

New Orleans, LA 70170

Defendant, Cross Claimant and 3Rd Party Plaintiff Attorneys

David Michael Melancon

Attorney at Irwin Fritchie Urquhart & Moore, LLC (New Orleans)

400 Poydras St., Suite 2700

New Orleans, LA 70130

Erin Helen Boyd

Attorney at Blue Williams, LLP (Metairie)

3421 N. Causeway Blvd., Suite 900

Metairie, LA 70002

Laura M. Gillen

Attorney at Blue Williams, LLP (Metairie)

3421 N. Causeway Blvd., Suite 900

Metairie, LA 70002

Christopher Thomas Whelen

Attorney at Irwin Fritchie Urquhart & Moore, LLC (New Orleans)

400 Poydras St., Suite 2700

New Orleans, LA 70130

Edward Winter Trapolin

Attorney at Irwin Fritchie Urquhart & Moore, LLC

400 Poydras Street, Suite 2700

New Orleans, LA 70130

Defendant and Cross Defendant Attorneys

Bradley Adam Hays

Attorney at MG+M The Law Firm (New Orleans)

365 Canal Street, Suite 3000

New Orleans, LA 70130

Louis Oliver Oubre

Attorney at Simon, Peragine, Smith & Redfearn, LLP (New Orleans)

1100 Poydras St., 30Th Floor

New Orleans, LA 70163-3000

James R. Guidry

Attorney at Simon, Peragine, Smith & Redfearn, LLP (New Orleans)

1100 Poydras St., 30Th Floor

New Orleans, LA 70163-3000

Quincy L. Mouton

Attorney at NeunerPate (Lafayette)

One Petroleum Center, P. O. Drawer 52828, 1001 W. Pinhook Rd., Suite 200

Lafayette, LA 70503

Christopher Kelly Lightfoot

Attorney at Hailey, McNamara, Hall, Larmann & Papale, LLP (Metairie)

One Galleria Blvd., Suite 1400, P. O. Box 8288

Metairie, LA 70001-8288

Thomas Peyton Smith

Attorney at Forman, Watkins & Krutz LLP (New Orleans)

201 St. Charles Ave., Suite 2100

New Orleans, LA 70170

Elizabeth Riddell Penn

Attorney at Forman, Watkins, & Krutz , LLP (Jackson)

City Centre Bldg., 210 East Capitol Street, Suite 2200

Jackson, MS 39201-2375

Other Attorneys

Douglas R. Elliott

Attorney at Pugh, Accardo, LLC (New Orleans)

1100 Poydras St., Suite 3300

New Orleans, LA 70163

Gregory M. Anding

Attorney at Kean Miller, LLP (Baton Rouge)

400 Convention St., Suite 700, Po Box 3513 (70821-3513)

Baton Rouge, LA 70802

Jason Zachary Landry

Attorney at Martzell & Bickford

338 Lafayette St.

New Orleans, LA 70130

Jeffrey Matthew Burg

Attorney at Courington, Kiefer, Sommers, Marullo & Matherne

616 Girod Street, P.O. Box 2350 (70176)

New Orleans, LA 70130

Troy Nathan Bell

Attorney at Courington, Kiefer, Sommers, Marullo & Matherne

616 Girod Street, P.O. Box 2350 (70176)

New Orleans, LA 70130

67 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#139

58 #6

Exhibit E

58 #4

Exhibit C

53 #2

Notice of Submission (Civil Only)

53 #1

Memorandum in Support

52 #2

Notice of Submission (Civil Only)

52 #1

Memorandum in Support

#52

#49

6 #1

Proposed Order

5 #1

Proposed Order

#5

#4

#3

1 #3

Exhibit

1 #2

Exhibit

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

259 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#139) ANSWER to #49 Answer to Complaint - Notice of Removal, Crossclaim by Eagle Inc. Attorney Janice M. Culotta added to party Eagle Inc.(pty:crd).(Culotta, Janice) Modified text on 2/12/2020 (ajn). (Entered: 02/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#138) ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that #52 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Ametek, Inc., #53 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Borg-Warner Morse Tec LLC, and #58 Emergency MOTION to Remand filed by Jesse Hernandez are STAYED until the Fifth Circuit rules on Latiolais. Signed by Judge Jay C. Zainey on 2/7/2019.(ajn) (Entered: 02/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#137) ANSWER to #13 Answer to Complaint - Notice of Removal,,,,, Third Party Complaint,,,,, Crossclaim,,,, by Goulds Pumps LLC.Attorney Lauren Ann McCulloch Semlinger added to party Goulds Pumps LLC(pty:crd).(Semlinger, Lauren) (Entered: 02/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#136) ANSWER to #49 Answer to Complaint - Notice of Removal,,,, Crossclaim,,, of Albert L. Bossier, Jr. and, CROSSCLAIM against Manville Personal Injury Settlement Trust by Hopeman Brothers, Inc.((rec. doc. 13)). (Attachments: #1 Summons)Attorney Brittney Bullock Ankersen added to party Hopeman Brothers, Inc.(pty:crd).(Ankersen, Brittney) (Entered: 02/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#135) ANSWER to #13 Answer to Complaint - Notice of Removal,,,,, Third Party Complaint,,,,, Crossclaim,,,, by Air & Liquid Systems Corporation.Attorney Stacey Leigh Strain added to party Air & Liquid Systems Corporation(pty:crd).(Strain, Stacey) (Entered: 02/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#134) Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Hopeman Brothers, Inc. (Ankersen, Brittney) (Entered: 02/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#133) ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal,, Plaintiffs' Petition by Hopeman Brothers, Inc..Attorney Brittney Bullock Ankersen added to party Hopeman Brothers, Inc.(pty:dft).(Ankersen, Brittney) (Entered: 02/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#132) Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Crane Company (Romero, Jacqueline) (Entered: 02/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#131) ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal,, with Jury Demand by Crane Company.Attorney Jacqueline Romero added to party Crane Company(pty:dft).(Romero, Jacqueline) (Entered: 02/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#130) ORDER granting #127 Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleadings. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Honeywell International Inc. be granted an additional twenty-one (21) days, until March 3, 2020, within which, to file responsive pleadings. Signed by Judge Jay C. Zainey on February 5, 2020. (mp) (Entered: 02/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
119 More Docket Entries
  • 12/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Notice of Compliance by Albert L Bossier, Jr, Huntington Ingalls Incorporated, Lamorak Insurance Company re #1 Notice of Removal. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Melancon, David) Modified on 1/2/2020 (pp). (Entered: 12/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer as to Borgwarner Morse Tec LLC. Signed by Judge Jay C. Zainey on 12/27/19. (jrc) (Entered: 12/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer as to Ametek, Inc. Signed by Judge Jay C. Zainey on 12/27/19. (jrc) (Entered: 12/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Metropolitan Life Insurance identifying Corporate Parent MetLife, Inc. for Metropolitan Life Insurance (Jalenak, Jay) (Entered: 12/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Notice of Removal,, by Borg-Warner Morse Tec LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney Meghan B. Senter added to party Borg-Warner Morse Tec LLC(pty:dft).(Senter, Meghan) (Entered: 12/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Notice of Removal,, by Ametek, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney Meghan B. Senter added to party Ametek, Inc.(pty:dft).(Senter, Meghan) (Entered: 12/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Wendy B Vitter recused. Case reassigned to Judge Jay C. Zainey. Signed by Judge Wendy B Vitter on December 20, 2019.(mp) (Entered: 12/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Directive of the Clerk re Compliance with 28:1447(b).(mp) (Entered: 12/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • Docket(#2) Initial Case Assignment to Judge Wendy B Vitter and Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr. (ess) (Entered: 12/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Civil District Court, Orleans Parish, case number 2019-11689 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAEDC-8036544) filed by Huntington Ingalls Incorporated, Lamorak Insurance Company, Albert L Bossier, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)Attorney David Michael Melancon added to party Albert L Bossier, Jr(pty:dft), Attorney David Michael Melancon added to party Huntington Ingalls Incorporated(pty:dft), Attorney David Michael Melancon added to party Lamorak Insurance Company(pty:dft).(Melancon, David) (Entered: 12/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where The Cajun Company is a litigant

Latest cases where ALLIED CHEMICAL CORP is a litigant

Latest cases where Lamorak Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases where McCarty Corporation is a litigant