This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/13/2021 at 08:17:40 (UTC).

Hernandez v. Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 09/14/2021 Hernandez filed a Labor - Employee Benefit lawsuit against Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are James Lawrence King and Jacqueline Becerra. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-23319

  • Filing Date:

    09/14/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Employee Benefit

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

James Lawrence King

Referral Judge

Jacqueline Becerra

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Emmanuel Hernandez

Defendant

Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Edward Philip Dabdoub

Attorney at Dabdoub Law Firm, PA.

1600 Ponce De Leon Blvd, Suite 1202

Coral Gables, FL 33134

Kevin P Schaefer

13255 S.W. 113 Terrace

Miami, FL 33186

Defendant Attorney

Jonathan Matthew Fordin

Attorney at Shutts & Bowen

200 S Biscayne Boulevard, Suite 4100

Miami, FL 33131

 

Court Documents

#14

(#14) SCHEDULING ORDER: ( Discovery due by 11/9/2022., Motions due by 11/14/2022., Pretrial Stipulation due by 1/6/2023., Calendar Call set for 3/23/2023 10:00 AM in Miami Division before Senior Judge James Lawrence King., Final Pretrial Conference set for 1/13/2023 10:30 AM in Miami Division before Senior Judge James Lawrence King., Bench Trial set for 3/27/2023 09:00 AM in Miami Division before Senior Judge James Lawrence King. All hearings to be held before Judge King will be held in Courtroom II, Eleventh Floor.), ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Becerra for Discovery Matters. Signed by Senior Judge James Lawrence King on 11/8/2021. See attached document for full details. (jw) (Entered: 11/08/2021)

#13

(#13) ANSWER to Complaint by Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company. (Fordin, Jonathan) (Entered: 11/05/2021)

12 #1

Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing

12 #12

Main Document

#11

(#11) ORDER re Suspension. Signed by Senior Judge James Lawrence King on 10/21/2021. See attached document for full details. (cds) (Entered: 10/21/2021)

#10

(#10) ORDER Granting #7 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer to a Complaint or Other Case Initiating Document Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company. Response/Answer due 11/5/2021. Signed by Senior Judge James Lawrence King on 10/7/2021. See attached document for full details. (jw) (Entered: 10/07/2021)

#9

(#9) Plaintiff's Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Emmanuel Hernandez (Dabdoub, Edward) (Entered: 10/06/2021)

#8

(#8) Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company identifying Other Affiliate Jonathan M. fordin, Other Affiliate Shutts and Bowen, Other Affiliate The Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc. for Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company (Fordin, Jonathan) (Entered: 10/06/2021)

7 #1

Text of Proposed Order

7 #7

Main Document

6 #1

Affidavit

6 #6

Main Document

#5

(#5) NOTICE by Emmanuel Hernandez re #4 Order Directing Plaintiff to File Estimated Length of Trial (Dabdoub, Edward) (Entered: 09/21/2021)

#4

(#4) ORDER Directing Plaintiff to File Estimated Length of Trial re #1 Complaint, filed by Emmanuel Hernandez Signed by Senior Judge James Lawrence King on 9/16/2021. See attached document for full details. (jw) (Entered: 09/16/2021)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company. (cds) (Entered: 09/15/2021)

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) SCHEDULING ORDER: ( Discovery due by 11/9/2022., Motions due by 11/14/2022., Pretrial Stipulation due by 1/6/2023., Calendar Call set for 3/23/2023 10:00 AM in Miami Division before Senior Judge James Lawrence King., Final Pretrial Conference set for 1/13/2023 10:30 AM in Miami Division before Senior Judge James Lawrence King., Bench Trial set for 3/27/2023 09:00 AM in Miami Division before Senior Judge James Lawrence King. All hearings to be held before Judge King will be held in Courtroom II, Eleventh Floor.), ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Becerra for Discovery Matters. Signed by Senior Judge James Lawrence King on 11/8/2021. See attached document for full details. (jw) (Entered: 11/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ANSWER to Complaint by Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company. (Fordin, Jonathan) (Entered: 11/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE by Emmanuel Hernandez re #11 Order Certificate of Good Standing (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing) (Dabdoub, Edward) (Entered: 10/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER re Suspension. Signed by Senior Judge James Lawrence King on 10/21/2021. See attached document for full details. (cds) (Entered: 10/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER Granting #7 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer to a Complaint or Other Case Initiating Document Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company. Response/Answer due 11/5/2021. Signed by Senior Judge James Lawrence King on 10/7/2021. See attached document for full details. (jw) (Entered: 10/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Plaintiff's Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Emmanuel Hernandez (Dabdoub, Edward) (Entered: 10/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company identifying Other Affiliate Jonathan M. fordin, Other Affiliate Shutts and Bowen, Other Affiliate The Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc. for Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company (Fordin, Jonathan) (Entered: 10/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Complaint, by Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company. Attorney Jonathan Matthew Fordin added to party Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company(pty:dft). (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Fordin, Jonathan) (Entered: 10/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Emmanuel Hernandez. Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company served on 9/17/2021, answer due 10/8/2021. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Dabdoub, Edward) (Entered: 09/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE by Emmanuel Hernandez re #4 Order Directing Plaintiff to File Estimated Length of Trial (Dabdoub, Edward) (Entered: 09/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER Directing Plaintiff to File Estimated Length of Trial re #1 Complaint, filed by Emmanuel Hernandez Signed by Senior Judge James Lawrence King on 9/16/2021. See attached document for full details. (jw) (Entered: 09/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company. (cds) (Entered: 09/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • Docket(#2) Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Senior Judge James Lawrence King. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Becerra is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (cds) (Entered: 09/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT FOR DISABILITY BENEFITS against Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company. Filing fees $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-15009589, filed by Emmanuel Hernandez. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s))(Dabdoub, Edward) (Entered: 09/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where THE HARTFORD LIFE AND ACCIDENT INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jonathan Matthew Fordin