This case was last updated from PACER on 01/17/2020 at 07:09:19 (UTC).

Hernandez v. Gonzalez

Case Summary

On 11/18/2019 Hernandez filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against Gonzalez. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Keith P Ellison. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:19-CV-04528

  • Filing Date:

    11/18/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Keith P Ellison

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Pablo Hernandez

Houston, TX 77002

Defendants

Sheriff Ed Gonzalez

Byron Garrick

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

Brandon Marc Draper

Attorney at Assistant County Attorney

1019 Congress, 15Th Floor

Houston, TX 77002

 

Court Documents

#4

(#4) Corrected MOTION to Dismiss by Ed Gonzalez, filed. Motion Docket Date 1/29/2020. (Draper, Brandon) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

#3

(#3) MOTION to Dismiss by Ed Gonzalez, filed. Motion Docket Date 12/23/2019. (Draper, Brandon) (Entered: 12/02/2019)

#2

(#2) NOTICE to Pro Se Litigant of Case Opening. Party notified, filed. (RuthGuerreroadi, 4) (Entered: 11/19/2019)

1 #6

Exhibit List of Counsel of Record

1 #5

Exhibit Application to Proceed In Forma Paupers

1 #4

Exhibit Index Of Matters Filed Upon Removal

1 #3

Exhibit Docket Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit Citations

1 #1

Exhibit State Court Original Petition

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 151 Harris County District Court, case number 2019-76533 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-23589945) filed by Ed Gonzalez. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court Original Petition, #2 Exhibit Citations, #3 Exhibit Docket Sheet, #4 Exhibit Index Of Matters Filed Upon Removal, #5 Exhibit Application to Proceed In Forma Paupers, #6 Exhibit List of Counsel of Record)(Draper, Brandon) (Entered: 11/18/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Corrected MOTION to Dismiss by Ed Gonzalez, filed. Motion Docket Date 1/29/2020. (Draper, Brandon) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) MOTION to Dismiss by Ed Gonzalez, filed. Motion Docket Date 12/23/2019. (Draper, Brandon) (Entered: 12/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE to Pro Se Litigant of Case Opening. Party notified, filed. (RuthGuerreroadi, 4) (Entered: 11/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 151 Harris County District Court, case number 2019-76533 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-23589945) filed by Ed Gonzalez. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court Original Petition, #2 Exhibit Citations, #3 Exhibit Docket Sheet, #4 Exhibit Index Of Matters Filed Upon Removal, #5 Exhibit Application to Proceed In Forma Paupers, #6 Exhibit List of Counsel of Record)(Draper, Brandon) (Entered: 11/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.