This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/14/2020 at 08:28:40 (UTC).

Hernandez v. CVS Pharmacy Inc.

Case Summary

On 10/15/2020 Hernandez filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against CVS Pharmacy Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Middle District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Charlene Edwards Honeywell and Julie S. Sneed. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    8:20-CV-02409

  • Filing Date:

    10/15/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Charlene Edwards Honeywell

Referral Judge

Julie S. Sneed

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Makayla Hernandez

Defendants

CVS Pharmacy Inc.

Aurobindo Pharma USA, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Karl Frederick Pansler

Attorney at The Pansler Law Firm, PA

223 N Florida Ave

Lakeland, FL 33801

Christopher Ison

Attorney at The Pansler Law Firm, PA

223 N Florida Ave

Lakeland, FL 33801

Defendant Attorneys

Robert Christopher Folland

Attorney at Barnes & Thornburg, LLP

4540 Pga Blvd., Ste. 208

Palm Beach Gardens, FL 33418

Kyle A. Diamantas

Attorney at Baker, Donelson, Bearman, Caldwell & Berkowitz, PC

200 S Orange Ave

Orlando, FL 32801

Jessica M. Heinz

Attorney at Cipriani & Werner, P.C.

450 Sentry Parkway E., Suite 200

Blue Bell, PA 19422

 

Court Documents

#28

#26

#25

#23

15 #4

Exhibit Ex. D - Transfer Order

15 #3

Exhibit Ex. C - Motion to Transfer (Hernandez)

15 #2

Exhibit Ex. B - JPML Clerk Entry

15 #1

Exhibit Ex. A - Notice of Potential Tag-Along

#15

#7

6 #1

Notice of Potential Tag-along Action

#6

#4

#3

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit Consent to Removal

1 #1

State Court COMPLAINT

#1

27 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) ORDER: 1. Defendants' Time-Sensitive Motion to Stay Proceedings Pending a Decision by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation #15 is GRANTED. 2. All proceedings in this case are STAYED until either: (1) thirty (30) days after the JPML's decision, if transfer is denied; or (2) the date established by the scheduling order adopted by the transferee judge in the United States District Court for the District of New Jersey, Camden Division, if the JPML grants transfer. 3. Defendants shall promptly file a notice advising the Court of the JPML's decision after the issuance of such decision. Further, any party may move to lift the stay and return this case to active status after the JPML enters a decision on the motion to transfer. 4. The Clerk is directed to terminate all pending motions and administratively close this case. Signed by Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell on 11/23/2020. (GLP) (Entered: 11/23/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) ENDORSED ORDER granting #26 Motion to Appear Telephonically at Case Management Conference. The parties may attend and conduct their case management conference by telephone. Signed by Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell on 11/23/2020. (GLP) (Entered: 11/23/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) MOTION for Defendants' counsel to appear telephonically at Case Management Conference by Aurobindo Pharma USA, INC.. (Diamantas, Kyle) (Entered: 11/20/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) ORDER granting #23 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Julie S. Sneed on November 17, 2020. (BRC) (Entered: 11/17/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) ENDORSED ORDER directing the Clerk to STRIKE Plaintiff's Reply to Defendant Aurobindo Pharma USA, Inc.'s Answer and Affirmative Defenses #22. A reply to an answer is allowed only if ordered by the Court. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 7(a)(7). The Court did not order Plaintiff to file a reply. Signed by Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell on 11/16/2020. (GLP) (Entered: 11/16/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) MOTION for Ernest F. Koschineg to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. 113A-17556121 for $150 by Aurobindo Pharma USA, INC.. (Diamantas, Kyle) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Julie S. Sneed. (Entered: 11/16/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) ***STRICKEN PURSUANT TO ORDER 24***REPLY to affirmative defenses by Makayla Hernandez. (Pansler, Karl) Modified on 11/17/2020 (CTR). (Entered: 11/16/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) ORDER: The Court will take no further action on the Order to Show Cause #7, and it is hereby DISCHARGED. Signed by Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell on 11/16/2020. (GLP) (Entered: 11/16/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • DocketFEE PAID. Fee for pro hac vice appearance, Receipt No. 113A-17542066 for $150 paid. Special Admission for Non-Resident Attorney Jessica M. Heinz. (Heinz, Jessica) (Entered: 11/12/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) ORDER granting #16 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Julie S. Sneed on November 9, 2020. (BRC) (Entered: 11/09/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 10/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #4 Interested persons order by CVS Pharmacy Inc. identifying Corporate Parent CVS Health Corporation for CVS Pharmacy Inc. (Folland, Robert) Modified on 10/30/2020 (DG). (Entered: 10/30/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ENDORSED ORDER granting #6 Opposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Defendant's answer or response due by November 6, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Julie S. Sneed on October 26, 2020. (BRC) (Entered: 10/26/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Defendant CVS Pharmacy, Inc. is directed to SHOW CAUSE as to why this case should not be remanded for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. Defendant CVS Pharmacy, Inc. shall file a written response with the Court within FOURTEEN (14) DAYS from the date of this Order. Failure to respond within the time provided will result in the remand of this action without further notice. Signed by Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell on 10/26/2020. (GLP) (Entered: 10/26/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Plaintiff's Complaint by CVS Pharmacy Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Potential Tag-along Action)(Folland, Robert) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Julie S. Sneed. (Entered: 10/22/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE to counsel Jessica M. Heinz of Local Rule 2.02, Special Admission to Practice - Pay the $150.00 Special Admission Fee; Complete the E-Filer Registration Form to obtain a login and password for CM/ECF; Local counsel must electronically file a Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of the non-resident attorney. (Signed by Deputy Clerk) (JLD) (Entered: 10/22/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • DocketREFUND for duplicate payment. Receipt number 113A-17430263 refunded in the amount of $ 400.00 paid to Robert Folland.. (NLC) (Entered: 10/20/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER. Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 10/30/2020. Signed by Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell on 10/16/2020. (BGS) (Entered: 10/16/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 10/30/2020. Signed by Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell on 10/16/2020. (BGS) (Entered: 10/16/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • Docket(#2) NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell and Magistrate Judge Julie S. Sneed. New case number: 8:20-cv-2409-T-36JSS. (SJB) (Entered: 10/15/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from the Circuit Court of the Tenth Judicial Circuit in and for Polk County, Florida, case number 20-CA-2907 filed in State Court on 09/21/2020. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 113A-17430374 filed by CVS Pharmacy Inc. (Attachments: #1 State Court COMPLAINT, #2 Exhibit Consent to Removal, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Folland, Robert) Modified on 10/15/2020 (JLD). (Entered: 10/15/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Aurobindo Pharma USA, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where CVS Pharmacy, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jessica Margaret Heinz

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kyle A. Diamantas, PHV