This case was last updated from PACER on 04/21/2019 at 07:10:45 (UTC).

Andreas Hernandez v. City of Culver City, et al

Case Summary

On 02/20/2019 Andreas Hernandez filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against City of Culver City. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Otis D. Wright, II and Karen L. Stevenson. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-01267

  • Filing Date:

    02/20/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Central District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Otis D. Wright, II

Referral Judge

Karen L. Stevenson

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ANDREAS HERNANDEZ

Defendants

OFFICER SAM HAWKINS

OFFICER WILLIAM KUTYLO

CITY OF CULVER CITY, [also erroneously named and sued herein as Culver City Police Department]

CITY OF CULVER CITY

FNU Gamboa

Does 1 through 50, Inclusive

Culver City Police Department

William Kutylo

Scott Bixby

Sam Hawkins

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Austin Richard Dove

Attorney at Law Offices of Austin Dove

555 West 5Th Street 35Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90013

Defendant Attorneys

Katrina Joy Valencia

Attorney at Carpenter Rothans and Dumont LLP

500 South Grand Avenue 19Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Steven J Rothans

Attorney at Carpenter Rothans and Dumont LLP

500 South Grand Avenue 19Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071

 

Court Documents

15 #1

Proposed Order

#15

(#15) STIPULATION to AMEND Amended Complaint/Petition #11 filed by Defendants City of Culver City, Sam Hawkins, William Kutylo(in his official capacity as a police officer for the City of Culver City). (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Attorney Katrina Joy Valencia added to party William Kutylo(pty:dft))(Valencia, Katrina) (Entered: 04/17/2019)

#16

(#16) ORDER REGARDING PLAINTIFF'S FILING OF A SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT #15 by Judge Otis D. Wright, I:, Plaintiff ANDREAS HERNANDEZ shall file a Second Amended Complaint no later than April 24, 2019 and Defendants shall file a responsive pleading thereto no later than May 15, 2019. (lc) Modified on 4/17/2019 (lc). (Entered: 04/17/2019)

#11

(#11) FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendant All Defendants amending Complaint - (Discovery), JURY DEMAND, filed by Plaintiff Andreas Hernandez(Dove, Austin) (Entered: 04/01/2019)

#14

(#14) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Andreas Hernandez. (Dove, Austin) (Entered: 04/05/2019)

#13

(#13) Notice of Interested Parties and Certificate of Service NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Andreas Hernandez, (Dove, Austin) (Entered: 04/05/2019)

#12

(#12) NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Amended Complaint/Petition #11 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 7.1-1 No Notice of Interested Parties and/or no copies. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (lom) (Entered: 04/04/2019)

#9

(#9) Joint STIPULATION to AMEND Complaint - (Discovery), filed by Defendants City of Culver City, Sam Hawkins, William Kutylo. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Regarding Plaintiff's Filing of a First Amended Complaint)(Valencia, Katrina) (Entered: 02/25/2019)

9 #1

Proposed Order Regarding Plaintiff's Filing of a First Amended Complaint

#10

(#10) ORDER REGARDING PLAINTIFF'S FILING OF A FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT #9 by Judge Otis D. Wright, II. The Court finds that Plaintiff ANDREAS HERNANDEZ shall file a First Amended Complaint no later than March 27, 2019 and Defendants shall file a responsive pleading thereto no later than April 17, 2019. (lom) (Entered: 02/26/2019)

#8

(#8) MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge Otis D. Wright, II. This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge Otis D. Wright II. Counsel are STRONGLY encouraged to review the Central District's website for additional information. See document for other requirement. (lom) (Entered: 02/21/2019)

#7

(#7) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa) (Entered: 02/21/2019)

#6

(#6) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Otis D. Wright, II and Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson. (esa) (Entered: 02/21/2019)

#4

(#4) NOTICE TO ADVERSE PARTY OF REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT filed by Defendants CITY OF CULVER CITY, [also erroneously named and sued herein as Culver City Police Department], OFFICER SAM HAWKINS, OFFICER WILLIAM KUTYLO. (Valencia, Katrina) (Entered: 02/20/2019)

#5

(#5) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendants CITY OF CULVER CITY, [also erroneously named and sued herein as Culver City Police Department], OFFICER SAM HAWKINS, OFFICER WILLIAM KUTYLO, re Notice (Other) #4 served on February 20, 2019. (Valencia, Katrina) (Entered: 02/20/2019)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants CITY OF CULVER CITY, [also erroneously named and sued herein as Culver City Police Department], OFFICER SAM HAWKINS, OFFICER WILLIAM KUTYLO, identifying Andreas Hernandez, City of Culver City, also erroneously sued herein as Culver City Police Department], Officer William Kutylo, Officer Sam Hawkins. (Valencia, Katrina) (Entered: 02/20/2019)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendants CITY OF CULVER CITY, [also erroneously named and sued herein as Culver City Police Department], OFFICER SAM HAWKINS, OFFICER WILLIAM KUTYLO. (Valencia, Katrina) (Entered: 02/20/2019)

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles Superior Court, case number 18STCV06996 Receipt No: 0973-23245824 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendants OFFICER WILLIAM KUTYLO, CITY OF CULVER CITY, [also erroneously named and sued herein as Culver City Police Department], OFFICER SAM HAWKINS. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Copy of Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Proofs of Service of Summons on Defendants) (Attorney Katrina Joy Valencia added to party CITY OF CULVER CITY, [also erroneously named and sued herein as Culver City Police Department](pty:dft), Attorney Katrina Joy Valencia added to party OFFICER SAM HAWKINS(pty:dft), Attorney Katrina Joy Valencia added to party OFFICER WILLIAM KUTYLO(pty:dft))(Valencia, Katrina) (Entered: 02/20/2019)

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) ORDER REGARDING PLAINTIFF'S FILING OF A SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT #15 by Judge Otis D. Wright, I:, Plaintiff ANDREAS HERNANDEZ shall file a Second Amended Complaint no later than April 24, 2019 and Defendants shall file a responsive pleading thereto no later than May 15, 2019. (lc) Modified on 4/17/2019 (lc). (Entered: 04/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) STIPULATION to AMEND Amended Complaint/Petition #11 filed by Defendants City of Culver City, Sam Hawkins, William Kutylo(in his official capacity as a police officer for the City of Culver City). (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Attorney Katrina Joy Valencia added to party William Kutylo(pty:dft))(Valencia, Katrina) (Entered: 04/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Andreas Hernandez. (Dove, Austin) (Entered: 04/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) Notice of Interested Parties and Certificate of Service NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Andreas Hernandez, (Dove, Austin) (Entered: 04/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Amended Complaint/Petition #11 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 7.1-1 No Notice of Interested Parties and/or no copies. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (lom) (Entered: 04/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendant All Defendants amending Complaint - (Discovery), JURY DEMAND, filed by Plaintiff Andreas Hernandez(Dove, Austin) (Entered: 04/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ORDER REGARDING PLAINTIFF'S FILING OF A FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT #9 by Judge Otis D. Wright, II. The Court finds that Plaintiff ANDREAS HERNANDEZ shall file a First Amended Complaint no later than March 27, 2019 and Defendants shall file a responsive pleading thereto no later than April 17, 2019. (lom) (Entered: 02/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Joint STIPULATION to AMEND Complaint - (Discovery), filed by Defendants City of Culver City, Sam Hawkins, William Kutylo. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Regarding Plaintiff's Filing of a First Amended Complaint)(Valencia, Katrina) (Entered: 02/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge Otis D. Wright, II. This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge Otis D. Wright II. Counsel are STRONGLY encouraged to review the Central District's website for additional information. See document for other requirement. (lom) (Entered: 02/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa) (Entered: 02/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Otis D. Wright, II and Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson. (esa) (Entered: 02/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against defendants City of Culver City, Culver City Police Department, Does 1 through 50, Inclusive, Sam Hawkins, William Kutylo., filed by plaintiff Andreas Hernandez. (Filed in state court, submitted as document 1, attachment 1) (esa) (Entered: 02/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendants CITY OF CULVER CITY, [also erroneously named and sued herein as Culver City Police Department], OFFICER SAM HAWKINS, OFFICER WILLIAM KUTYLO, re Notice (Other) #4 served on February 20, 2019. (Valencia, Katrina) (Entered: 02/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE TO ADVERSE PARTY OF REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT filed by Defendants CITY OF CULVER CITY, [also erroneously named and sued herein as Culver City Police Department], OFFICER SAM HAWKINS, OFFICER WILLIAM KUTYLO. (Valencia, Katrina) (Entered: 02/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants CITY OF CULVER CITY, [also erroneously named and sued herein as Culver City Police Department], OFFICER SAM HAWKINS, OFFICER WILLIAM KUTYLO, identifying Andreas Hernandez, City of Culver City, also erroneously sued herein as Culver City Police Department], Officer William Kutylo, Officer Sam Hawkins. (Valencia, Katrina) (Entered: 02/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendants CITY OF CULVER CITY, [also erroneously named and sued herein as Culver City Police Department], OFFICER SAM HAWKINS, OFFICER WILLIAM KUTYLO. (Valencia, Katrina) (Entered: 02/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles Superior Court, case number 18STCV06996 Receipt No: 0973-23245824 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendants OFFICER WILLIAM KUTYLO, CITY OF CULVER CITY, [also erroneously named and sued herein as Culver City Police Department], OFFICER SAM HAWKINS. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Copy of Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Proofs of Service of Summons on Defendants) (Attorney Katrina Joy Valencia added to party CITY OF CULVER CITY, [also erroneously named and sued herein as Culver City Police Department](pty:dft), Attorney Katrina Joy Valencia added to party OFFICER SAM HAWKINS(pty:dft), Attorney Katrina Joy Valencia added to party OFFICER WILLIAM KUTYLO(pty:dft))(Valencia, Katrina) (Entered: 02/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.