This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/04/2022 at 08:44:33 (UTC).

Hernandez v. BP Exploration & Production, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 05/05/2022 Hernandez filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against BP Exploration Production, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Eastern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Carl Barbier and Donna Phillips Currault. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-01251

  • Filing Date:

    05/05/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Carl Barbier

Referral Judge

Donna Phillips Currault

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Esperanza Hernandez

Defendants

BP Exploration & Production, Inc.

BP America Production Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Charles David Durkee

Attorney at Downs Law Group, PA

3250 Mary Street, Suite 307

Coconut Grove, FL 33133

Sara Marie Mancini

Attorney at Downs Law Group PA

3250 Mary Street, Ste 307

Coconut Grove, FL 33133

Defendant Attorneys

Scott C. Seiler

Attorney at Liskow & Lewis (New Orleans)

One Shell Square, 701 Poydras St.

New Orleans, LA 70139-5099

Catherine Pyune McEldowney

Attorney at Maron Marvel Bradley and Anderson LLC

1201 North Market Street, Suite 900

Wilmington, DE 19801

Devin C. Reid

Attorney at Liskow & Lewis (New Orleans)

One Shell Square, 701 Poydras St.

New Orleans, LA 70139-5099

Georgia Lee Lucier

Attorney at Hunton Andrews Kurth LLP (Houston)

600 Travis, Suite 4200

Houston, TX 77002

Kevin Michael Hodges

Attorney at Williams & Connolly, LLP

725 12Th St., N. W.

Washington, DC 20005-5901

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Exhibit A- Election Not to Mediate

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

3 #3

Main Document

3 #1

Exhibit A

3 #2

Exhibit B

3 #3

Settlement Agreement

4 #4

Main Document

4 #1

Proposed Order

#5

(#5) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production, Inc..Attorney Scott C. Seiler added to party BP America Production Company(pty:dft), Attorney Scott C. Seiler added to party BP Exploration & Production, Inc.(pty:dft).(Seiler, Scott) (Entered: 06/06/2022)

6 #6

Main Document

6 #1

Proposed Order

#7

(#7) ORDER granting #6 Motion to Enroll as Counsel of Record for Attorney Sara Marie Mancini for Esperanza Hernandez. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna Phillips Currault on 6/15/2022. (cwa) (Entered: 06/15/2022)

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER granting #6 Motion to Enroll as Counsel of Record for Attorney Sara Marie Mancini for Esperanza Hernandez. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna Phillips Currault on 6/15/2022. (cwa) (Entered: 06/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Enroll as Counsel of Record by Esperanza Hernandez. Motion(s) referred to Donna Phillips Currault. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Durkee, Charles) (Entered: 06/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production, Inc..Attorney Scott C. Seiler added to party BP America Production Company(pty:dft), Attorney Scott C. Seiler added to party BP Exploration & Production, Inc.(pty:dft).(Seiler, Scott) (Entered: 06/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) DEFICIENT: EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Withdraw Sabrina Boukheir as Attorney by Esperanza Hernandez. Motion(s) referred to Donna Phillips Currault. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Durkee, Charles) Modified on 5/31/2022 (cg). (Entered: 05/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) INITIAL PROCEEDINGS CASE MANAGEMENT ORDERS NO.1 AND AMENDED ORDER NO.2. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Settlement Agreement)(cg) (Entered: 05/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • Docket(#2) Initial Case Assignment to Judge Carl Barbier and Magistrate Judge Donna Phillips Currault. (go) (Entered: 05/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ALAEDC-9346916) filed by Esperanza Hernandez. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Election Not to Mediate, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)Attorney Charles David Durkee added to party Esperanza Hernandez(pty:pla).(Durkee, Charles) (Entered: 05/05/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BP EXPLORATION & PRODUCTION, INCORPORATED is a litigant

Latest cases where BP AMERICA PRODUCTION COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Catherine Pyune *McEldowney-TRANSFER ATTORNEY

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kevin Michael *Hodges-TRANSFER ATTORNEY