This case was last updated from PACER on 09/13/2020 at 11:15:44 (UTC).

Hernandez v. Al's Trucking, Inc et al

Case Summary

On 07/15/2020 Hernandez filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Al's Trucking, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Lee H Rosenthal. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:20-CV-02489

  • Filing Date:

    07/15/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Lee H Rosenthal

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Wendy Hernandez

Defendants

UV Logistics, LLC d/b/a United Vision Logistics i

Al's Trucking, Inc

Clarence Holmes, III

UV Logistics, LLC doing business as United Vision Logistics

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Vuk Stevan Vujasinovic

Attorney at Vujasinovic and Beckcom LLP

6363 Woodway, Suite 400

Houston, TX 77057

Defendant Attorney

M David Frock

Attorney at Frock Broussard PC

2015 Crocker Street

Houston, TX 77006

 

Court Documents

#14

(#14) INITIAL DISCLOSURES by Wendy Hernandez, filed.(Vujasinovic, Vuk) (Entered: 09/11/2020)

#13

(#13) Agreed JOINT DISCOVERY/CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN by Wendy Hernandez, filed.(Vujasinovic, Vuk) (Entered: 09/11/2020)

#12

(#12) NOTICE of Service of Rule 26 Disclosure of Defendants by Al's Trucking, Inc, Clarence Holmes, III, UV Logistics, LLC, filed. (Frock, M) (Entered: 08/25/2020)

#11

(#11) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by UV Logistics, LLC, filed.(Frock, M) (Entered: 08/06/2020)

#10

(#10) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Clarence Holmes, III, filed.(Frock, M) (Entered: 08/06/2020)

#9

(#9) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Al's Trucking, Inc, filed.(Frock, M) (Entered: 08/06/2020)

#8

(#8) RETURN of Service, filed.(Vujasinovic, Vuk) (Entered: 07/29/2020)

#7

(#7) RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to UV Logistics, LLC served on 7/27/2020, answer due 8/17/2020, filed.(Vujasinovic, Vuk) (Entered: 07/29/2020)

#6

(#6) RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Al's Trucking, Inc served on 7/22/2020, answer due 8/12/2020, filed.(Vujasinovic, Vuk) Modified on 7/27/2020 (ChristopherSarrat, 4). (Entered: 07/24/2020)

#5

(#5) RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Clarence Holmes, III served on 7/22/2020, answer due 8/12/2020, filed.(Vujasinovic, Vuk) (Entered: 07/24/2020)

#4

(#4) ***DOCKETED IN ERROR - WRONG IMAGE ATTACHED*** Request for Issuance of Summons as to Al's Trucking, Inc, RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Al's Trucking, Inc served on 7/22/2020, answer due 8/12/2020, filed.(Vujasinovic, Vuk) Modified on 7/27/2020 (ChristopherSarrat, 4). (Entered: 07/24/2020)

3 #2

Summon

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to Al's Trucking, Inc, Clarence Holmes, III, UV Logistics, LLC. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed. (Attachments: #1 Summon, #2 Summon)(hlerma, 4) (Entered: 07/22/2020)

1 #4

Exhibit Summons

1 #3

Exhibit Summons

1 #2

Exhibit Summons

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Al's Trucking, Inc, Clarence Holmes, III, UV Logistics, LLC d/b/a United Vision Logistics i (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-24930946) filed by Wendy Hernandez. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Summons, #3 Exhibit Summons, #4 Exhibit Summons)(Vujasinovic, Vuk) (Entered: 07/15/2020)

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) INITIAL DISCLOSURES by Wendy Hernandez, filed.(Vujasinovic, Vuk) (Entered: 09/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Agreed JOINT DISCOVERY/CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN by Wendy Hernandez, filed.(Vujasinovic, Vuk) (Entered: 09/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE of Service of Rule 26 Disclosure of Defendants by Al's Trucking, Inc, Clarence Holmes, III, UV Logistics, LLC, filed. (Frock, M) (Entered: 08/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by UV Logistics, LLC, filed.(Frock, M) (Entered: 08/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Clarence Holmes, III, filed.(Frock, M) (Entered: 08/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Al's Trucking, Inc, filed.(Frock, M) (Entered: 08/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) RETURN of Service, filed.(Vujasinovic, Vuk) (Entered: 07/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to UV Logistics, LLC served on 7/27/2020, answer due 8/17/2020, filed.(Vujasinovic, Vuk) (Entered: 07/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Al's Trucking, Inc served on 7/22/2020, answer due 8/12/2020, filed.(Vujasinovic, Vuk) Modified on 7/27/2020 (ChristopherSarrat, 4). (Entered: 07/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Clarence Holmes, III served on 7/22/2020, answer due 8/12/2020, filed.(Vujasinovic, Vuk) (Entered: 07/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ***DOCKETED IN ERROR - WRONG IMAGE ATTACHED*** Request for Issuance of Summons as to Al's Trucking, Inc, RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Al's Trucking, Inc served on 7/22/2020, answer due 8/12/2020, filed.(Vujasinovic, Vuk) Modified on 7/27/2020 (ChristopherSarrat, 4). (Entered: 07/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to Al's Trucking, Inc, Clarence Holmes, III, UV Logistics, LLC. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed. (Attachments: #1 Summon, #2 Summon)(hlerma, 4) (Entered: 07/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ORDER Scheduling Rule 16 Conference With the Court and Setting Out the Requirements for Initial Pretrial Work. Initial Conference set for 9/25/2020 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 11B before Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal. (Signed by Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal) (Attachments: #1 Attachments) Parties notified.(JosephWellsadi, 4) (Entered: 07/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Al's Trucking, Inc, Clarence Holmes, III, UV Logistics, LLC d/b/a United Vision Logistics i (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-24930946) filed by Wendy Hernandez. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Summons, #3 Exhibit Summons, #4 Exhibit Summons)(Vujasinovic, Vuk) (Entered: 07/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where UV Logistics, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Vuk Stevan Vujasinovic