This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/09/2022 at 07:46:14 (UTC).

Hernandez v. Alltran Financial LP

Case Summary

On 11/10/2021 Hernandez filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against Alltran Financial LP. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Wisconsin Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Lynn Adelman and Stephen C Dries. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-01294

  • Filing Date:

    11/10/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Lynn Adelman

Stephen C Dries

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Enid Rosa Hernandez

Defendant

Alltran Financial LP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Ben James Slatky

Attorney at Ademi LLP

3620 E Layton Ave

Cudahy, WI 53110

Jesse Fruchter

Attorney at Ademi LLP

3620 E Layton Ave

Cudahy, WI 53110

John D Blythin

Attorney at Ademi LLP

3620 E Layton Ave

Cudahy, WI 53110

Mark A Eldridge

Attorney at Ademi LLP

3620 E Layton Ave

Cudahy, WI 53110

Defendant Attorneys

Andrew E Cunningham

Attorney at Sessions Israel & Shartle LLC

141 W Jackson Blvd -Ste 3550

Chicago, IL 60604

Morgan I Marcus

Attorney at Sessions Israel & Shartle LLC

141 W Jackson Blvd -Ste 3550

Chicago, IL 60604

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) NOTICE of Appearance by Morgan I Marcus on behalf of Alltran Financial LP. Attorney(s) appearing: Morgan I. Marcus (Marcus, Morgan)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew E Cunningham on behalf of Alltran Financial LP. Attorney(s) appearing: Andrew E. Cunningham (Cunningham, Andrew)

#3

(#3) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Alltran Financial LP from Circuit Court of Milwaukee County, Case Number: 2021CV005322 with attached state court documents. (Filing Fee PAID $402 receipt number AWIEDC-3970551) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit B-State Court Docket, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Cunningham, Andrew)

3 #1

Exhibit A-State Court Complaint

3 #2

Exhibit B-State Court Docket

3 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

#4

(#4) DISCLOSURE Statement by Alltran Financial LP. (Cunningham, Andrew)

#5

(#5) STIPULATION for Extension of Time to file Responsive Pleading by Alltran Financial LP. (Cunningham, Andrew)

#7

RESTRICTED

#8

(#8) STIPULATION for Extension of Time to file Responsive Pleading by Alltran Financial LP. (Cunningham, Andrew)

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Settlement in principle and request to close case administratively by Enid Rosa Hernandez. (Eldridge, Mark)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTEXT ONLY ORDER Granting #8 Stipulation for Extension of Time signed by Judge Lynn Adelman on 1/3/22. (cc: all counsel)(jad)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Settlement in principle and request to close case administratively by Enid Rosa Hernandez. (Eldridge, Mark)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) STIPULATION for Extension of Time to file Responsive Pleading by Alltran Financial LP. (Cunningham, Andrew)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • DocketCase reassigned to Judge Lynn Adelman. Magistrate Judge Stephen C Dries no longer assigned to the case. (kah)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Alltran Financial LP. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Cunningham, Andrew)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) TEXT ONLY ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C Dries on 11/19/21. The court APPROVES the parties' stipulation for extension of time for Alltran Financial, L.P., to file responsive pleading, ECF No. #5 . The defendant may have until December 8, 2021, to file a response to the plaintiff's complaint. (cc: all counsel)(jh)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) STIPULATION for Extension of Time to file Responsive Pleading by Alltran Financial LP. (Cunningham, Andrew)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • DocketNOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Magistrate Judge Stephen C Dries; Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Dries to be filed within 21 days; the consent/refusal form is available #here. (jcl)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) DISCLOSURE Statement by Alltran Financial LP. (Cunningham, Andrew)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Alltran Financial LP from Circuit Court of Milwaukee County, Case Number: 2021CV005322 with attached state court documents. (Filing Fee PAID $402 receipt number AWIEDC-3970551) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit B-State Court Docket, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Cunningham, Andrew)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew E Cunningham on behalf of Alltran Financial LP. Attorney(s) appearing: Andrew E. Cunningham (Cunningham, Andrew)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE of Appearance by Morgan I Marcus on behalf of Alltran Financial LP. Attorney(s) appearing: Morgan I. Marcus (Marcus, Morgan)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ALLTRAN FINANCIAL, LP is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Morgan I Marcus

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Andrew E. Cunningham