Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 05/14/2021 at 08:30:48 (UTC).

Jose Hernandez Solis v. The Merchant of Tennis, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 03/15/2021 Jose Hernandez Solis filed a Labor - Labor Standard lawsuit against The Merchant of Tennis, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are John W. Holcomb and Kenly Kiya Kato. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:21-CV-00459

  • Filing Date:

    03/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Labor Standard

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Central District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John W. Holcomb

Referral Judge

Kenly Kiya Kato

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jose Hernandez Solis

Defendants

DOES 1 through 10

The Merchant of Tennis, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Paul Keith Haines

Attorney at Haines Law Group APC

2155 Campus Drive Suite 180

El Segundo, CA 90245

Joseph R Holmes

Attorney at Haines Law Group APC

2155 Campus Drive Suite 180

El Segundo, CA 90245

Defendant Attorney

John S Purcell

Attorney at Arent Fox LLP

555 West Fifth Street 48Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90013-1065

 

Court Documents

#14

(#14) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant The Merchant of Tennis, Inc., (Purcell, John) (Entered: 04/23/2021)

#13

(#13) ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge John W. Holcomb. Scheduling Conference set for 6/4/2021 at 11:00 AM before Judge John W. Holcomb. (iva) (Entered: 04/19/2021)

#12

(#12) RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS RE: Deficiency in Electronically Filed Documents (G-112A) #11 by Judge John W. Holcomb. Counsel is ordered to file a Notice of Interested Parties forthwith by no later than APRIL 28, 2021. (yl) (Entered: 04/19/2021)

#11

(#11) NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #10 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 7.1-1 No Notice of Interested Parties and/or no copies. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (yl) (Entered: 04/19/2021)

#10

(#10) ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant The Merchant of Tennis, Inc..(Attorney John S Purcell added to party The Merchant of Tennis, Inc.(pty:dft))(Purcell, John) (Entered: 04/14/2021)

#8

(#8) STANDING ORDER by Judge John W. Holcomb. (iva) (Entered: 03/21/2021)

#7

(#7) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant The Merchant of Tennis, Inc. (lh) (Entered: 03/16/2021)

#6

(#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh) (Entered: 03/16/2021)

#5

(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John W. Holcomb and Magistrate Judge Kenly Kiya Kato. (lh) (Entered: 03/16/2021)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Jose Hernandez Solis, (Haines, Paul) (Entered: 03/15/2021)

#3

(#3) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Jose Hernandez Solis. (Haines, Paul) (Entered: 03/15/2021)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Jose Hernandez Solis. (Haines, Paul) (Entered: 03/15/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant The Merchant of Tennis, Inc., (Purcell, John) (Entered: 04/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge John W. Holcomb. Scheduling Conference set for 6/4/2021 at 11:00 AM before Judge John W. Holcomb. (iva) (Entered: 04/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS RE: Deficiency in Electronically Filed Documents (G-112A) #11 by Judge John W. Holcomb. Counsel is ordered to file a Notice of Interested Parties forthwith by no later than APRIL 28, 2021. (yl) (Entered: 04/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #10 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 7.1-1 No Notice of Interested Parties and/or no copies. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (yl) (Entered: 04/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant The Merchant of Tennis, Inc..(Attorney John S Purcell added to party The Merchant of Tennis, Inc.(pty:dft))(Purcell, John) (Entered: 04/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Jose Hernandez Solis, upon Defendant The Merchant of Tennis, Inc. served on 3/24/2021, answer due 4/14/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Jeff Green, Registered Agent for Service of Process in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service of Standing Order)(Haines, Paul) (Entered: 04/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) STANDING ORDER by Judge John W. Holcomb. (iva) (Entered: 03/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant The Merchant of Tennis, Inc. (lh) (Entered: 03/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh) (Entered: 03/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John W. Holcomb and Magistrate Judge Kenly Kiya Kato. (lh) (Entered: 03/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Jose Hernandez Solis, (Haines, Paul) (Entered: 03/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Jose Hernandez Solis. (Haines, Paul) (Entered: 03/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Jose Hernandez Solis. (Haines, Paul) (Entered: 03/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-30920936 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff Jose Hernandez Solis. (Attachments: #1 Consent to Sue) (Attorney Paul Keith Haines added to party Jose Hernandez Solis(pty:pla))(Haines, Paul) (Entered: 03/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where THE MERCHANT OF TENNIS INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer John S Purcell