This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/13/2021 at 07:42:44 (UTC).

Hernandez-Rivera v. Metro Santurce, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 11/14/2020 Hernandez-Rivera filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against Metro Santurce, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Puerto Rico District. The Judge overseeing this case is Francisco A. Besosa. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-01640

  • Filing Date:

    11/14/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Francisco A. Besosa

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Dr. Ladys N. Hernandez-Rivera

Defendants

John Doe

Jane Doe 3

ABC Insurance Company

Conjugal Partnership Colon-Doe

Jane Doe

Conjugal Partnership Munoz-Doe

Jane Doe 4

Dr. John Doe

Conjugal Partnership Gorbea-Doe

Puerto Rico Medical Defense Insurance Company

Dr. Richard Roe

Jorge Mattei-Louis

Hector F. Gorbea-Alonso

Dr. Jane Doe

SIMED

Dr. Hilton Franqui-Rivera

Metro Santurce, Inc. doing business as Hospital Pavia Santurce

Dr. Elba Arroyo-Camunas

Rolando Colon-Perez

11 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jose F. Velazquez-Ortiz

Attorney at Velazquez Law Office, PSC

Po Box 188

Caguas, PR 00726

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Category Sheet

1 #3

Supplement Change of Address form

1 #4

Summons Summons to be issued

#3

3 #1

Summons

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to Dr. Elba Arroyo-Camunas, Rolando Colon-Perez, Conjugal Partnership Colon-Doe, Conjugal Partnership Doe-Corrales, Conjugal Partnership Franqui-Doe, Conjugal Partnership Gorbea-Doe, Conjugal Partnership Mattei-Doe, Conjugal Partnership Munoz-Doe, Conjugal partnership Doe-Arroyo, Dr. Yuri E. Corrales-Higuera, Jane Doe, Joan Doe, John Doe, Jane Doe 1, John Doe 1, Jane Doe 2, Jane Doe 4, Dr. Hilton Franqui-Rivera, Hector F. Gorbea-Alonso, Jorge Mattei-Louis, Metro Santurce, Inc., Roberto Munoz-Marin, Puerto Rico Medical Defense Insurance Company, SIMED (Attachments: #1 Summons) (arg) (Entered: 11/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Francisco A. Besosa (arg) (Entered: 11/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0104-7086545.), filed by Dr. Ladys N. Hernandez-Rivera. Service due by 2/12/2021, (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Sheet, #3 Supplement Change of Address form, #4 Summons Summons to be issued)(Velazquez-Ortiz, Jose) (Entered: 11/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Conjugal Partnership Colon-Doe is a litigant

Latest cases where METRO SANTURCE, INC., d/b/a PAVIA HOSPITAL SANTURCE a corporation is a litigant

Latest cases where SIMED is a litigant

Latest cases where Puerto Rico Medical Defense is a litigant