This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/11/2021 at 19:00:33 (UTC).

Hernandez et al v. State Farm Fire and Casualty

Case Summary

On 04/12/2021 Hernandez filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against State Farm Fire and Casualty. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Oklahoma Western District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Patrick R Wyrick. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:21-CV-00342

  • Filing Date:

    04/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Patrick R Wyrick

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Joe Hernandez

Brenda Hernandez

Defendant

State Farm Fire and Casualty

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Kindra N Dotson-Avila

Attorney at Russell Legal Group

2201 N Classen Blvd

Oklahoma City, OK 73106

Rachel L Bussett

Attorney at Bussett Legal Group PLLC

2201 N Classen Blvd

Oklahoma City, OK 73106

Defendant Attorneys

Timila S Rother

Attorney at Crowe & Dunlevy-OKC

Braniff Building, 324 N Robinson Ave, Suite 100

Oklahoma City, OK 73102

Lance E Leffel

Attorney at Gable & Gotwals-OKC

211 N Robinson Ave, 15Th Fl

Oklahoma City, OK 73102

 

Court Documents

#13

#12

#11

#10

#9

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

1 #7

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #6

Exhibit 6- Summons

1 #5

Exhibit 5- Amended Petition

1 #4

Exhibit 4- Entry of Appearance

1 #3

Exhibit 3- Summons

1 #2

Exhibit 2- Petition

1 #1

Exhibit 1- Docket Sheet

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set on the April 2022 trial docket (4/12/2022 09:00 AM) in Courtroom 503 before Honorable Patrick R Wyrick; Motions to join due 30 days from date of this order; Motions to amend due 30 days from date of this order; Pla expert witness list and expert reports due 2/1/2021; Dft expert witness list and expert reports due 2/11/2021; Pla witness list due 2/1/2021; Dft witness list due 2/11/2021; Pla exhibit list due 2/1/2021; Dft exhibit list due 2/11/2021; Motions in limine due 3/24/2022; Jury instructions due 3/24/2022; Voir dire requests due 3/24/2022; Trial briefs due 3/24/2022; Discovery due by 3/1/2021. Dispositive Motions due by 2/1/2022. Pretrial Report due by 3/24/2022. Signed by Honorable Patrick R Wyrick on 6/1/2021. (ks) (Entered: 06/01/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ORDER granting #10 Motion to Withdraw as Counsel of Record (Attorney Timila S Rother terminated). Signed by Honorable Patrick R Wyrick on 5/25/2021. (ks) (Entered: 05/25/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) JOINT STATUS REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN by Plaintiffs Brenda Hernandez, Joe Hernandez. (Dotson-Avila, Kindra) (Entered: 05/25/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MOTION to Withdraw as Counsel of Record by State Farm Fire and Casualty. (Rother, Timila) (Entered: 05/21/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ENTRY of Appearance by Lance E Leffel on behalf of State Farm Fire and Casualty (Leffel, Lance) (Entered: 05/10/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • Docket(#8) ENTER ORDER (Text Only) The Status and Scheduling Conference set for Tuesday, June 1, 2021 will now be held in the Chambers of Judge Patrick R. Wyrick, Room No. 5012 rather than in the courtroom. (This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this entry). Signed by Honorable Patrick R Wyrick on 5/5/2021. (ks) (Entered: 05/05/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) JUNE STATUS & SCHEDULING CONFERENCE DOCKET: Scheduling Conference set for 6/1/2021 09:50 AM in Courtroom 503 before Honorable Patrick R Wyrick. Status Report due by 5/25/2021. (ks) (Entered: 04/30/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) Plaintiffs' First Amended Petition by State Farm Fire and Casualty.(Rother, Timila) (Entered: 04/22/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ENTRY of Appearance by Kindra N Dotson-Avila on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Dotson-Avila, Kindra) (Entered: 04/20/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ENTRY of Appearance by Rachel L Bussett on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Bussett, Rachel) (Entered: 04/20/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • DocketPAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Notice of Removal Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AOKWDC-3667145. (Rother, Timila) (Entered: 04/20/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by State Farm Fire and Casualty . (Rother, Timila) (Entered: 04/16/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ENTRY of Appearance by Timila S Rother on behalf of State Farm Fire and Casualty (Rother, Timila) (Entered: 04/16/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from The District Court for Canadian County, case number CJ-2021-104 filed by State Farm Fire and Casualty. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- Docket Sheet, #2 Exhibit 2- Petition, #3 Exhibit 3- Summons, #4 Exhibit 4- Entry of Appearance, #5 Exhibit 5- Amended Petition, #6 Exhibit 6- Summons, #7 Civil Cover Sheet)(dtb) (Entered: 04/16/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where State Farm Fire & Casualty Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Timila S Rother

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Lance E Leffel