This case was last updated from PACER on 09/07/2021 at 08:08:02 (UTC).

Hernandez Arellano v. Garland et al

Case Summary

On 07/09/2021 Hernandez Arellano filed a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit against Garland. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Western District. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-00787

  • Filing Date:

    07/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

  • Courthouse:

    New York Western District

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Abigail Hernandez Arellano

Respondents

Attorney General Merrick B Garland

Secretary Alejandro Mayorkas

Director Thomas E. Feeley

Sheriff Patrick A Russo

US Department of Homeland Security

US Immigration & Customs Enforcement

Merrick B Garland

Alejandro Mayorkas

Thomas E. Feeley

Patrick A Russo

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Michael E. Marszalkowski

112 Franklin Street

Buffalo, NY 14202

 

Court Documents

1 #10

Exhibit Ex I - Letters of Support

1 #9

Exhibit Ex H - Ltr from E. Flores 7.10.2019

1 #8

Exhibit Ex G - ICE denial 6.24.2021

1 #7

Exhibit Ex F - ICE denial 3.12.2021

1 #6

Exhibit Ex E - Petitioner's request to ICE 3.10.2021

1 #5

Exhibit Ex D - 2021 Johnson Memo

1 #4

Exhibit Ex C - PSR 7.18.2018

1 #3

Exhibit Ex B - Summary Order 6.22.2021

1 #2

Exhibit Ex A - Petitioner's Psychological Eval

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus ( Filing fee $ 5 receipt number 0209-4297291.), filed by Abigail Hernandez Arellano. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Ex A - Petitioner's Psychological Eval, #3 Exhibit Ex B - Summary Order 6.22.2021, #4 Exhibit Ex C - PSR 7.18.2018, #5 Exhibit Ex D - 2021 Johnson Memo, #6 Exhibit Ex E - Petitioner's request to ICE 3.10.2021, #7 Exhibit Ex F - ICE denial 3.12.2021, #8 Exhibit Ex G - ICE denial 6.24.2021, #9 Exhibit Ex H - Ltr from E. Flores 7.10.2019, #10 Exhibit Ex I - Letters of Support)(Marszalkowski, Michael) (Entered: 07/09/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/12/2021
  • DocketCase transferred to Rochester under case number 21cv6478. All future docketing shall be entered on the Rochester case. Civil case terminated and case closed as an unreportable closing on JS 6 statistics. (JLV) (Entered: 07/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus ( Filing fee $ 5 receipt number 0209-4297291.), filed by Abigail Hernandez Arellano. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Ex A - Petitioner's Psychological Eval, #3 Exhibit Ex B - Summary Order 6.22.2021, #4 Exhibit Ex C - PSR 7.18.2018, #5 Exhibit Ex D - 2021 Johnson Memo, #6 Exhibit Ex E - Petitioner's request to ICE 3.10.2021, #7 Exhibit Ex F - ICE denial 3.12.2021, #8 Exhibit Ex G - ICE denial 6.24.2021, #9 Exhibit Ex H - Ltr from E. Flores 7.10.2019, #10 Exhibit Ex I - Letters of Support)(Marszalkowski, Michael) (Entered: 07/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement is a litigant

Latest cases where US Department of Homeland Security is a litigant