This case was last updated from PACER on 12/20/2020 at 08:00:09 (UTC).

Heritage Provider Network, Inc. et al v. Community Family Care Medical Group IPA, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 10/21/2020 Heritage Provider Network, Inc filed an Other - Antitrust lawsuit against Community Family Care Medical Group IPA, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Karen L. Stevenson and John F. Walter. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-09675

  • Filing Date:

    10/21/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Antitrust

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Karen L. Stevenson

Presiding Judge

John F. Walter

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Sierra Medical Group, Inc.

Regal Medical Group, Inc.

Heritage Provider Network, Inc.

Lakeside Medical Organization, a Medical Group, Inc.

Defendants

Preferred IPA of California, a Professional Medical Corporation

Does 1 through 25, Inclusive,

Community Family Care Medical Group IPA, Inc.

Does 1 through 10, Inclusive

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

David W Kesselman

Attorney at Kesselman Brantly Stockinger LLP

1230 Rosecrans Avenue Suite 400

Manhattan Beach, CA 90266

Michael M. Amir

Attorney at Doll Amir and Eley LLP

725 South Figueroa Street Suite 3275

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Jason Bradley Baim

Attorney at Doll Amir and Eley LLP

725 South Figueroa Street Suite 3275

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Paul M. Torres

Attorney at Doll Amir and Eley LLP

725 South Figueroa Street Suite 3275

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Amy Thomas Brantly

Attorney at Kesselman Brantly Stockinger LLP

1230 Rosecrans Avenue Suite 400

Manhattan Beach, CA 90266

David W. Kesselman

Attorney at Kesselman Brantly Stockinger LLP

1230 Rosecrans Avenue Suite 400

Manhattan Beach, CA 90266

Defendant Attorneys

Glenn E Solomon

Attorney at King and Spalding LLP

633 West 5Th Street Suite 1600

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Craig S. Steinberg

Attorney at Craig S. Steinberg Law Offices

5737 Kanan Road Suite 540

Agoura Hills, CA 91301

Jennifer L Siegel

Attorney at Girardi Keese

1126 Wilshire Boulevard

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Suzanne E Nero

Attorney at King and Spalding LLP

50 California Street Suite 3300

San Francisco, CA 94111

Robert M. Cooper

Attorney at King and Spalding LLP

1700 Pennsylvania Avenue Nw Suite 200

Washington, DC 20006

Meghan Strong

Attorney at King and Spalding LLP

50 California Street, Suite 3300

San Francisco, CA 94111

 

Court Documents

#33

(#33) Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Meghan Strong counsel for Defendant Community Family Care Medical Group IPA, Inc.. Adding Meghan Strong as counsel of record for COMMUNITY FAMILY CARE MEDICAL GROUP IPA, INC.; PREFERRED IPA OF CALIFORNIA, A PROFESSIONAL MEDICAL CORPORATION for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by DEFENDANT(S) COMMUNITY FAMILY CARE MEDICAL GROUP IPA, INC.; PREFERRED IPA OF CALIFORNIA. (Attorney Meghan Strong added to party Community Family Care Medical Group IPA, Inc.(pty:dft))(Strong, Meghan) (Entered: 12/18/2020)

#32

(#32) ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition, #12 filed by Defendant Preferred IPA of California, a Professional Medical Corporation.(Steinberg, Craig) (Entered: 12/16/2020)

#31

(#31) ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition, #12 filed by Defendant Community Family Care Medical Group IPA, Inc..(Steinberg, Craig) (Entered: 12/16/2020)

26 #1

Proposed Order Setting Dates for Responsive Pleadings to First Amended Complaint

12 #4

Exhibit D

12 #3

Exhibit C

12 #2

Exhibit B

12 #1

Exhibit A

#12

(#26) Joint STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to January 18, 2021 re Amended Complaint/Petition, #12 filed by defendents Community Family Care Medical Group IPA, Inc., Preferred IPA of California, a Professional Medical Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Setting Dates for Responsive Pleadings to First Amended Complaint)(Steinberg, Craig) (Entered: 12/08/2020)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs Heritage Provider Network, Inc., Lakeside Medical Organization, a Medical Group, Inc., Regal Medical Group, Inc., Sierra Medical Group, Inc., (Kesselman, David) (Entered: 10/21/2020)

3 #1

Summons Request

#3

(#3) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 filed by Plaintiffs Heritage Provider Network, Inc., Lakeside Medical Organization, a Medical Group, Inc., Regal Medical Group, Inc., Sierra Medical Group, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Summons Request)(Kesselman, David) (Entered: 10/21/2020)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs Heritage Provider Network, Inc., Lakeside Medical Organization, a Medical Group, Inc., Regal Medical Group, Inc., Sierra Medical Group, Inc.. (Kesselman, David) (Entered: 10/21/2020)

1 #4

Exhibit D

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#9) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 as to Defendant Preferred IPA of California, a Professional Medical Corporation. (car) (Entered: 10/22/2020)

40 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#33) Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Meghan Strong counsel for Defendant Community Family Care Medical Group IPA, Inc.. Adding Meghan Strong as counsel of record for COMMUNITY FAMILY CARE MEDICAL GROUP IPA, INC.; PREFERRED IPA OF CALIFORNIA, A PROFESSIONAL MEDICAL CORPORATION for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by DEFENDANT(S) COMMUNITY FAMILY CARE MEDICAL GROUP IPA, INC.; PREFERRED IPA OF CALIFORNIA. (Attorney Meghan Strong added to party Community Family Care Medical Group IPA, Inc.(pty:dft))(Strong, Meghan) (Entered: 12/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#32) ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition, #12 filed by Defendant Preferred IPA of California, a Professional Medical Corporation.(Steinberg, Craig) (Entered: 12/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#31) ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition, #12 filed by Defendant Community Family Care Medical Group IPA, Inc..(Steinberg, Craig) (Entered: 12/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) ORDER DENYING CONTINUANCE OF TIME FOR RESPONSIVE PLEADINGS TO OPERATIVE COMPLAINT AND BRIEFING SCHEDULE #26 by Judge John F. Walter. (iv) (Entered: 12/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Glenn E Solomon counsel for Defendants Community Family Care Medical Group IPA, Inc., Preferred IPA of California, a Professional Medical Corporation. Adding Glenn Solomon as counsel of record for Community Family Care Medical Group IPA, Inc; Preferred IPA of California for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by defendants Community Family Care Medical Group IPA, Inc; Preferred IPA of California. (Attorney Glenn E Solomon added to party Community Family Care Medical Group IPA, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Glenn E Solomon added to party Preferred IPA of California, a Professional Medical Corporation(pty:dft))(Solomon, Glenn) (Entered: 12/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Suzanne E Nero counsel for Defendants Community Family Care Medical Group IPA, Inc., Preferred IPA of California, a Professional Medical Corporation. Filed by defendant Community Family Care Medical Group IPA, Inc; Preferred IPA of California. (Attorney Suzanne E Nero added to party Community Family Care Medical Group IPA, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Suzanne E Nero added to party Preferred IPA of California, a Professional Medical Corporation(pty:dft))(Nero, Suzanne) (Entered: 12/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Jennifer L Siegel counsel for Defendants Community Family Care Medical Group IPA, Inc., Preferred IPA of California, a Professional Medical Corporation. Adding Jennifer L. Siegel as counsel of record for Community Family Care Medical Group IPA, Inc; Preferred IPA of California for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Community Family Care Medical Group IPA, Inc; Preferred IPA of California. (Attorney Jennifer L Siegel added to party Community Family Care Medical Group IPA, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Jennifer L Siegel added to party Preferred IPA of California, a Professional Medical Corporation(pty:dft))(Siegel, Jennifer) (Entered: 12/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) Joint STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to January 18, 2021 re Amended Complaint/Petition, #12 filed by defendents Community Family Care Medical Group IPA, Inc., Preferred IPA of California, a Professional Medical Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Setting Dates for Responsive Pleadings to First Amended Complaint)(Steinberg, Craig) (Entered: 12/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) ORDER by Judge John F. Walter: Granting Application of Non-Resident Attorney Robert Cooper to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Community Family Care Medical Grp. IPA, Inc.; Preferred IPA of Cal., a Professional Med. Corp, designating Craig Steinberg as local counsel #24 . (iv) (Entered: 12/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Robert M. Cooper to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Community Family Care Medical Group IPA, Inc., Preferred IPA of California, a Professional Medical Corporation (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-29281681) filed by defendents Community Family Care Medical Group IPA, Inc., Preferred IPA of California, a Professional Medical Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order GRANTING APPLICATION) (Steinberg, Craig) (Entered: 12/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 10/23/2020
  • Docket(#10) TEXT ONLY ENTRY ORDER DISMISSING DOES: Pursuant to Local Rule 19-1, no complaint or petition shall be filed that includes more than ten Doe or fictitiously named parties. Accordingly, the Court hereby dismisses the action as to Doe Defendants 11 through 25, inclusive. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (sr) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 10/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 as to Defendant Preferred IPA of California, a Professional Medical Corporation. (car) (Entered: 10/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 as to Defendant Community Family Care Medical Group IPA, Inc. (car) (Entered: 10/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car) (Entered: 10/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John F. Walter and Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson. (car) (Entered: 10/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Plaintiffs Heritage Provider Network, Inc., Lakeside Medical Organization, a Medical Group, Inc., Regal Medical Group, Inc., Sierra Medical Group, Inc. (Kesselman, David) (Entered: 10/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs Heritage Provider Network, Inc., Lakeside Medical Organization, a Medical Group, Inc., Regal Medical Group, Inc., Sierra Medical Group, Inc., (Kesselman, David) (Entered: 10/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 filed by Plaintiffs Heritage Provider Network, Inc., Lakeside Medical Organization, a Medical Group, Inc., Regal Medical Group, Inc., Sierra Medical Group, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Summons Request)(Kesselman, David) (Entered: 10/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs Heritage Provider Network, Inc., Lakeside Medical Organization, a Medical Group, Inc., Regal Medical Group, Inc., Sierra Medical Group, Inc.. (Kesselman, David) (Entered: 10/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-28647202 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiffs Lakeside Medical Organization, a Medical Group, Inc., Heritage Provider Network, Inc., Sierra Medical Group, Inc., Regal Medical Group, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D) (Attorney David W Kesselman added to party Heritage Provider Network, Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney David W Kesselman added to party Lakeside Medical Organization, a Medical Group, Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney David W Kesselman added to party Regal Medical Group, Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney David W Kesselman added to party Sierra Medical Group, Inc.(pty:pla))(Kesselman, David) (Entered: 10/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Preferred IPA of California, a Professional Medical Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases where Sierra Medical Group, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where COMMUNITY FAMILY CARE MEDICAL GROUP IPA INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where LAKESIDE MEDICAL ORGANIZATION A MEDICAL GROUP INC. is a litigant