This case was last updated from PACER on 07/28/2020 at 14:54:24 (UTC).

Heritage IP LLC v. Maytronics, Ltd. et al

Case Summary

On 05/29/2020 Heritage IP LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Maytronics, Ltd. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Steve C. Jones. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-02315

  • Filing Date:

    05/29/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Georgia Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Steve C. Jones

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Heritage IP LLC

Defendants

Maytronics US Inc

Maytronics, Ltd.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jacqueline Knapp Burt

Attorney at Insight, PLC

860 Johnson Ferry Rd. Ne, Ste #140-176

Atlanta, GA 30328

Hao Ni

Attorney at Ni, Wang & Massand, PLLC

Suite 500, 8140 Walnut Hill Lane

Dallas, TX 75231

Neal Massand

Attorney at Ni, Wang & Massand, PLLC

Suite 500, 8140 Walnut Hill Lane

Dallas, TX 75231

 

Court Documents

#18

(#18) ORDER granting #17 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant Maytronics US Inc. is granted an extension of time to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint up to and including August 5, 2020. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 7/24/2020. (rjs) (Entered: 07/24/2020)

17 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#17

(#17) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Respond to Complaint by Heritage IP LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Burt, Jacqueline) (Entered: 07/22/2020)

#16

(#16) ORDER granting #12 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Maytronics US Inc Answer due 7/22/2020. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 7/14/2020. (rjs) (Entered: 07/14/2020)

#15

RESTRICTED

#14

RESTRICTED

12 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#12

(#12) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Heritage IP LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Burt, Jacqueline) (Entered: 07/07/2020)

#10

RESTRICTED

#6

RESTRICTED

#5

(#5) THIRD AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 05/26/20. (aaq) (Entered: 06/02/2020)

#4

(#4) AO Form 120 forwarded to Commissioner. (aaq) (Entered: 06/02/2020)

#3

(#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Heritage IP LLC.(aaq) (Entered: 06/02/2020)

#2

(#2) Electronic Summons Issued as to Maytronics US Inc. (aaq) (Entered: 06/02/2020)

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit B and B-1

1 #1

Exhibit A and A-1

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement with Jury Demand filed by Heritage IP LLC. (Filing fee $400, receipt number AGANDC-9748444) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A and A-1, #2 Exhibit B and B-1, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(aaq) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 06/02/2020)

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) ORDER granting #17 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant Maytronics US Inc. is granted an extension of time to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint up to and including August 5, 2020. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 7/24/2020. (rjs) (Entered: 07/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Respond to Complaint by Heritage IP LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Burt, Jacqueline) (Entered: 07/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) ORDER granting #12 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Maytronics US Inc Answer due 7/22/2020. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 7/14/2020. (rjs) (Entered: 07/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClerk's Certificate of Mailing to Neal Massand re #15 Order on Application for Admission PHV. (rjs) (Entered: 07/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ORDER granting #10 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Neal Massand. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 7/14/2020. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(rjs) (Entered: 07/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClerk's Certificate of Mailing to Hao Ni re #14 Order on Application for Admission PHV. (rjs) (Entered: 07/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ORDER granting #9 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Hao Ni. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 7/14/2020. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(rjs) (Entered: 07/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) FIFTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 7/10/2020 (mmc) (ADI) (Entered: 07/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Heritage IP LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Burt, Jacqueline) (Entered: 07/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) FOURTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 07/01/2020. (ddm) (ADI) (Entered: 07/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 06/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Application for Refund of Fees paid online through Pay.gov for receipt number AGANDC-9748444. (Burt, Jacqueline) (Entered: 06/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN of #7 APPLICATION for Admission of Neal Massand Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-9767282). to attorney for correction re: Local counsel's address. (cdg) (Entered: 06/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN of #6 APPLICATION for Admission of Hao Ni Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-9767252). to attorney for correction re: Local counsel's address. (cdg) (Entered: 06/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) APPLICATION for Admission of Neal Massand Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-9767282).by Heritage IP LLC. (Burt, Jacqueline) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse. (Entered: 06/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) APPLICATION for Admission of Hao Ni Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-9767252).by Heritage IP LLC. (Burt, Jacqueline) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse. (Entered: 06/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) THIRD AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 05/26/20. (aaq) (Entered: 06/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) AO Form 120 forwarded to Commissioner. (aaq) (Entered: 06/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Heritage IP LLC.(aaq) (Entered: 06/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Electronic Summons Issued as to Maytronics US Inc. (aaq) (Entered: 06/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement with Jury Demand filed by Heritage IP LLC. (Filing fee $400, receipt number AGANDC-9748444) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A and A-1, #2 Exhibit B and B-1, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(aaq) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 06/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less