This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/26/2021 at 07:56:32 (UTC).

Heritage IP LLC v. Hilti, Inc.

Case Summary

On 08/27/2021 Heritage IP LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Hilti, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Delaware District. The Judge overseeing this case is Leonard P. Stark. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-01236

  • Filing Date:

    08/27/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Leonard P. Stark

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Heritage IP LLC

Defendant

Hilti, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jimmy C. Chong

Attorney at The Chong Law Firm, P.A.

2961 Centerville Road, Suite 350

Wilmington, DE 19808

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Exhibit 1

1 #2

Exhibit 2

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

#7

#8

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSO ORDERED, re #8 Second STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Answer the Complaint to 11/24/2021 filed by Heritage IP LLC. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 10/21/21. (ntl) (Entered: 10/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Second STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Answer the Complaint to 11/24/2021 - filed by Heritage IP LLC. (Chong, Jimmy) (Entered: 10/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSO ORDERED, re #7 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Answer the Complaint to 10/25/2021 filed by Heritage IP LLC. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 9/14/21. (ntl) (Entered: 09/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Answer the Complaint to 10/25/2021 - filed by Heritage IP LLC. (Chong, Jimmy) (Entered: 09/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Heritage IP LLC. Hilti, Inc. served on 9/2/2021, answer due 9/23/2021. (Chong, Jimmy) (Entered: 09/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Leonard P. Stark. Please include the initials of the Judge (LPS) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb) (Entered: 09/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summonses Issued (please complete the top portion of the form and print out for use/service). (smg) (Entered: 08/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Heritage IP LLC. (smg) (Entered: 08/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 6,854,067. (smg) (Entered: 08/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (smg) (Entered: 08/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT for PATENT INFRINGEMENT - filed with Jury Demand against Hilti, Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ADEDC-3687587.) - filed by Heritage IP LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(smg) (Entered: 08/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Heritage IP LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Hilti, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jimmy C. Chong