This case was last updated from PACER on 07/08/2019 at 07:50:36 (UTC).

Hercules Tire & Rubber Company, The v. Hercules Tire Sales, Inc.

Case Summary

On 05/09/2019 Hercules Tire Rubber Company, The filed an Intellectual Property - Trademark lawsuit against Hercules Tire Sales, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Oklahoma Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Claire V Eagan and Frank H McCarthy. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:19-CV-00249

  • Filing Date:

    05/09/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Trademark

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Oklahoma Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Claire V Eagan

Referral Judge

Frank H McCarthy

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Hercules Tire & Rubber Company, The

Defendant

Hercules Tire Sales, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Kaitlyn A Haase

Attorney at Troutman Sanders LLP (Atlanta)

600 Peachtree St Ne, Ste 3000

Atlanta, GA 30308-2216

John M Bowler

Attorney at Troutman Sanders LLP (Atlanta)

600 Peachtree St Ne, Ste 3000

Atlanta, GA 30308-2216

Christopher A Barrow

Attorney at Barrow & Grimm PC

110 W 7Th St Ste 900

Tulsa, OK 74119-1044

Michael D Hobbs, Jr

Attorney at Troutman Sanders LLP (Atlanta)

600 Peachtree St Ne, Ste 3000

Atlanta, GA 30308-2216

Defendant Attorneys

Rachel Blue

Attorney at McAfee & Taft (Tulsa)

Two W Second St Ste 1100

Tulsa, OK 74103

Jessica Lynn John Bowman

Attorney at McAfee & Taft (Tulsa)

Two W Second St Ste 1100

Tulsa, OK 74103

 

Court Documents

#24

(#24) STIPULATION of Dismissal, closing case, by Hercules Tire & Rubber Company, The (Hobbs, Michael) (Entered: 06/27/2019)

#21

(#21) ORDER by Judge Claire V Eagan , directing parties to file joint status report ( Status Report due by 7/5/2019) (RGG, Chambers) (Entered: 06/04/2019)

#20

(#20) ANSWER with Jury Demand (Re: #2 Complaint, ) by Hercules Tire Sales, Inc. (Bowman, Jessica) (Entered: 06/04/2019)

#19

(#19) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Jessica Lynn John Bowman on behalf of Hercules Tire Sales, Inc. [Note: Attorney Jessica Lynn John Bowman added to party Hercules Tire Sales, Inc.(pty:dft).] (Bowman, Jessica) (Entered: 06/04/2019)

#17

(#17) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Michael D Hobbs, Jr on behalf of Hercules Tire & Rubber Company, The (Hobbs, Michael) (Entered: 05/21/2019)

#16

(#16) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Kaitlyn A Haase on behalf of Hercules Tire & Rubber Company, The (Haase, Kaitlyn) (Entered: 05/21/2019)

#15

No Description Available

#13

No Description Available

#12

No Description Available

#11

No Description Available

#10

(#10) MOTION for Attorney(s) Michael D. Hobbs, Jr. to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $50 PHV fee; receipt number 1085-2052834) by Hercules Tire & Rubber Company, The (Barrow, Christopher) (Entered: 05/13/2019)

#9

(#9) MAIL to Kaitlyn A Haase Returned - remailed on 5/13/19 to 600 Peachtreet ST NE Ste 3000, Atlanta, GA 30308-2216 - new address obtained from the USPS. (Re: 4 Minute Order,,,, Directing Party(ies) to File Corporate Disclosure Statement,,, ) (dlg, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 05/13/2019)

#8

(#8) MAIL to John M Bowler Returned - remailed on 5/13/19 to 600 Peachtree ST NE Ste 3000, Atlanta, GA 30308-2216 - new adress obtained from USPS. (Re: 4 Minute Order,,,, Directing Party(ies) to File Corporate Disclosure Statement,,, ) (dlg, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 05/13/2019)

#6

(#6) REPORT on Copyrights/Patents/Trademarks (dlg, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 05/10/2019)

#5

(#5) SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Hercules Tire Sales, Inc. (sc, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 05/09/2019)

#3

(#3) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Christopher A Barrow on behalf of Hercules Tire & Rubber Company, The (Barrow, Christopher) (Entered: 05/09/2019)

#2

(#20) ANSWER with Jury Demand (Re: #2 Complaint, ) by Hercules Tire Sales, Inc. (Bowman, Jessica) (Entered: 06/04/2019)

#1

(#1) CIVIL COVER SHEET by Hercules Tire & Rubber Company, The (Barrow, Christopher) (Entered: 05/09/2019)

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ***Civil Case Terminated (see document number #24 ) (sac-qc, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 06/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#24) STIPULATION of Dismissal, closing case, by Hercules Tire & Rubber Company, The (Hobbs, Michael) (Entered: 06/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#23) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Hercules Tire Sales, Inc. (Bowman, Jessica) (Entered: 06/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • (#22) MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing Hercules Tire Sales, Inc. to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 within seven (7) days of this order, if they have not already done so. The parties shall use the form entitled Corporate Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website (please do not refile if already filed on non-court form unless directed to do so). If you have already filed your Corporate Disclosure Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Corporate Disclosure Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (jln, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 06/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) ORDER by Judge Claire V Eagan , directing parties to file joint status report ( Status Report due by 7/5/2019) (RGG, Chambers) (Entered: 06/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) ANSWER with Jury Demand (Re: #2 Complaint, ) by Hercules Tire Sales, Inc. (Bowman, Jessica) (Entered: 06/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Jessica Lynn John Bowman on behalf of Hercules Tire Sales, Inc. [Note: Attorney Jessica Lynn John Bowman added to party Hercules Tire Sales, Inc.(pty:dft).] (Bowman, Jessica) (Entered: 06/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Rachel Blue on behalf of Hercules Tire Sales, Inc. [Note: Attorney Rachel Blue added to party Hercules Tire Sales, Inc.(pty:dft).] (Blue, Rachel) (Entered: 06/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Michael D Hobbs, Jr on behalf of Hercules Tire & Rubber Company, The (Hobbs, Michael) (Entered: 05/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Kaitlyn A Haase on behalf of Hercules Tire & Rubber Company, The (Haase, Kaitlyn) (Entered: 05/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 05/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) MOTION for Attorney(s) Michael D. Hobbs, Jr. to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $50 PHV fee; receipt number 1085-2052834) by Hercules Tire & Rubber Company, The (Barrow, Christopher) (Entered: 05/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) MAIL to Kaitlyn A Haase Returned - remailed on 5/13/19 to 600 Peachtreet ST NE Ste 3000, Atlanta, GA 30308-2216 - new address obtained from the USPS. (Re: 4 Minute Order,,,, Directing Party(ies) to File Corporate Disclosure Statement,,, ) (dlg, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 05/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) MAIL to John M Bowler Returned - remailed on 5/13/19 to 600 Peachtree ST NE Ste 3000, Atlanta, GA 30308-2216 - new adress obtained from USPS. (Re: 4 Minute Order,,,, Directing Party(ies) to File Corporate Disclosure Statement,,, ) (dlg, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 05/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent American Tire Distributors, Inc. for Hercules Tire & Rubber Company, The) by Hercules Tire & Rubber Company, The (Barrow, Christopher) (Entered: 05/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) REPORT on Copyrights/Patents/Trademarks (dlg, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 05/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Hercules Tire Sales, Inc. (sc, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 05/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • (#4) MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing The Hercules Tire & Rubber Company to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 within seven (7) days of this order, if they have not already done so. The parties shall use the form entitled Corporate Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website (please do not refile if already filed on non-court form unless directed to do so). If you have already filed your Corporate Disclosure Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Corporate Disclosure Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (dlg, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 05/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Christopher A Barrow on behalf of Hercules Tire & Rubber Company, The (Barrow, Christopher) (Entered: 05/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Hercules Tire Sales, Inc., The (paid $400 filing fee; receipt number 1085-2051294) by Hercules Tire & Rubber Company, The (Barrow, Christopher) Modified on 5/10/2019 to correct "against" party text (sac-qc, Dpty Clk). (Entered: 05/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) CIVIL COVER SHEET by Hercules Tire & Rubber Company, The (Barrow, Christopher) (Entered: 05/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.