This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/13/2023 at 09:49:05 (UTC).

Herbert Lantz v. Life Insurance Company of North America

Case Summary

On 03/14/2023 Herbert Lantz filed a Labor - Employee Benefit lawsuit against Life Insurance Company of North America. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Jesus G. Bernal and Sheri Pym. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:23-CV-00442

  • Filing Date:

    03/14/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Employee Benefit

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Jesus G. Bernal

Referral Judge

Sheri Pym

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Herbert Lantz

Defendant

Life Insurance Company of North America

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Phillip S Bather

Diana Negin Massaband

Susan B Grabarsky

Defendant Attorneys

Nicole Y. Blohm

Jonathan H. Semerjian

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-34956673 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff Herbert Lantz. (Attorney Phillip S Bather added to party Herbert Lantz(pty:pla))(Bather, Phillip) (Entered: 03/14/2023)

#2

(#2) Certification & NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Herbert Lantz, (Bather, Phillip) (Entered: 03/14/2023)

#3

(#3) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Herbert Lantz. (Bather, Phillip) (Entered: 03/14/2023)

#4

(#4) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Herbert Lantz. (Bather, Phillip) (Entered: 03/14/2023)

#5

(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Jesus G. Bernal and Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym. (jtil) (Entered: 03/15/2023)

#6

(#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil) (Entered: 03/15/2023)

#7

(#7) Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (jtil) (Entered: 03/15/2023)

#8

(#8) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Life Insurance Company of North America. (jtil) (Entered: 03/16/2023)

#9

(#9) STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Jesus G. Bernal. (ima) (Entered: 03/22/2023)

#10

(#10) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Herbert Lantz, upon Defendant Life Insurance Company of North America served on 3/22/2023, answer due 4/12/2023. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Diana Ruiz, Intake Specialist of CT Corporation Agent for Process in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Bather, Phillip) (Entered: 03/24/2023)

#11

(#11) STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Life Insurance Company of North America answer now due 5/12/2023, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant Life Insurance Company of North America.(Attorney Jonathan H. Semerjian added to party Life Insurance Company of North America(pty:dft))(Semerjian, Jonathan) (Entered: 03/27/2023)

#12

(#12) Notice of Court's Standing Order filed by Plaintiff Herbert Lantz. (Bather, Phillip) (Entered: 03/29/2023)

#13

(#13) NOTICE of Settlement filed by Plaintiff Herbert Lantz. (Bather, Phillip) (Entered: 05/12/2023)

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

05/12/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#13) NOTICE of Settlement filed by Plaintiff Herbert Lantz. (Bather, Phillip) (Entered: 05/12/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/29/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#12) Notice of Court's Standing Order filed by Plaintiff Herbert Lantz. (Bather, Phillip) (Entered: 03/29/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/27/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#11) STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Life Insurance Company of North America answer now due 5/12/2023, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant Life Insurance Company of North America.(Attorney Jonathan H. Semerjian added to party Life Insurance Company of North America(pty:dft))(Semerjian, Jonathan) (Entered: 03/27/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/24/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#10) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Herbert Lantz, upon Defendant Life Insurance Company of North America served on 3/22/2023, answer due 4/12/2023. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Diana Ruiz, Intake Specialist of CT Corporation Agent for Process in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Bather, Phillip) (Entered: 03/24/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/22/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#9) STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Jesus G. Bernal. (ima) (Entered: 03/22/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/16/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#8) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Life Insurance Company of North America. (jtil) (Entered: 03/16/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/15/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#7) Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (jtil) (Entered: 03/15/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/15/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil) (Entered: 03/15/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/15/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Jesus G. Bernal and Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym. (jtil) (Entered: 03/15/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/14/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#4) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Herbert Lantz. (Bather, Phillip) (Entered: 03/14/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/14/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Herbert Lantz. (Bather, Phillip) (Entered: 03/14/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/14/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#2) Certification & NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Herbert Lantz, (Bather, Phillip) (Entered: 03/14/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/14/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-34956673 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff Herbert Lantz. (Attorney Phillip S Bather added to party Herbert Lantz(pty:pla))(Bather, Phillip) (Entered: 03/14/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less