This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/22/2021 at 16:17:18 (UTC).

Heo et al v. Secretary, Department of Homeland Security et al

Case Summary

On 04/23/2021 Heo filed an Immigration - Other Immigration lawsuit against Secretary, Department of Homeland Security. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are Gregory J. Kelly and Gregory A. Presnell. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:21-CV-00714

  • Filing Date:

    04/23/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Immigration - Other Immigration

  • Courthouse:

    Florida Middle District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Gregory J. Kelly

Presiding Judge

Gregory A. Presnell

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Mi Jeong Heo

Chang Ju Lee

Defendants

Director, Federal Bureau of Investigations

U.S. Attorney General

Director, Citizenship and Immigration Services

Secretary, Department of Homeland Security

District Director, Citizenship and Immigration Services, Orlando, Florida

Orlando Field Office Director, Citzenship and Immigration Services

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Shahzad Ahmed

Attorney at Brink Ahmed Immigration

5401 S. Kirkman Rd., Suite. 105

Orlando, FL 32819

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) ORDER dismissing case without prejudice re #7 Notice of voluntary dismissal. The Clerk is directed to close the case. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 6/17/2021. (LAM) (Entered: 06/17/2021)

#7

RESTRICTED

#4

(#4) ORDER for Plaintiffs to show cause why sanctions should not be imposed, which may include dismissal of this case, for failure to respond to the Court's initial case order. Show Cause Response due by 6/15/2021. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 6/1/2021. (LAM) (Entered: 06/01/2021)

#3

(#3) INITIAL ORDER re: Case Management and Deadlines. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 5/12/2021. (DS) (Entered: 05/12/2021)

#2

RESTRICTED

1 #3

Mailing Envelope

1 #2

*Restricted*

1 #1

*Restricted*

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT for Issuance of Writ of Mandamus and/or Declaratory Judgment against All Defendants. Filing fee $ 402.00 - receipt number ORL097849 Filed by Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(RDO) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/26/2021: #3 Mailing Envelope) (RDO). (Entered: 04/26/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER dismissing case without prejudice re #7 Notice of voluntary dismissal. The Clerk is directed to close the case. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 6/17/2021. (LAM) (Entered: 06/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of voluntary dismissal by Mi Jeong Heo, Chang Ju Lee (Ahmed, Shahzad) (Entered: 06/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ENDORSED ORDER. Upon consideration of the #5 Response to #4 order to show cause, the show cause order is hereby DISCHARGED. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 6/2/2021. (LAM) (Entered: 06/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re #4 Order to show cause filed by Mi Jeong Heo, Chang Ju Lee. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Ntc of Pendency, #2 Supplement Ntc of Int Parties & Corp Disc)(Ahmed, Shahzad) (Entered: 06/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER for Plaintiffs to show cause why sanctions should not be imposed, which may include dismissal of this case, for failure to respond to the Court's initial case order. Show Cause Response due by 6/15/2021. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 6/1/2021. (LAM) (Entered: 06/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) INITIAL ORDER re: Case Management and Deadlines. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 5/12/2021. (DS) (Entered: 05/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) SUMMONS issued as to All Defendants, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (RDO) (Entered: 04/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT for Issuance of Writ of Mandamus and/or Declaratory Judgment against All Defendants. Filing fee $ 402.00 - receipt number ORL097849 Filed by Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(RDO) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/26/2021: #3 Mailing Envelope) (RDO). (Entered: 04/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Orlando Field Office Director, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services is a litigant

Latest cases where DIRECTOR FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION is a litigant

Latest cases where District Director, Citizenship and Immigration Services, Orlando, Florida is a litigant

Latest cases where Director, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services is a litigant