This case was last updated from PACER on 07/05/2019 at 10:27:44 (UTC).

Hensley v. Dowdy et al

Case Summary

On 04/26/2019 Hensley filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Dowdy. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr and John W. deGravelles. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-00258

  • Filing Date:

    04/26/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Louisiana Middle District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr

Presiding Judge

John W. deGravelles

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Janesha Hensley

Defendants

State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company

Volkswagen Group of America, Inc.

Jonathan Dowdy

XL Insurance America, Inc.

Johnathan Dowdy

XL Insurance Co.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Tedrick K. Knightshead

Attorney at Knightshead Law Firm

2415 Government Street

Baton Rouge, LA 70806

Defendant Attorneys

Tucker Fred Giles

Attorney at Terry J. Butcher & Associates

2600 Cityplace Drive, Suite 550

Baton Rouge, LA 70808

Sandra S. Rester

Attorney at Terry J. Butcher & Associates

2600 Citiplace Drive, Suite 550

Baton Rouge, LA 70808

McNeil J. Kemmerly

Attorney at Leake& Andersson, LLP

Suite 1700, 1100 Poydras St.

New Orleans, LA 70163-1701

Robert Louis Bonnaffons

Attorney at Leake & Andersson LLP

1100 Poydras Street, Suite 1700

New Orleans, LA 70163

Katie F Wollfarth

Attorney at Leake & Andersson

1100 Poydras Street, Suite 1700

New Orleans, LA 70163

Alex P. Tilling

Attorney at Leake & Andersson, LLP

1700 Energy Centre, 1100 Poydras Street

New Orleans, LA 70163-1701

Louis Paul Bonnaffons

Attorney at Leake & Andersson, LLP

1100 Poydras Stree, Suite 1700

New Orleans, LA 70163

 

Court Documents

#19

(#19) SCHEDULING ORDER: The Scheduling Conference set for 6/27/2019 is CANCELLED. In accordance with FRCP 16(b), the following discovery deadlines are established. Amended Pleadings due by 10/9/2019. F.R.C.P. 26(a)(1) disclosures due by 6/28/2019. Discovery due by 5/8/2020. Plaintiff`s Expert Witness List due by 4/14/2020. Defendant`s Expert Witness List due by 5/14/2020. Plaintiff`s Expert Reports due by 7/15/2020. Defendant`s Expert Reports due by 8/14/2020. Discovery from Experts due by 9/14/2020. Motions shall be filed by 10/16/2020. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 2/5/2021. Pretrial Conference set for 2/25/2021 at 01:30 PM in chambers before Judge John W. deGravelles. Motions In Limine shall be filed by 3/12/2021. Affidavit of Settlement Efforts due by 3/26/2021. Joint jury instructions, voir dire, verdict forms, and trial briefs due by 4/9/2021. Jury Trial set for 4/26/2021 - 4/28/2021 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 1 before Judge John W. deGravelles. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 6/24/2019. (SGO) (Entered: 06/24/2019)

#18

(#18) Joint STATUS REPORT by All Plaintiffs. (Knightshead, Tedrick) (Entered: 06/13/2019)

12 #1

Exhibit A

#12

(#12) MOTION to Substitute Consent to Removal by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Giles, Tucker) (Entered: 05/07/2019)

11 #10

Proposed Pleading; Exhibit "B" to Motion to Amend Notice of Removal (R

11 #9

Proposed Pleading; Exhibit "A" to Motion to Amend Notice of Removal (R

11 #8

Proposed Pleading; Proposed Order on Motion to Amend Notice of Removal

11 #2

Proposed Pleading; Proposed Order granting Mot to Substitute Pleadingsleave to a

#11

(#11) Ex Parte MOTION to Substitute Pleadings In Order to Correct Deficiencies by Johnathan Dowdy, Volkswagen Group of America, Inc., XL Insurance Co.. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support Memorandum in Support of Motion to Substitute Pleadings (In Order to Correct Deficiencies, #2 Proposed Pleading; Proposed Order granting Mot to Substitute Pleadingsleave to amend, #3 Proposed Pleading; Motion to Strike/Remove Incorrectly Filed Pleadings, #4 Proposed Pleading; Memorandum in Support of Motion to Strike/Withdraw Incorrectly Filed Pleadings, #5 Proposed Pleading; Proposed Order Motion to Strike/Remove Incorrectly Filed Pleadings, #6 Proposed Pleading; Motion to Amend Notice of Removal, #7 Proposed Pleading; Memorandum in Support of Motion to Amend Notice of Removal, #8 Proposed Pleading; Proposed Order on Motion to Amend Notice of Removal, #9 Proposed Pleading; Exhibit "A" to Motion to Amend Notice of Removal (Redacted version of Exhibit 4 to Original Notice of Removal, #10 Proposed Pleading; Exhibit "B" to Motion to Amend Notice of Removal (Redacted Exhibit 6 to original Notice of Removal))(Kemmerly, McNeil) (Entered: 05/06/2019)

1 #8

Attachment Civil Cover Sheet

1 #7

Exhibit 6

1 #6

Exhibit 5

1 #5

Exhibit 4

1 #4

Exhibit 3

1 #3

Exhibit 2

1 #2

Exhibit 1

1 #1

Exhibit List

#1

MOTION(S) REFERRED: #6 Ex Parte MOTION to Amend Notice of Removal, #4 Ex Parte MOTION to Strike an Incorrectly Filed Document #1 Notice of Removal, Doc.1-5 (Exhibit 4 to Notice of Removal) and Doc. 1-7 (Exhibit 6 to Notice of Removal). This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (KAH) (Entered: 05/06/2019)

37 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) SCHEDULING ORDER: The Scheduling Conference set for 6/27/2019 is CANCELLED. In accordance with FRCP 16(b), the following discovery deadlines are established. Amended Pleadings due by 10/9/2019. F.R.C.P. 26(a)(1) disclosures due by 6/28/2019. Discovery due by 5/8/2020. Plaintiff`s Expert Witness List due by 4/14/2020. Defendant`s Expert Witness List due by 5/14/2020. Plaintiff`s Expert Reports due by 7/15/2020. Defendant`s Expert Reports due by 8/14/2020. Discovery from Experts due by 9/14/2020. Motions shall be filed by 10/16/2020. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 2/5/2021. Pretrial Conference set for 2/25/2021 at 01:30 PM in chambers before Judge John W. deGravelles. Motions In Limine shall be filed by 3/12/2021. Affidavit of Settlement Efforts due by 3/26/2021. Joint jury instructions, voir dire, verdict forms, and trial briefs due by 4/9/2021. Jury Trial set for 4/26/2021 - 4/28/2021 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 1 before Judge John W. deGravelles. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 6/24/2019. (SGO) (Entered: 06/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) Joint STATUS REPORT by All Plaintiffs. (Knightshead, Tedrick) (Entered: 06/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) ORDER granting #12 MOTION to Substitute Consent to Removal filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. The Consent to Removal filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (R. Doc. 5) shall be substituted with the corrected Consent to Removal (R. Doc. 12-1). Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 5/9/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (JSL) (Entered: 05/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) ORDER granting #11 Ex Parte MOTION to Substitute Pleadings In Order to Correct Deficiencies filed by Johnathan Dowdy, Volkswagen Group of America, Inc., XL Insurance Co. The Motion to Strike/Remove Incorrectly Filed Documents 1-5 and 1-7 (R. Doc. 4) and the Motion to Amend Notice of Removal (R. Doc. 6) shall be substituted with the corrected documents attached to this motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 5/9/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (JSL) (Entered: 05/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) ORDER granting #6 Motion to Amend Notice of Removal. The Notice of Removal shall be amended to include the redacted copies of the documents previously filed as Documents 1-5 and 1-7. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 5/9/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (JSL) (Entered: 05/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) ORDER granting #4 Motion to Strike. Documents 1-5 and 1-7 shall be STRUCK from the record of this matter. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 5/9/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (JSL) (Entered: 05/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION(S) REFERRED: #11 Ex Parte MOTION to Substitute Pleadings In Order to Correct Deficiencies , #12 MOTION to Substitute Consent to Removal . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (ELW) (Entered: 05/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) Corporate Disclosure Statement by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Giles, Tucker) (Entered: 05/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) MOTION to Substitute Consent to Removal by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Giles, Tucker) (Entered: 05/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) Ex Parte MOTION to Substitute Pleadings In Order to Correct Deficiencies by Johnathan Dowdy, Volkswagen Group of America, Inc., XL Insurance Co.. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support Memorandum in Support of Motion to Substitute Pleadings (In Order to Correct Deficiencies, #2 Proposed Pleading; Proposed Order granting Mot to Substitute Pleadingsleave to amend, #3 Proposed Pleading; Motion to Strike/Remove Incorrectly Filed Pleadings, #4 Proposed Pleading; Memorandum in Support of Motion to Strike/Withdraw Incorrectly Filed Pleadings, #5 Proposed Pleading; Proposed Order Motion to Strike/Remove Incorrectly Filed Pleadings, #6 Proposed Pleading; Motion to Amend Notice of Removal, #7 Proposed Pleading; Memorandum in Support of Motion to Amend Notice of Removal, #8 Proposed Pleading; Proposed Order on Motion to Amend Notice of Removal, #9 Proposed Pleading; Exhibit "A" to Motion to Amend Notice of Removal (Redacted version of Exhibit 4 to Original Notice of Removal, #10 Proposed Pleading; Exhibit "B" to Motion to Amend Notice of Removal (Redacted Exhibit 6 to original Notice of Removal))(Kemmerly, McNeil) (Entered: 05/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 05/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION(S) REFERRED: #6 Ex Parte MOTION to Amend Notice of Removal, #4 Ex Parte MOTION to Strike an Incorrectly Filed Document #1 Notice of Removal, Doc.1-5 (Exhibit 4 to Notice of Removal) and Doc. 1-7 (Exhibit 6 to Notice of Removal). This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (KAH) (Entered: 05/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTICE of To State Court of Removal to Federal Court by Jonathan Dowdy, Volkswagen Group of America, Inc., XL Insurance Co. re #1 Notice of Removal, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Copy of Notice of Removal attached as exhibit to Notice to State Court of filing of Notice of Removal conformed by 19th JDC Clerk of Court)(Kemmerly, McNeil) (Entered: 05/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Corporate Disclosure Statement by XL Insurance Co. identifying Corporate Parent XL Financial Holdings (Ireland) Limited, Corporate Parent Greenwich Insurance Company, Inc., Corporate Parent XL Reinsurance America inc. (New York), Corporate Parent X.L. America Inc. (Delaware), Corporate Parent XL Bermuda Ltd (Bermuda), Corporate Parent AXA Assurance Vie Mutuelle, Other Affiliate Exel Holdings Limited (Cayman), Other Affiliate XLIT Ltd (Cayman), Other Affiliate XL Group Ltd (Bermuda), Other Affiliate AXA SA (France) for XL Insurance Co... (Kemmerly, McNeil) (Entered: 05/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Volkswagen Group of America, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Volkswagen AG, Other Affiliate Volkswagen Group of America Inc. for Volkswagen Group of America, Inc... (Kemmerly, McNeil) (Entered: 05/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MOTION for Leave of Court to Amend Notice of Removal by Jonathan Dowdy, Volkswagen Group of America, Inc., XL Insurance Co.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading; Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit 4 to Notice of Removal replacing Doc. 1-5, #3 Exhibit 6 to Notice of Removal replacing Doc. 1-7)(Kemmerly, McNeil) (Main Document 6, Attachment 1, Attachment 2 and Attachment 3 replaced on 5/13/2019) (SWE). (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/13/2019: #4 Memorandum in Support) in accordance with RD 16 (SWE). (Entered: 05/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Consent to Removal by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Giles, Tucker) (Main Document 5 replaced on 5/13/2019 in accordance with RD 17) (SWE). (Entered: 05/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Ex Parte MOTION to Strike/Remove Incorrectly Filed Documents Doc.1-5 (Exhibit 4 to Notice of Removal) and Doc. 1-7 (Exhibit 6 to Notice of Removal) by Jonathan Dowdy, Volkswagen Group of America, Inc., XL Insurance Co.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading; Proposed Order)(Kemmerly, McNeil) (Main Document 4 and Attachment 1 replaced and Additional attachment(s) added on 5/13/2019: #2 Memorandum in Support) in accordance with RD 16 (SWE). (Entered: 05/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Letter to Attorney McNeil J. Kemmerly regarding Leola M. Anderson who is Co-Counsel for party Jonathon Dowdy, Volkswagen Group of America, Inc. and XL Insurance Co.. Attorney is not admitted to practice in LAMD. (SGO) (Entered: 04/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE of Listing Pursuant to 28 USC 1447(b) by Jonathan Dowdy, Volkswagen Group of America, Inc., XL Insurance America, Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal, (Attachments: #1 Attachment State Court Record)(Kemmerly, McNeil) (Entered: 04/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 19th JDC, Case Number C675267. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAMDC-1933297), filed by XL Insurance America, Inc., Volkswagen Group of America, Inc., Jonathan Dowdy. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit List, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, # STRICKEN FROM THE RECORD(5) Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, # STRICKEN FROM THE RECORD(7) Exhibit 6, #8 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet)(Kemmerly, McNeil) Modified on 5/13/2019 to remove documents as they have been stricken in accordance with RD 14 (SWE). (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/13/2019 in accordance with RD 15: #9 Document 1-5 (Exhibit 4), #11 Document 1-7 (Exhibit 6)) (SWE). (Entered: 04/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.