This case was last updated from PACER on 11/03/2020 at 09:23:42 (UTC).

Hensley v. Angiletta

Case Summary

On 09/04/2020 Hensley filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Angiletta. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Oregon District. The Judge overseeing this case is Marco A. Hernandez. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-01539

  • Filing Date:

    09/04/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Oregon District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Marco A. Hernandez

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Leanne J. Hensley

Bend, OR 97708

Defendant

Michael Angiletta

 

Court Documents

6 #11

Exhibit J

6 #10

Exhibit I

6 #9

Exhibit H

6 #8

Exhibit G

6 #7

Exhibit F

6 #6

Exhibit E

6 #5

Exhibit D

6 #4

Exhibit C

6 #3

Exhibit B

6 #2

Exhibit A

6 #1

Exhibit Affidavit in Support

#6

(#6) Motion for Extension of Time. Filed by Leanne J. Hensley. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavit in Support, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J) (eo) NOTE: Exhibit D was submitted by the filer as separate Exhibits A-Z, but has been combined into a single Exhibit for clarity. (Entered: 11/02/2020)

#5

(#5) Order by Judge Marco A. Hernandez. Plaintiff's application #3 for leave to proceed IFP is granted. Plaintiff's Complaint #1 is dismissed with leave to amend. Plaintiff may file an amended complaint, curing deficiencies noted in this order, within 30 days of this order. Dated: 10/6/2020. Ordered by Judge Marco A. Hernandez.(Mailed to Pro Se party on 10/7/2020.) (cw) (Entered: 10/07/2020)

#4

(#4) Civil Cover Sheet regarding Complaint #1 . Filed by Leanne J. Hensley. (eo) (Entered: 09/08/2020)

#3

(#3) Application for Leave to Proceed IFP. Filed by Leanne J. Hensley. (eo) (Entered: 09/08/2020)

#2

(#2) Notice of Case Assignment: This case is assigned to Judge Marco A. Hernandez. (Mailed to Pro Se party on 9/4/20.) (eo) (Entered: 09/04/2020)

#1

(#1) Complaint. Jury Trial Requested: No. No filing fee paid or IFP application presented. Filed by Leanne J. Hensley against Michael Angiletta. (eo) (Entered: 09/04/2020)

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Motion for Extension of Time. Filed by Leanne J. Hensley. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavit in Support, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J) (eo) NOTE: Exhibit D was submitted by the filer as separate Exhibits A-Z, but has been combined into a single Exhibit for clarity. (Entered: 11/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Order by Judge Marco A. Hernandez. Plaintiff's application #3 for leave to proceed IFP is granted. Plaintiff's Complaint #1 is dismissed with leave to amend. Plaintiff may file an amended complaint, curing deficiencies noted in this order, within 30 days of this order. Dated: 10/6/2020. Ordered by Judge Marco A. Hernandez.(Mailed to Pro Se party on 10/7/2020.) (cw) (Entered: 10/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Civil Cover Sheet regarding Complaint #1 . Filed by Leanne J. Hensley. (eo) (Entered: 09/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Application for Leave to Proceed IFP. Filed by Leanne J. Hensley. (eo) (Entered: 09/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice of Case Assignment: This case is assigned to Judge Marco A. Hernandez. (Mailed to Pro Se party on 9/4/20.) (eo) (Entered: 09/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Complaint. Jury Trial Requested: No. No filing fee paid or IFP application presented. Filed by Leanne J. Hensley against Michael Angiletta. (eo) (Entered: 09/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less