This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/13/2021 at 09:44:48 (UTC).

Hensley et al v. Safeco Insurance Company of America

Case Summary

On 02/12/2021 Hensley filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Safeco Insurance Company of America. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Kansas District. The Judges overseeing this case are Toby Crouse and James P. O'Hara. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:21-CV-01040

  • Filing Date:

    02/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Toby Crouse

Referral Judge

James P. O'Hara

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Danny Lasiter

Angalea Hensley

Defendant and 3Rd Party Plaintiff

Safeco Insurance Company of America

3Rd Party Defendant

Aron Gomez

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

John Hadley Sizemore

Attorney at The Bull Attorneys, PA

10111 East 21St Street North, Suite 204

Wichita, KS 67206

Tony L. Atterbury

Attorney at The Bull Attorneys, PA

10111 East 21St Street North, Suite 204

Wichita, KS 67206

Defendant and 3Rd Party Plaintiff Attorney

Deborah S. Johnson

Attorney at Deborah S. Johnson, ESQ

Po Box 7217

London, KY 40742

 

Court Documents

#1

#2

#3

3 #1

Proof of Service

#4

#5

#6

#8

#9

#10

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Safeco Insurance Company of America identifying Liberty Mutual Holding Company as corporate parent (Johnson, Deborah) (Entered: 04/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against Aron Gomez, filed by Safeco Insurance Company of America. (Johnson, Deborah) (NOTE -- This is a duplicate of #8 .) (mam) (Entered: 04/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ANSWER to Complaint by Safeco Insurance Company of America. (Johnson, Deborah) Modified on 4/1/2021 -- In addition to an answer, this is also a third-party complaint which has been refiled at #9 . It was originally filed as a crossclaim in error. (mam) (Entered: 04/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER granting #6 defendant's unopposed motion for extension. Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to plaintiffs' complaint by April 6, 2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 3/16/21. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry. (jc) (Entered: 03/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint (attorney) by Defendant Safeco Insurance Company of America (referred to Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara) (Johnson, Deborah) (Entered: 03/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Deborah S. Johnson on behalf of Safeco Insurance Company of America. (Johnson, Deborah) (Entered: 03/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME OR ADDRESS by Tony L. Atterbury (Atterbury, Tony) (Entered: 03/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- certified mail by Angalea Hensley, Danny Lasiter upon Safeco Insurance Company of America served on 2/19/2021, answer due 3/12/2021 (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Atterbury, Tony) (Entered: 02/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED as to Safeco Insurance Company of America (issued to Attorney for service). (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (jk) (Entered: 02/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge Toby Crouse and Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (jk) (Entered: 02/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiffs Angalea Hensley, K L, M L, Tabitha Lasiter. (Atterbury, Tony) (Entered: 02/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT with trial location of Wichita ( Filing fee $402, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-5409473.), filed by M L, K L, Angalea Hensley, Tabitha Lasiter.(Atterbury, Tony) (Entered: 02/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Safeco Insurance Company of America is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer John Hadley Sizemore

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Tony L. Atterbury